Consolidated
Lead case: 3:19-md-02885

Florida Northern District Court
Judge:M Casey Rodgers
Referred: Gary R Jones
Case #: 3:19-cv-00926
Nature of Suit365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Case Filed:Apr 23, 2019
Case in other court:Minnesota, 0:19-cv-00331
Last checked: Monday Oct 21, 2019 4:12 AM EDT
Defendant
3M COMPANY
Represented By
CHARLES FRANKLIN BEALL, JR.
Moore Hill & Westmoreland Pa - Pensacola Fl
contact info
BENJAMIN W HULSE
Blackwell Burke PA
contact info
Defendant
AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC
Represented By
CHARLES FRANKLIN BEALL, JR.
Moore Hill & Westmoreland Pa - Pensacola Fl
contact info
Plaintiff
GEOFFERY TEMPLE
Represented By
CASEY D MARSHALL
Bassford Remele - Minneapolis Mn
contact info
Lewis A Remele, Jr
Bassford Remele
contact info
SHAWN FOX
Tracey & Fox Law Firm - Houston Tx
contact info
Casey D Marshall
Bassford Remele, PA
contact info
SEAN PATRICK TRACEY
Tracey & Fox Law Firm - Houston Tx
contact info
Aram V. Desteian
Bassford Remele
contact info
ARAM V DESTEIAN
Bassford Remele - Minneapolis Mn
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/02/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Wednesday, October 30, 2019
19 19 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Wed 10/30 3:11 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by GEOFFERY TEMPLE (FOX, SHAWN)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 16, 2019
18 18 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 08/16 4:27 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by CHARLES FRANKLIN BEALL, JR on behalf of 3M COMPANY, AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC (BEALL, CHARLES)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 06, 2019
17 17 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 05/06 4:32 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by SEAN PATRICK TRACEY on behalf of GEOFFERY TEMPLE (TRACEY, SEAN)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 30, 2019
16 16 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 04/30 11:39 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by SHAWN FOX on behalf of GEOFFERY TEMPLE (FOX, SHAWN)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 23, 2019
15 15 transfer Case Transferred In - District Transfer (COURT USE ONLY) Tue 04/23 9:33 AM
Case transferred in from District of Minnesota; Case Number 0:19-cv-00331. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 17, 2019
14 14 CERTIFIED COPY OF CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO- 3) from the Judicial Panel on Multi-District Litigation; transferring case to the Northern District of Florida for coordinated or consolidated pretrial proceedings. Case assigned to Judge M. Casey Rogers. Associated Cases: 0:19-cv-00214-JRT-KMM et al.(MMP) [Transferred from Minnesota on 4/23/2019.]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 06, 2019
13 13 (Text-only) ORDER STAYING CASE: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that these proceedings are stayed in their entirety, including, without limitation, Defendants' obligation to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint, until such time as the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation determines whether this matter will be transferred to an MDL and, if so, in what jurisdiction. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Katherine M. Menendez on 3/6/2019. (KAT) [Transferred from Minnesota on 4/23/2019.]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 05, 2019
12 12 STIPULATION to Stay Proceedings Pending Transfer to MDL by 3M Company. Jointly Signed by Geoffery Temple. (Hulse, Benjamin) [Transferred from Minnesota on 4/23/2019.]
Related: [-]
Monday, February 25, 2019
11 11 ORDER FOR REASSIGNMENT OF RELATED CASES. This case is reassigned to Chief Judge John R. Tunheim and Magistrate Judge Katherine M. Menendez for all further proceedings. Judge Michael J. Davis, Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung no longer assigned to case. NOTE: the new case number is 19-cv-331 (JRT/KMM) . Please use this case number for all subsequent pleadings. Signed by Chief Judge John R. Tunheim, Judge Joan N. Ericksen, Judge Susan Richard Nelson, Judge Wilhelmina M. Wright, Judge Eric C. Tostrud, Judge David S. Doty and Judge Donovan W. Frank on 2/21/2019, by Judge Nancy E. Brasel and Judge Paul A. Magnuson on 2/22/2019, and by Judge Michael J. Davis on 2/25/2019. (lmb) [Transferred from Minnesota on 4/23/2019.]
Related: [-]
Friday, February 15, 2019
9 9 ORDER OF RECUSAL. Magistrate Judge Steven E. Rau recused. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung for all further proceedings. NOTE: the new case number is 19-cv-331 MJD/TNL . Please use this case number for all subsequent pleadings. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung on 2/15/2019. (kt) [Transferred from Minnesota on 4/23/2019.]
Related: [-]
8 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Geoffery Temple. Aearo Technologies, LLC served on 2/13/2019, answer due 3/6/2019. Related [+] [Transferred from Minnesota on 4/23/2019.]
Related: [-] mele, Lewis
7 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Geoffery Temple. 3M Company served on 2/13/2019, answer due 3/6/2019. Related [+] [Transferred from Minnesota on 4/23/2019.]
Related: [-] mele, Lewis
Thursday, February 14, 2019
6 6 ORDER OF RECUSAL. Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer recused. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Steven E. Rau for all further proceedings. NOTE: the new case number is 19-cv-331 MJD/SER . Please use this case number for all subsequent pleadings. Signed by Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer on 2/14/2019. (kt) [Transferred from Minnesota on 4/23/2019.]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 13, 2019
5 5 ORDER OF RECUSAL. Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Cowan Wright recused. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer for all further proceedings. NOTE: the new case number is 19-cv-331 MJD/HB . Please use this case number for all subsequent pleadings. Signed by Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer on 2/13/2019. (kt) [Transferred from Minnesota on 4/23/2019.]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 12, 2019
4 4 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: Notice re: Non-Admitted Attorney We have received documents listing Sean Patrick Tracey, Shawn P. Fox, Rebecca King, Clinton Casperson, Mikal C. Watts, Francisco Guerra IV, Erin Rogiers as counsel of record. If he or she wishes to be listed as an attorney of record in this case, he or she must be admitted to the bar of the U.S. District Court of Minnesota in accordance with [LINK:Local Rule 83.5 (a), (b) and (c)] or temporarily admitted pro hac vice in accordance with [LINK:Local Rule 83.5 (d) or (e)] . For more admissions information and forms, please see the Attorney Forms Section of the courts website at [LINK:href=http://www.mnd.uscourts.gov/FORMS/court_forms.shtml#attorneyforms] [LINK:. (kt) [Transferred from Minnesota on 4/23/2019.]
Related: [-]
3 3 Summons Issued as to 3M Company, Aearo Technologies, LLC. (kt) [Transferred from Minnesota on 4/23/2019.]
Related: [-]
2 2 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Michael J. Davis per 3rd/4th Master list, referred to Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Cowan Wright. Please use case number 19-cv-331 MJD/ECW. (kt) [Transferred from Minnesota on 4/23/2019.]
Related: [-]
Monday, February 11, 2019
1 1 COMPLAINT against 3M Company, Aearo Technologies, LLC (filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMNDC-6664408) filed by Geoffery Temple. Filer requests summons issued. Related [+] [Transferred from Minnesota on 4/23/2019.]
Related: [-] mele, Lewis
Att: 1 Exhibit(s) A-G,
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet