HOFELICH v 3M COMPANY
Consolidated
Lead case: 3:19-md-02885
Lead case: 3:19-md-02885
Florida Northern District Court | |
Judge: | M Casey Rodgers |
Referred: | Gary R Jones |
Case #: | 3:19-cv-00968 |
Nature of Suit | 365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability |
Case Filed: | Apr 23, 2019 |
Terminated: | May 04, 2022 |
Case in other court: | Texas Western, 1:19-cv-00147 |
Last checked: Monday Oct 21, 2019 5:55 AM EDT |
Defendant
3M COMPANY
|
|
Defendant
3M OCCUPATIONAL SAFETY LLC
|
|
Defendant
AEARO HOLDING LLC
|
|
Defendant
AEARO INTERMEDIATE LLC
|
|
Defendant
AEARO LLC
|
|
Defendant
AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC
|
|
Plaintiff
GREGORY HOFELICH
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 05/30/2023 11:59 PM EDT |
Wednesday, May 04, 2022 | ||
14 | 14
16
pgs
order
Order Dismissing Case
Thu 05/05 4:26 PM
ORDER. The plaintiffs' cases identified on Exhibit A are hereby DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE for failure to comply with Court orders. The Clerk is directed to enter a copy of this Order on the individual dockets only, and then to close the cases in their entirety for all purposes. Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 5/4/2022. (erl) |
|
Friday, November 08, 2019 | ||
13 | 13
notice
Notice of Appearance
Fri 11/08 12:16 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by CHARLES FRANKLIN BEALL, JR on behalf of All Defendants (BEALL, CHARLES) |
|
Monday, November 04, 2019 | ||
12 | 12
cmp
Amended Complaint
Mon 11/04 1:24 PM
Short Form Complaint AMENDED COMPLAINT Short Form Complaint against All Defendants All Defendants., filed by GREGORY HOFELICH. (AZIZ, MUHAMMAD) |
|
Tuesday, August 20, 2019 | ||
11 | 11
service
Summons Issued
Tue 08/20 7:31 AM
Summons Issued as to 3M OCCUPATIONAL SAFETY LLC, AEARO HOLDING LLC, AEARO INTERMEDIATE LLC, AEARO LLC, AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC. (djb) (Main Document 11 replaced on 8/20/2019) (djb). (Main Document 11 replaced on 8/20/2019) (djb) |
|
Monday, August 19, 2019 | ||
10 | 10
cmp
Amended Complaint
Mon 08/19 2:37 PM
Second AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants All Defendants., filed by GREGORY HOFELICH. (AZIZ, MUHAMMAD) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit | ||
Tuesday, August 13, 2019 | ||
9 | 9
9
pgs
order
Order
Tue 08/13 3:09 PM
ORDER - All individual plaintiffs whose cases are identified on Exhibit A are granted one final opportunity to file an amended complaint that names all defendants in the caption, as required by Rule 10(a), by August 20, 2019 . The amended complaints must be accompanied by properly completed summonses. Thereafter, the Clerk will sign and issue summonses for service of the operative complaints in each of the cases. No further amendments to these plaintiffs complaints will be allowed. Going forward, counsel is directed to comply with Rules 10(a) and 15(a) when filing new and/or amended complaints, which must be accompanied by properly completed summonses. Failure to do so may result in sanctions, including dismissal. Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 8/13/2019. (djb) |
|
Wednesday, July 24, 2019 | ||
8 | 8
cmp
Amended Complaint
Wed 07/24 2:11 PM
First AMENDED COMPLAINT and Jury Demand against 3M OCCUPATIONAL SAFETY LLC, AEARO HOLDING LLC, AEARO INTERMEDIATE LLC, AEARO LLC, AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC, filed by GREGORY HOFELICH. (AZIZ, MUHAMMAD) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Summons, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit Summons, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit Summons, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit Summons, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit Summons | ||
Tuesday, June 25, 2019 | ||
7 | 7
service
Summons Returned Executed
Tue 06/25 5:25 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by GREGORY HOFELICH. 3M COMPANY served on 6/24/2019, answer due 7/15/2019. (AZIZ, MUHAMMAD) |
|
Wednesday, June 19, 2019 | ||
6 | 6
service
Summons Issued
Wed 06/19 11:19 AM
Summons Issued as to 3M COMPANY. (djb) |
|
Tuesday, June 18, 2019 | ||
5 | 5
notice
Notice - Other - See Separate Menu for Ntc of Appeal Options
Tue 06/18 4:19 PM
NOTICE re: Issuance of Summons by GREGORY HOFELICH (AZIZ, MUHAMMAD) |
|
Tuesday, May 28, 2019 | ||
4 | 4
6
pgs
order
Order ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings
Tue 05/28 12:59 PM
ORDER - More than 90 days have elapsed since the complaints were filed and no waiver of service or executed proof of service have been filed. All individual plaintiffs whose cases are identified in Exhibit A are directed to accomplish service and file proof of service with the Court in accordance with Rule 4 by Friday, 6/28/2019 . Failure to comply with this directive will result in dismissal of a case without prejudice. See Fed. R. Civ. P.4(m). Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 5/28/2019. (djb) (Main Document 4 replaced on 5/28/2019) (djb) |
|
Tuesday, April 23, 2019 | ||
3 | 3
transfer
Case Transferred In - District Transfer (COURT USE ONLY)
Tue 04/23 3:25 PM
Case transferred in from District of Texas Western; Case Number 1:19-cv-00147. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. |
|
Friday, April 19, 2019 | ||
2 | 2 Conditional Transfer Order entered by the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation transferring case to the Northern District of Florida. Signed by John W. Nichols, Clerk of the Panel.(td) [Transferred from Texas Western on 4/23/2019.] | |
Tuesday, February 19, 2019 | ||
1 | 1 COMPLAINT and Jury Demand ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0542-11775226). No Summons requested at this time, filed by Gregory Hofelich.(Aziz, Muhammad) (Attachment 2 replaced on 2/20/2019 to flatten civil cover sheet) (so). [Transferred from Texas Western on 4/23/2019.] | |
Att: 1 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet | ||
Case assigned to Judge Robert Pitman. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (so) [Transferred from Texas Western on 4/23/2019.] | ||
DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Gregory Hofelich. (so) [Transferred from Texas Western on 4/23/2019.] |