LOPEZ v 3M COMPANY
Consolidated
Lead case: 3:19-md-02885
Lead case: 3:19-md-02885
Florida Northern District Court | |
Judge: | M Casey Rodgers |
Referred: | Gary R Jones |
Case #: | 3:19-cv-00985 |
Nature of Suit | 365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability |
Case Filed: | Apr 24, 2019 |
Case in other court: | Texas Western, 1:19-cv-00265 |
Last checked: Monday Oct 21, 2019 4:24 AM EDT |
Defendant
3M COMPANY
|
|
Defendant
3M OCCUPATIONAL SAFETY LLC
|
|
Defendant
AEARO HOLDING LLC
|
|
Defendant
AEARO INTERMEDIATE LLC
|
|
Defendant
AEARO LLC
|
|
Defendant
AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC
|
|
Plaintiff
JOHN LOPEZ
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 05/02/2025 11:59 PM EDT |
Wednesday, December 04, 2019 | ||
12 | 12
![]() NOTICE of Appearance by CHARLES FRANKLIN BEALL, JR on behalf of All Defendants (BEALL, CHARLES) |
|
Monday, November 04, 2019 | ||
11 | 11
![]() Short Form Complaint AMENDED COMPLAINT Short Form Complaint against All Defendants All Defendants., filed by JOHN LOPEZ. (AZIZ, MUHAMMAD) |
|
Tuesday, August 20, 2019 | ||
10 | 10
![]() Summons Issued as to 3M OCCUPATIONAL SAFETY LLC, AEARO HOLDING LLC, AEARO INTERMEDIATE LLC, AEARO LLC, AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC. (djb) (Main Document 10 replaced on 8/20/2019) (djb) |
|
Monday, August 19, 2019 | ||
9 | 9
![]() Second AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants All Defendants., filed by JOHN LOPEZ. (AZIZ, MUHAMMAD) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Att: 3
![]() |
||
Att: 4
![]() |
||
Att: 5
![]() |
||
Tuesday, August 13, 2019 | ||
8 | 8
![]() ORDER - All individual plaintiffs whose cases are identified on Exhibit A are granted one final opportunity to file an amended complaint that names all defendants in the caption, as required by Rule 10(a), by August 20, 2019 . The amended complaints must be accompanied by properly completed summonses. Thereafter, the Clerk will sign and issue summonses for service of the operative complaints in each of the cases. No further amendments to these plaintiffs complaints will be allowed. Going forward, counsel is directed to comply with Rules 10(a) and 15(a) when filing new and/or amended complaints, which must be accompanied by properly completed summonses. Failure to do so may result in sanctions, including dismissal. Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 8/13/2019. (djb) |
|
Wednesday, July 24, 2019 | ||
7 | 7
![]() First AMENDED COMPLAINT and Jury Demand against 3M OCCUPATIONAL SAFETY LLC, AEARO HOLDING LLC, AEARO INTERMEDIATE LLC, AEARO LLC, AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC, filed by JOHN LOPEZ. (AZIZ, MUHAMMAD) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Att: 3
![]() |
||
Att: 4
![]() |
||
Att: 5
![]() |
||
Friday, June 28, 2019 | ||
6 | 6
![]() SUMMONS Returned Executed by JOHN LOPEZ. 3M COMPANY served on 6/26/2019, answer due 7/17/2019. (AZIZ, MUHAMMAD) |
|
Friday, June 21, 2019 | ||
5 | 5
![]() Summons Issued as to 3M COMPANY. (djb) |
|
Thursday, June 20, 2019 | ||
4 | 4
![]() NOTICE re: Issuance of Summons by JOHN LOPEZ (AZIZ, MUHAMMAD) |
|
Wednesday, April 24, 2019 | ||
3 | 3
![]() Case transferred in from District of Texas Western; Case Number 1:19-cv-00265. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. |
|
Friday, April 19, 2019 | ||
2 | 2
![]() |
|
Sunday, March 17, 2019 | ||
1 | 1
![]() |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Case assigned to Judge Robert Pitman. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (cj) [Transferred from Texas Western on 4/24/2019.] | ||
DEMAND for Trial by Jury by John Lopez. (cj) [Transferred from Texas Western on 4/24/2019.] |