Consolidated
Lead case: 3:19-md-02885

Florida Northern District Court
Judge:M Casey Rodgers
Referred: Gary R Jones
Case #: 3:19-cv-00998
Nature of Suit365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Case Filed:Apr 24, 2019
Case in other court:Texas Western, 1:19-cv-00288
Last checked: Monday Oct 21, 2019 6:44 AM EDT
Defendant
3M COMPANY
Defendant
3M OCCUPATIONAL SAFETY LLC
Defendant
AEARO HOLDING LLC
Defendant
AEARO INTERMEDIATE LLC
Defendant
AEARO LLC
Defendant
AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC
Plaintiff
ANTHONY ROJAS
Represented By
MUHAMMAD SULEIMAN AZIZ
Abraham Watkins Nichols Sorrels Agosto & Aziz
contact info
MUHAMMAD S AZIZ
Abraham Watkins Nichols Etc - Houston Tx
contact info


Docket last updated: 19 minutes ago
Wednesday, December 04, 2019
16 16 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 12/04 9:25 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by CHARLES FRANKLIN BEALL, JR on behalf of All Defendants (BEALL, CHARLES)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 04, 2019
15 15 cmp Amended Complaint Mon 11/04 12:10 PM
Short Form Complaint AMENDED COMPLAINT Short Form Complaint against All Defendants All Defendants., filed by ANTHONY ROJAS. (AZIZ, MUHAMMAD)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 21, 2019
14 14 service Summons Issued Wed 08/21 9:51 AM
Summons Issued as to 3M OCCUPATIONAL SAFETY LLC, AEARO HOLDING LLC, AEARO INTERMEDIATE LLC, AEARO LLC, AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC. (djb)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 20, 2019
13 13 cmp Amended Complaint Tue 08/20 3:59 PM
THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT and Jury Demand against All Defendants All Defendants., filed by ANTHONY ROJAS. (AZIZ, MUHAMMAD)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit,
Att: 2 Exhibit,
Att: 3 Exhibit,
Att: 4 Exhibit,
Att: 5 Exhibit
Tuesday, August 13, 2019
12 12 9 pgs order Order Tue 08/13 3:09 PM
ORDER - All individual plaintiffs whose cases are identified on Exhibit A are granted one final opportunity to file an amended complaint that names all defendants in the caption, as required by Rule 10(a), by August 20, 2019 . The amended complaints must be accompanied by properly completed summonses. Thereafter, the Clerk will sign and issue summonses for service of the operative complaints in each of the cases. No further amendments to these plaintiffs complaints will be allowed. Going forward, counsel is directed to comply with Rules 10(a) and 15(a) when filing new and/or amended complaints, which must be accompanied by properly completed summonses. Failure to do so may result in sanctions, including dismissal. Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 8/13/2019. (djb)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 26, 2019
11 11 cmp Amended Complaint Fri 07/26 4:51 PM
Second AMENDED COMPLAINT and Jury Demand against 3M OCCUPATIONAL SAFETY LLC, filed by ANTHONY ROJAS. (AZIZ, MUHAMMAD)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Summons
Thursday, July 25, 2019
10 10 service Summons Issued Thu 07/25 3:36 PM
Summons Issued as to Aearo Holdings, LLC, #1 AEARO INTERMEDIATE LLC, #2 AEARO LLC, #3 AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC. (djb)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 24, 2019
9 9 misc Docket Annotation Wed 07/24 7:34 AM
DOCKET ANNOTATION BY COURT: The parties were added to the docket incorrectly and will have to be corrected by the clerk. Party names are to be entered in ALL CAPS and without punctuation. For future reference: Please review the procedure for adding/creating new parties in the "Style Guide for Electronic Case Filing" and/or chapter 10 of the "CM/ECF Attorney User's Guide," available at www.flnd.uscourts.gov. (djb)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 23, 2019
8 8 cmp Amended Complaint Tue 07/23 4:53 PM
First AMENDED COMPLAINT and Jury Demand against Aearo Holdings, LLC, Aearo Technologies, LLC, Aearo, LLC, Aearo Intermediate, LLC, filed by ANTHONY ROJAS. (AZIZ, MUHAMMAD)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Summons,
Att: 2 Exhibit Summons,
Att: 3 Exhibit Summons,
Att: 4 Exhibit Summons
Friday, June 28, 2019
7 7 service Summons Returned Executed Fri 06/28 2:50 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by ANTHONY ROJAS. 3M COMPANY served on 6/26/2019, answer due 7/17/2019. (AZIZ, MUHAMMAD)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 21, 2019
6 6 service Summons Issued Fri 06/21 9:11 AM
Summons Issued as to 3M COMPANY. (djb)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 20, 2019
5 5 notice Notice - Other - See Separate Menu for Ntc of Appeal Options Thu 06/20 4:43 PM
NOTICE re: Issuance of Summons by ANTHONY ROJAS (AZIZ, MUHAMMAD)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 24, 2019
4 4 transfer Case Transferred In - District Transfer (COURT USE ONLY) Wed 04/24 10:50 AM
Case transferred in from District of Texas Western; Case Number 1:19-cv-00288. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
Related: [-]
Friday, April 19, 2019
3 3 Conditional Transfer Order entered by the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation transferring case to the Northern District of Florida. Signed by John W. Nichols, Clerk of the Panel. (td) [Transferred from Texas Western on 4/24/2019.]
Related: [-]
Monday, March 18, 2019
2 2 Pro Hac Vice Letter to Mark A. Metzger, III as to Anthony Rojas. (klw) [Transferred from Texas Western on 4/24/2019.]
Related: [-]
1 1 COMPLAINT and Jury Demand ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0542-11888916). No Summons requested at this time, filed by Anthony Rojas.(Aziz, Muhammad) (Attachment 2 replaced on 3/18/2019) (klw). [Transferred from Texas Western on 4/24/2019.]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet
DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Anthony Rojas. (klw) [Transferred from Texas Western on 4/24/2019.]
Related: [-]
Case assigned to Judge Robert Pitman. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (klw) [Transferred from Texas Western on 4/24/2019.]
Related: [-]