Satanic Temple, The v. Belle Plaine, City of et al
Minnesota District Court | |
Judge: | Wilhelmina M Wright |
Referred: | John F Docherty |
Case #: | 0:19-cv-01122 |
Nature of Suit | 440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights |
Cause | 42:1983 Civil Rights Act |
Case Filed: | Apr 25, 2019 |
Terminated: | Sep 15, 2021 |
Last checked: Tuesday Oct 22, 2019 3:55 AM CDT |
Defendant
Councilman Paul Chard
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
City of Belle Plaine, Minnesota
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Councilman Cary Coop
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Councilwoman Theresa McDaniel
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Mayor Christopher Meyer
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Councilman Ben Stier
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Satanic Temple, The
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/26/2024 11:59 PM CDT |
Wednesday, September 20, 2023 | ||
125 | 125
appeal
USCA Mandate
Wed 09/20 2:00 PM
MANDATE of USCA (electronic copy) as to110 Notice of Appeal to 8th Circuit filed by Satanic Temple, The. (ACH) |