Seventh Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals
Case #: 0:19-pr-01795
Typeprisoner / state / statehabeascorpus
Nature of Suit530 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - General
Case Filed:Apr 25, 2019
Terminated:Aug 12, 2020
Appellant
Christine Brannon
Appellant
Stephanie Dorethy
Appellee
Shan Fieldman

GPO Aug 12 2020
Filed opinion of the court by Judge Kanne. AFFIRMED. Joel M. Flaum, Circuit Judge; Daniel A. Manion, Circuit Judge and Michael S. Kanne, Circuit Judge. [7100558-1] [7100558] [19-1795]

Docket last updated: 10/18/2020 12:36 PM CDT
Thursday, April 25, 2019
1 1 State prisoner's habeas corpus case docketed. Fee paid. Transcript information sheet due by 05/09/2019. Docketing Statement due for Appellant Stephanie Dorethy by 05/01/2019. Appellant's brief due on or before 06/04/2019 for Stephanie Dorethy. [1] [7000531] 19-1795 (AD) [Entered: 04/25/2019 11:53 AM]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 41 pgs State Habeas Corpus Case
Att: 2 2 pgs Attorney / Party Notice of Docketing
Att: 3 1 pgs Notice to District Court
2 2 2 pgs Appearance form filed by Attorney Eldad Z. Malamuth for Appellant Stephanie Dorethy. [2] [7000542] (L-No; E-Yes; R-No) 19-1795 (Malamuth, Eldad) [Entered: 04/25/2019 12:23 PM]
Related: [-]