JOHNSTON v 3M COMPANY
Consolidated
Lead case: 3:19-md-02885
Lead case: 3:19-md-02885
Florida Northern District Court | |
Judge: | M Casey Rodgers |
Referred: | Gary R Jones |
Case #: | 3:19-cv-01049 |
Nature of Suit | 365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability |
Case Filed: | Apr 26, 2019 |
Terminated: | May 04, 2022 |
Case in other court: | Texas Western, 1:19-cv-00153 |
Last checked: Wednesday Oct 23, 2019 5:07 AM EDT |
Defendant
3M COMPANY
|
|
Defendant
3M OCCUPATIONAL SAFETY LLC
|
|
Defendant
AEARO HOLDING LLC
|
|
Defendant
AEARO INTERMEDIATE LLC
|
|
Defendant
AEARO LLC
|
|
Defendant
AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC
|
|
Plaintiff
JOSEPH JOHNSTON
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 73 minutes ago |
Wednesday, May 04, 2022 | ||
13 | 13
![]() ORDER. The plaintiffs' cases identified on Exhibit A are hereby DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE for failure to comply with Court orders. The Clerk is directed to enter a copy of this Order on the individual dockets only, and then to close the cases in their entirety for all purposes. Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 5/4/2022. (erl) |
|
Monday, November 04, 2019 | ||
12 | 12
![]() Short Form Complaint AMENDED COMPLAINT Short Form Complaint against All Defendants All Defendants., filed by JOSEPH JOHNSTON. (AZIZ, MUHAMMAD) |
|
Tuesday, August 20, 2019 | ||
11 | 11
![]() Summons Issued as to 3M OCCUPATIONAL SAFETY LLC. (sdw) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Att: 3
![]() |
||
Att: 4
![]() |
||
10 | 10
![]() Second AMENDED COMPLAINT and Jury Demand against All Defendants All Defendants., filed by JOSEPH JOHNSTON. (AZIZ, MUHAMMAD) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Att: 3
![]() |
||
Att: 4
![]() |
||
Att: 5
![]() |
||
Tuesday, August 13, 2019 | ||
9 | 9
![]() ORDER - All individual plaintiffs whose cases are identified on Exhibit A are granted one final opportunity to file an amended complaint that names all defendants in the caption, as required by Rule 10(a), by August 20, 2019 . The amended complaints must be accompanied by properly completed summonses. Thereafter, the Clerk will sign and issue summonses for service of the operative complaints in each of the cases. No further amendments to these plaintiffs complaints will be allowed. Going forward, counsel is directed to comply with Rules 10(a) and 15(a) when filing new and/or amended complaints, which must be accompanied by properly completed summonses. Failure to do so may result in sanctions, including dismissal. Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 8/13/2019. (djb) |
|
Wednesday, July 24, 2019 | ||
8 | 8
![]() First AMENDED COMPLAINT and Jury Demand against 3M OCCUPATIONAL SAFETY LLC, AEARO HOLDING LLC, AEARO INTERMEDIATE LLC, AEARO LLC, AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC, filed by JOSEPH JOHNSTON. (AZIZ, MUHAMMAD) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Att: 3
![]() |
||
Att: 4
![]() |
||
Att: 5
![]() |
||
Tuesday, June 25, 2019 | ||
7 | 7
![]() SUMMONS Returned Executed by JOSEPH JOHNSTON. 3M COMPANY served on 6/24/2019, answer due 7/15/2019. (AZIZ, MUHAMMAD) |
|
Wednesday, June 19, 2019 | ||
6 | 6
![]() Summons Issued as to 3M COMPANY. (djb) |
|
5 | 5
![]() NOTICE re: Issuance of Summons by JOSEPH JOHNSTON (AZIZ, MUHAMMAD) |
|
Tuesday, May 28, 2019 | ||
4 | 4
![]() ORDER - More than 90 days have elapsed since the complaints were filed and no waiver of service or executed proof of service have been filed. All individual plaintiffs whose cases are identified in Exhibit A are directed to accomplish service and file proof of service with the Court in accordance with Rule 4 by Friday, June 28, 2019. Failure to comply with this directive will result in dismissal of a case without prejudice. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(m). Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 5/28/2019. (Service Deadline - by 6/28/2019 .) (djb) |
|
Friday, April 26, 2019 | ||
3 | 3
![]() Case transferred in from District of Texas Western; Case Number 1:19-cv-00153. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. |
|
Friday, April 19, 2019 | ||
2 | 2
![]() |
|
Tuesday, February 19, 2019 | ||
1 | 1
![]() |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Case assigned to Judge Robert Pitman. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (afd) [Transferred from Texas Western on 4/26/2019.] | ||
DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Joseph Johnston. (afd) [Transferred from Texas Western on 4/26/2019.] |