Consolidated
Lead case: 3:19-md-02885

Florida Northern District Court
Judge:M Casey Rodgers
Referred: Gary R Jones
Case #: 3:19-cv-01100
Nature of Suit365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Case Filed:Apr 26, 2019
Case in other court:Minnesota, 0:19-cv-00730
Last checked: Wednesday Oct 23, 2019 4:20 AM EDT
Defendant
3M COMPANY
Represented By
CHARLES FRANKLIN BEALL, JR.
Moore Hill & Westmoreland Pa - Pensacola Fl
contact info
MONICA L. DAVIES
Monica Davies
contact info
BENJAMIN W HULSE
Blackwell Burke PA
contact info
JERRY W BLACKWELL
Blackwell Burke PA
contact info
Plaintiff
ANDREW CHIDLEY
Represented By
Yvonne M Flaherty
Lockridge Grindal Nauen Pllp
contact info
WILLIAM MICHAEL MORELAND
Clark Love & Hutson Gp - Houston Tx
contact info
SHELLEY VAN NATTER HUTSON
Clark Love & Hutson Gp - Houston Tx
contact info
CLAYTON A CLARK
Clark Love & Hutson Gp - Houston Tx
contact info
YVONNE FLAHERTY
Lockridge Grindal Nauen Pllp
contact info
SCOTT A LOVE
Clark Love & Hutson Gp - Houston Tx
contact info


Docket last updated: 3 hours ago
Tuesday, October 29, 2019
15 15 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Tue 10/29 2:19 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by ANDREW CHIDLEY (HUTSON, SHELLEY)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 15, 2019
14 14 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 10/15 2:39 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by CHARLES FRANKLIN BEALL, JR on behalf of 3M COMPANY (BEALL, CHARLES)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 30, 2019
13 13 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 04/30 1:37 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by SHELLEY VAN NATTER HUTSON on behalf of ANDREW CHIDLEY (HUTSON, SHELLEY)
Related: [-]
12 12 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 04/30 1:31 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by WILLIAM MICHAEL MORELAND on behalf of ANDREW CHIDLEY (MORELAND, WILLIAM)
Related: [-]
11 11 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 04/30 1:24 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by SCOTT A LOVE on behalf of ANDREW CHIDLEY (LOVE, SCOTT)
Related: [-]
10 10 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 04/30 1:12 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by CLAYTON A CLARK on behalf of ANDREW CHIDLEY (CLARK, CLAYTON)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 26, 2019
9 9 transfer Case Transferred In - District Transfer (COURT USE ONLY) Fri 04/26 1:48 PM
Case transferred in from District of Minnesota; Case Number 0:19-cv-00730. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 17, 2019
8 8 CERTIFIED COPY OF CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-3) from the Judicial Panel on Multi-District Litigation; transferring case to the Northern District of Florida for coordinated or consolidated pretrial proceedings. Case assigned to Judge M. Casey Rodgers. Associated Cases: 0:19-cv-00662-JRT-KMM et al.(KDS) [Transferred from Minnesota on 4/26/2019.]
Related: [-]
Saturday, April 13, 2019
7 7 (Text-only) ORDER STAYING CASE: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that these proceedings are stayed in their entirety, including, without limitation, Defendant's obligation to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint, until such time as the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation determines whether this matter will be transferred to an MDL and, if so, in what jurisdiction. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Katherine M. Menendez on 4/13/2019. (KAT) [Transferred from Minnesota on 4/26/2019.]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 09, 2019
6 6 STIPULATION to Stay Proceedings Pending Transfer to MDL by 3M Company. Jointly Signed by Andrew Childley. (Hulse, Benjamin) [Transferred from Minnesota on 4/26/2019.]
Related: [-]
Friday, March 22, 2019
5 5 ORDER OF REASSIGNMENT OF RELATED CASES. Case reassigned to Chief Judge John R. Tunheim and Magistrate Judge Katherine M. Menendez for all further proceedings. Judge Susan Richard Nelson, Magistrate Judge Steven E. Rau no longer assigned to case. NOTE: the new case number is 19-cv-730 JRT/KMM . Please use this case number for all subsequent pleadings. Signed by Chief Judge John R. Tunheim, Judge Paul A. Magnuson, Judge Joan N. Ericksen, Judge David S. Doty, Judge Nancy E. Brasel, Judge Susan Richard Nelson, and Judge Eric C. Tostrud on 3/20/2019. Signed by Judge Michael J. Davis on 3/22/19.(kt) [Transferred from Minnesota on 4/26/2019.]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 19, 2019
4 4 Summons Issued as to 3M Company. (lmb) [Transferred from Minnesota on 4/26/2019.]
Related: [-]
3 3 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Susan Richard Nelson per Civil (3rd, 4th - Master) list, referred to Magistrate Judge Steven E. Rau. Please use case number 19-cv-730 SRN/SER. (lmb) [Transferred from Minnesota on 4/26/2019.]
Related: [-]
2 2 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: Notice re: Non-Admitted Attorney We have received documents listing Clayton A. Clark, Scott A. Love, W. Michael Moreland as counsel of record. If he or she wishes to be listed as an attorney of record in this case, he or she must be admitted to the bar of the U.S. District Court of Minnesota in accordance with [LINK:Local Rule 83.5 (a), (b) and (c)] or temporarily admitted pro hac vice in accordance with [LINK:Local Rule 83.5 (d) or (e)] . For more admissions information and forms, please see the Attorney Forms Section of the courts website at [LINK:href=http://www.mnd.uscourts.gov/FORMS/court_forms.shtml#attorneyforms] [LINK:. (lmb) [Transferred from Minnesota on 4/26/2019.]
Related: [-]
Monday, March 18, 2019
1 1 COMPLAINT against 3M Company (filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMNDC-6740497) filed by Andrew Chidley. Filer requests summons issued. (Flaherty, Yvonne) [Transferred from Minnesota on 4/26/2019.]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet