SOLIS v 3M COMPANY et al
Consolidated
Lead case: 3:19-md-02885
Lead case: 3:19-md-02885
Florida Northern District Court | |
Judge: | M Casey Rodgers |
Referred: | Gary R Jones |
Case #: | 3:19-cv-01131 |
Nature of Suit | 365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability |
Case Filed: | Apr 26, 2019 |
Case in other court: | Minnesota, 0:19-cv-00638 |
Last checked: Wednesday Oct 23, 2019 4:38 AM EDT |
Defendant
3M COMPANY
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC
|
|
Plaintiff
SHENNY SOLIS
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 05/01/2025 11:59 PM EDT |
Tuesday, October 29, 2019 | ||
7 | 7
![]() Short Form AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants All Defendants., filed by SHENNY SOLIS. (PAUL, RICHARD) |
|
Thursday, May 30, 2019 | ||
6 | 6
![]() NOTICE of Appearance by ASHLEA SCHWARZ on behalf of SHENNY SOLIS (SCHWARZ, ASHLEA) |
|
5 | 5
![]() NOTICE of Appearance by RICHARD M PAUL, III on behalf of SHENNY SOLIS (PAUL, RICHARD) |
|
Friday, April 26, 2019 | ||
4 | 4
![]() Case transferred in from District of Minnesota; Case Number 0:19-cv-00638. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. |
|
Tuesday, April 23, 2019 | ||
3 | 3
![]() |
|
Tuesday, March 12, 2019 | ||
2 | 2
![]() |
|
Monday, March 11, 2019 | ||
1 | 1
![]() |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Att: 3
![]() |
||
Att: 4
![]() |
||
Att: 5
![]() |
||
Att: 6
![]() |
||
Att: 7
![]() |
||
Att: 8
![]() |