Consolidated
Lead case: 3:19-md-02885

Florida Northern District Court
Judge:M Casey Rodgers
Referred: Gary R Jones
Case #: 3:19-cv-01132
Nature of Suit365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Case Filed:Apr 26, 2019
Case in other court:Minnesota, 0:19-cv-00640
Last checked: Wednesday Oct 23, 2019 5:15 AM EDT
Defendant
3M COMPANY
Represented By
BENJAMIN W HULSE
Blackwell Burke PA
contact info
Defendant
AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC
Plaintiff
FRANK SOUTHER
Represented By
MATTHEW JAMES BARBER
Schwebel, Goetz & Sieben
contact info
ALICIA N SIEBEN
Schwebel, Goetz & Sieben
contact info
ASHLEA SCHWARZ
Paul Llp - Kansas City Mo
contact info
RICHARD M PAUL, III
Paul Llp - Kansas City Mo
contact info
WILLIAM R SIEBEN
Schwebel Goetz & Sieben, P.A.
contact info


Docket last updated: 10 hours ago
Tuesday, October 29, 2019
7 7 cmp Amended Complaint Tue 10/29 10:56 AM
Short Form AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants All Defendants., filed by FRANK SOUTHER. (PAUL, RICHARD)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 30, 2019
6 6 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 05/30 3:58 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by ASHLEA SCHWARZ on behalf of FRANK SOUTHER (SCHWARZ, ASHLEA)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 05/30 3:12 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by RICHARD M PAUL, III on behalf of FRANK SOUTHER (PAUL, RICHARD)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 26, 2019
4 4 transfer Case Transferred In - District Transfer (COURT USE ONLY) Fri 04/26 3:36 PM
Case transferred in from District of Minnesota; Case Number 0:19-cv-00640. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 23, 2019
3 3 CERTIFIED COPY OF CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-3)from the Judicial Panel on Multi-District Litigation; transferring case to the Northern District of Florida for coordinated or consolidated pretrial proceedings. Case assigned to Judge Judge M. Casey Rogers. Associated Cases: 0:19-cv-00635-JRT-KMM et al.(CLK) [Transferred from Minnesota on 4/26/2019.]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 12, 2019
2 2 Copy of ORDER TO SEVER Plaintiffs, Originally filed in 19-cv-468 (JRT/KMM). Signed by Chief Judge John R. Tunheim on 3/11/2019. (lmb) [Transferred from Minnesota on 4/26/2019.]
Related: [-]
Monday, March 11, 2019
1 1 COMPLAINT against 3M Company, Aearo Technologies, LLC. No summons requested. Case assigned to Chief Judge John R. Tunheim per Civil (3rd, 4th - Master) list, referred to Magistrate Judge Katherine M. Menendez. (lmb) [Transferred from Minnesota on 4/26/2019.]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit(s) A,
Att: 2 Exhibit(s) B,
Att: 3 Exhibit(s) C,
Att: 4 Exhibit(s) D,
Att: 5 Exhibit(s) E,
Att: 6 Exhibit(s) F,
Att: 7 Exhibit(s) G,
Att: 8 Civil Cover Sheet