Consolidated
Lead case: 3:19-md-02885

Florida Northern District Court
Judge:M Casey Rodgers
Referred: Gary R Jones
Case #: 3:19-cv-01142
Nature of Suit365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Case Filed:Apr 26, 2019
Case in other court:Minnesota, 0:19-cv-00649
Last checked: Wednesday Oct 23, 2019 4:50 AM EDT
Defendant
3M COMPANY
Represented By
JERRY W BLACKWELL
Blackwell Burke PA
contact info
S Jamal Faleel
Blackwell Burke PA
contact info
BENJAMIN W HULSE
Blackwell Burke PA
contact info
Defendant
AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC
Represented By
Faris Rashid
Greene Espel Pllp
contact info
Plaintiff
RYAN BUTTERS
Represented By
ALICIA N SIEBEN
Schwebel, Goetz & Sieben
contact info
MATTHEW JAMES BARBER
Schwebel, Goetz & Sieben
contact info
WILLIAM R SIEBEN
Schwebel Goetz & Sieben, P.A.
contact info


Docket last updated: 8 hours ago
Wednesday, January 22, 2020
9 9 17 pgs order Order Thu 01/23 9:33 AM
AMENDED ORDER - For the foregoing reasons, the Court finds that Defendants have satisfied the requirements for removal under § 1442(a)(1) and that it has subject matter jurisdiction over Plaintiffs' claims. Accordingly: (1.) Plaintiffs motions to remand are DENIED. The Clerk is directed to enter a copy of this amended order on the master docket for the MDL, and also on the individual dockets for Minnesota cases in which motions to remand were pending on January 13, 2020. (2.) The Clerk is further directed to sever the Minnesota multi-plaintiff actions as follows: all plaintiffs, except for the first-named plaintiff, are hereby DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE, with the right to refile an individual short complaint in the approved form for the MDL at ECF NO. 705. The filing fee will be waived for any Minnesota plaintiff who is severed pursuant to this order and who timely files a short form complaint within 30 days of the dismissal without prejudice. The provisions of Pretrial Order No. 16, ECF No. 761, govern the severance process. (3.) All other deadlines applicable to 3M MDL plaintiffs--including census obligations--are now reinstated as to the Minnesota plaintiffs. Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 1/22/2020. (djb)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 04, 2019
8 8 motion Remand Wed 12/04 3:52 PM
MOTION to Remand by RYAN BUTTERS. (PAUL, RICHARD)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memorandum in Support
utility Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings Thu 12/05 7:25 AM
Set Deadlines as to8 MOTION to Remand . (Internal deadline for referral to judge if response not filed earlier: 12/18/2019) . (djb)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 28, 2019
7 7 cmp Amended Complaint Mon 10/28 1:36 PM
Short Form AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants All Defendants., filed by RYAN BUTTERS. (PAUL, RICHARD)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 26, 2019
6 6 transfer Case Transferred In - District Transfer (COURT USE ONLY) Fri 04/26 4:12 PM
Case transferred in from District of Minnesota; Case Number 0:19-cv-00649. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 23, 2019
5 5 CERTIFIED COPY OF CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-3)from the Judicial Panel on Multi-District Litigation; transferring case to the Northern District of Florida for coordinated or consolidated pretrial proceedings. Case assigned to Judge Judge M. Casey Rogers. Associated Cases: 0:19-cv-00635-JRT-KMM et al.(CLK) [Transferred from Minnesota on 4/26/2019.]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 20, 2019
4 4 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Aearo LLC is a corporate parent of Defendant Aearo Technologies LLC. 3M Company is a publicly-held corporation owning 10 percent or more of stock of Defendant Aearo Technologies LLC. (Rashid, Faris) [Transferred from Minnesota on 4/26/2019.]
Related: [-]
3 3 NOTICE by Aearo Technologies LLC re1 Notice of Removal,, CONSENT TO REMOVAL (Rashid, Faris) [Transferred from Minnesota on 4/26/2019.]
Related: [-]
Monday, March 11, 2019
2 2 Copy of ORDER TO SEVER Plaintiffs, Originally filed in 19-cv-647-JRT-KMM. Signed by Chief Judge John R. Tunheim on 3/11/2019. (lmb) [Transferred from Minnesota on 4/26/2019.]
Related: [-]
1 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Hennepin County District Court, case number 27-cv 19-1412 and 27-cv 19-2017 filed by 3M Company. No summons requested. Case assigned to Chief Judge John R. Tunheim per Civil (3rd, 4th - Master) list, referred to Magistrate Judge Katherine M. Menendez. (lmb) [Transferred from Minnesota on 4/26/2019.]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Summons and Complaint with Exhibits,
Att: 2 State Court Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 3 State Court Affidavits of Service,
Att: 4 State Court Order,
Att: 5 Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal,
Att: 6 Civil Cover Sheet