Texas Eastern District Court
Judge:Rodney Gilstrap
Referred: Roy S Payne
Case #: 2:19-cv-00139
Nature of Suit710 Labor - Fair Labor Standards Act
Cause15:1938 Fair Labor Standards Act
Case Filed:Apr 26, 2019
Terminated:Sep 03, 2020
Last checked: Wednesday Oct 23, 2019 4:03 AM CDT
Defendant
Kenneth Barnes
Represented By
Shahin Eghbal
Mccathern, Pllc - Dallas
contact info
Hossain Arnold Shokouhi
Mccathern, Pllc - Dallas
contact info
James Eamonn Sherry
Mccathern, Pllc - Dallas
contact info
Defendant
Dallas County Adjusters, Inc.
Represented By
Shahin Eghbal
Mccathern, Pllc - Dallas
contact info
Hossain Arnold Shokouhi
Mccathern, Pllc - Dallas
contact info
James Eamonn Sherry
Mccathern, Pllc - Dallas
contact info
Plaintiff
Joshua Blair
Represented By
Meredith Black-Mathews
Powers Taylor Llp - Dallas
contact info
Corinna P Chandler
Chandler Law Pc - Dallas
contact info
Jesse Hamilton Forester
Forester Haynie Pllc - Dallas
contact info

GPO Dec 09 2019
ORDER re 35 Report and Recommendations, 36 Report and Recommendations After consideration of the briefing on Defendants Transfer and Dismissal Motions, the R&Rs, and Defendants Objections to the R&Rs, the Court concludes that the objections are without sufficient merit. For that reason the Transfer Motion and Dismissal Motion are both hereby DENIED. Signed by District Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 12/9/2019. (ch, )

Docket last updated: 05/15/2025 11:59 PM CDT
Thursday, September 03, 2020
56 56 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Dismiss Thu 09/03 8:45 AM
ORDER granting55 JOINT MOTION TO DISMISS WITH PREJUDICE. Signed by District Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 9/3/2020. (ch, )
Related: [-]
Monday, August 31, 2020
55 55 motion Dismiss Mon 08/31 9:27 AM
Joint MOTION to Dismiss JOINT MOTION TO DISMISS WITH PREJUDICE by Kenneth Barnes, Dallas County Adjusters, Inc..(Eghbal, Shahin)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 PROPOSED ORDER GRANTING THE PARTIES JOINT MOTION TO DISMISS WITH PREJUDICE