Arizona District Court
Judge:G Murray Snow
Case #: 2:19-cv-02679
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause28:1441 Petition for Removal- Civil Rights Act
Case Filed:Apr 26, 2019
Terminated:Oct 28, 2019
Case in other court:Maricopa County Superior Court, CV2019-004322
Last checked: Sunday Oct 04, 2020 2:41 AM MST
Defendant
Nick Alamshaw
Represented By
Lori Simpson Davis
Scottsdale City Attorneys Office
contact info
Diana Day
Office Of The Attorney General - Phoenix
contact info
Defendant
Cameron Bodrero
Represented By
Lori Simpson Davis
Scottsdale City Attorneys Office
contact info
Diana Day
Office Of The Attorney General - Phoenix
contact info
Defendant
Lee Campbell
Represented By
Lori Simpson Davis
Scottsdale City Attorneys Office
contact info
Diana Day
Office Of The Attorney General - Phoenix
contact info
Defendant
A Good
Represented By
Lori Simpson Davis
Scottsdale City Attorneys Office
contact info
Diana Day
Office Of The Attorney General - Phoenix
contact info
Defendant
Mason Martinez
Represented By
Lori Simpson Davis
Scottsdale City Attorneys Office
contact info
Diana Day
Office Of The Attorney General - Phoenix
contact info
Defendant
Mathew Miller
Represented By
Lori Simpson Davis
Scottsdale City Attorneys Office
contact info
Diana Day
Office Of The Attorney General - Phoenix
contact info
Defendant
Scottsdale, City of
Represented By
Lori Simpson Davis
Scottsdale City Attorneys Office
contact info
Diana Day
Office Of The Attorney General - Phoenix
contact info
Defendant
Ashley Yunck
Represented By
Lori Simpson Davis
Scottsdale City Attorneys Office
contact info
Diana Day
Office Of The Attorney General - Phoenix
contact info
Plaintiff
Burim Gashi
an individual 8311 E Via De Ventura, Apt. 2101
Scottsdale, AZ 85258
Represented By
David W Dow
Law Offices Of David W Dow PC
contact info
Jennifer Lauren Ghidotti
Dow Law Office
contact info

GPO Sep 23 2019
ORDER: Defendants' 14 Motion to Dismiss is GRANTED. Plaintiff's Complaint (Doc. 1-3) is dismissed with leave to amend. Plaintiff shall have 30 days to file an amended complaint from the date of this Order. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of the Court shall terminate this action on October 22, 2019, without further notice, if Plaintiff does not file an amended complaint. Signed by Chief Judge G Murray Snow on 9/20/19. (GMP)

Docket last updated: 05/15/2025 11:59 PM MST
Monday, October 28, 2019
26 26 minute_ord Minute Order ~Util - Terminate Civil Case Mon 10/28 10:12 AM
MINUTE ORDER: Pursuant to the Court's Order25 , Civil Case Terminated. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (KFZ)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 23, 2019
25 25 10 pgs order Order ~Util - Terminate Motions ~Util - Set Deadlines Mon 09/23 10:45 AM
ORDER: Defendants'14 Motion to Dismiss is GRANTED. Plaintiff's Complaint (Doc. 1-3) is dismissed with leave to amend. Plaintiff shall have 30 days to file an amended complaint from the date of this Order. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of the Court shall terminate this action on October 22, 2019, without further notice, if Plaintiff does not file an amended complaint. Signed by Chief Judge G Murray Snow on 9/20/19. (GMP)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 17, 2019
24 24 7 pgs respm Response in Opposition to Motion Mon 06/17 6:30 AM
*SurRESPONSE in Opposition re:23 Reply to Response to Motion Related [+] filed by Burim Gashi. (Gashi, Burim) *Modified to correct event/linkage on 6/18/2019 (DXD).
Related: [-] sponse in Support Doc. 23
Wednesday, June 12, 2019
23 23 9 pgs respm Reply to Response to Motion Wed 06/12 5:45 PM
REPLY to Response to Motion re:14 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Nick Alamshaw, Cameron Bodrero, Lee Campbell, A Good, Mason Martinez, Mathew Miller, Scottsdale, City of, Ashley Yunck. (Day, Diana)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 10, 2019
22 22 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief Order on Motion to Allow Electronic Filing Mon 06/10 8:42 AM
ORDER granting21 Motion to Allow Electronic Filing in this case only. The party is required to complete the Electronic Case File Registration form to register as a user with the Clerk's Office and to register as a subscriber to PACER (Public Access to Electronic Records) within five (5) days of the date of this Order. See document for complete details. The Motion to File Non-Electronic Exhibits (Doc.20 ) is denied. Signed by Chief Judge G Murray Snow on 6/7/19. (DXD)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 05, 2019
17 17 order Vacate Hearing Wed 06/05 8:32 AM
In light of the pending Motion to Dismiss and no answer having been filed, IT IS ORDERED the Scheduling Conference and deadlines thereto, presently set for 7/19/19 at 9:00 a.m. before Judge Snow is VACATED. The Scheduling Conference will be reset, if necessary, after ruling on the pending motion. Ordered by Chief Judge G. Murray Snow. (GMS, ag) ( This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry.)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 04, 2019
21 21 motion Allow Electronic Filing Wed 06/05 4:14 PM
MOTION to Allow Electronic Filing by a Party Appearing Without an Attorney by Burim Gashi. (SST) (7 pages)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 2 pgs Proposed Order
20 20 1 pgs motion Miscellaneous Relief Wed 06/05 4:08 PM
MOTION to File Non-Electronic Exhibits re:19 Response to Motion by Burim Gashi. (SST) (1 page)
Related: [-]
19 19 27 pgs respm Response to Motion Wed 06/05 4:03 PM
RESPONSE to Motion re:14 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Burim Gashi. (SST) (225 pages)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 89 pgs Exhibits 1-9,
Att: 2 73 pgs Exhibits 10-17,
Att: 3 36 pgs Exhibits 18-28
18 18 1 pgs misc Request by Non-Prisoner Pro Se Party for Electronic Noticing Wed 06/05 3:57 PM
REQUEST BY NON-PRISONER PRO SE PARTY FOR ELECTRONIC NOTICING filed by Burim Gashi. Pro se parties must promptly notify the Clerks Office, in writing, if there is a change in designated e-mail address or mailing address. (SST)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 28, 2019
16 16 2 pgs order Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney Tue 05/28 2:08 PM
ORDER granting Plaintiff's13 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. David W. Dow, Jennifer L. Ghidotti and the Dow Law Office are hereby withdrawn as counsel of record. See document for complete details. Signed by Chief Judge G Murray Snow on 5/28/19. (MSA)
Related: [-]
15 15 2 pgs notice Notice (Other) Tue 05/28 1:25 PM
NOTICE re: Certificate of Conferral by Nick Alamshaw, Cameron Bodrero, Lee Campbell, A Good, Mason Martinez, Mathew Miller, Scottsdale, City of, Ashley Yunck re:14 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim . (Davis, Lori)
Related: [-]
14 14 14 pgs motion Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Tue 05/28 1:20 PM
MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Nick Alamshaw, Cameron Bodrero, Lee Campbell, A Good, Mason Martinez, Mathew Miller, Scottsdale, City of, Ashley Yunck.(Davis, Lori)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 8 pgs Exhibit 1,
Att: 2 58 pgs Exhibit 2 part 1,
Att: 3 10 pgs Exhibit 2 part 2,
Att: 4 7 pgs Exhibit 3 and 4
Friday, May 24, 2019
13 13 3 pgs motion Withdraw as Attorney Fri 05/24 3:42 PM
MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Burim Gashi.(Dow, David)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 1 pgs Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order,
Att: 2 2 pgs Exhibit Exhibit A
Monday, May 20, 2019
12 12 order MIDP - Order of Extension of Time to Answer Mon 05/20 2:36 PM
ORDER granting a one-time extension of time until 5/28/19 to respond to complaint. The parties' obligations to produce the information called for in the MIDP will be triggered by Defendant's answer to the complaint after the extension. No further extensions will be granted. Signed by Chief Judge G Murray Snow on 5/20/19. (DXD)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 17, 2019
11 11 3 pgs motion Continue Fri 05/17 3:03 PM
Joint MOTION to Continue Time to Confer and Respond to Complaint by Nick Alamshaw, Cameron Bodrero, Lee Campbell, A Good, Mason Martinez, Mathew Miller, Scottsdale, City of, Ashley Yunck.(Davis, Lori)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
Tuesday, May 07, 2019
10 10 1 pgs order Order Tue 05/07 11:49 AM
ORDER directing the Clerk to strike the Court's Order (Doc.6 ) filed in error. Signed by Chief Judge G Murray Snow on 5/7/19. (DXD)
Related: [-]
9 9 1 pgs misc Demand for Jury Trial by Plaintiff Tue 05/07 8:33 AM
PLAINTIFF'S DEMAND for Jury Trial by Burim Gashi. (Dow, David)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 02, 2019
8 8 6 pgs order Order ~Util - Set/Reset Hearings Thu 05/02 3:01 PM
ORDER - Rule 16 Case Management Conference set for 7/19/2019 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom 602, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Chief Judge G Murray Snow. Signed by Chief Judge G Murray Snow on 5/2/19. (DXD)
Related: [-]
7 7 order MIDP - Order of Extension of Time to Answer Thu 05/02 3:00 PM
ORDER granting a one-time extension of time until 5/17/19 to respond to complaint. No further extensions will be granted. Signed by Chief Judge G Murray Snow on 5/2/19. (DXD)
Related: [-]
6 6 6 pgs order Order ~Util - Set/Reset Hearings Thu 05/02 7:56 AM
ORDER - Rule 16 Case Management Conference set for 7/12/2019 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 602, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Chief Judge G Murray Snow. Signed by Chief Judge G Murray Snow on 5/1/19. (DXD)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 01, 2019
5 5 3 pgs misc Stipulation For Extension of Time To Answer Complaint Wed 05/01 4:57 PM
STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO ANSWER COMPLAINT by Nick Alamshaw, Cameron Bodrero, Lee Campbell, A Good, Mason Martinez, Mathew Miller, Scottsdale, City of, Ashley Yunck.(Davis, Lori)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 2 pgs Text of Proposed Order
Monday, April 29, 2019
4 4 2 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Deadlines Mon 04/29 2:33 PM
ORDER - The Clerk shall terminate any or all Defendants in this matter, without further notice, that have not been served within the time required by Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(m) on 7/26/2019. Signed by Chief Judge G Murray Snow on 4/29/19. (DXD)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 26, 2019
3 3 12 pgs notice Notice re Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP) Fri 04/26 3:56 PM
NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP) and this case is subject to that pilot. The key features and deadlines are set forth in the attached Notice which includes General Order 17-08. Also attached is a checklist for use by the parties. All parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the General Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the General Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the attached documents (Notice to Parties, including General Order 17-08 and MIDP Checklist) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (KEP)
Related: [-]
2 2 1 pgs misc New Case Opened Fri 04/26 3:56 PM
Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-16839112. This case has been assigned to the Honorable G. Murray Snow. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-19-2679_PHX-GMS. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (KEP)
Related: [-]
1 1 4 pgs cmp Notice of Removal Fri 04/26 3:49 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Maricopa County Superior Court, case number CV2019-004322. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-16839112 filed by Mason Martinez, Mathew Miller, A Good, Ashley Yunck, Scottsdale, City of, Lee Campbell, Cameron Bodrero, Nick Alamshaw. (Davis, Lori)(KEP)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 2 pgs Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 2 pgs Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 3 49 pgs Exhibit
service Service Executed Fri 04/26 3:55 PM
***STATE COURT RECORDS RECEIVED*** SERVICE EXECUTED : Affidavit of Service re: Summons, Complaint, Certificate Regarding Arbitration and Jury Trial Demand upon Scottsdale, City of, Mathew Miller, Cameron Bodrero, Nick Alamshaw, Mason Martinez, A. Good, Lee Campbell and Ashley Yunck on 3/26/2019. (Originals filed in Maricopa County Superior Court on 4/9/2019.(KEP) This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry.
Related: [-]