Connecticut District Court
Case #: 3:19-mj-00537
Case Filed:Mar 29, 2019
Terminated:Apr 02, 2019
Last checked: Sunday Apr 28, 2019 3:16 AM EDT
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Michael J. Gustafson
U.S. Attorney'S Office-Nh
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
Femi Felix-Ukwu (1)
Terminated: 04/02/2019
Represented By
Bethany Lynne Phillips
Butler, Norris & Gold
contact info


Docket last updated: 08/25/2020 3:49 PM EDT
Friday, March 29, 2019
Arrest (Rule 5) of Femi Felix-Ukwu (Wood, R.)
Related: [-]
1 1 2 pgs Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Donna F. Martinez:Initial Appearance in Rule 5 Proceedings as to Femi Felix-Ukwu held on 3/29/2019 Appearance entered by Bethany Lynne Phillips for Femi Felix-Ukwu on behalf of defendant., Bond Hearing as to Femi Felix-Ukwu held on 3/29/2019, Extradition Hearing as to Femi Felix-Ukwu held on 3/29/2019. The Court finds that the defendant does not qualify for the appointment of CJA counsel and that the defendant must reimburse the Court for attorney charged hours in this case. Time 21 minutes(Court Reporter FTR.)(Wood, R.)
Related: [-]
2 2 SEALED CJA 23 Financial Affidavit by Femi Felix-Ukwu (Wood, R.)
Related: [-]
3 3 1 pgs WAIVER of Rule 5 (c) (3) Hearings by Femi Felix-Ukwu (Wood, R.)
Related: [-]
4 4 1 pgs ORDER HOLDING DEFENDANT TO ANSWER AND TO APPEAR IN DISTRICT OF PROSECUTION OR DISTRICT HAVING PROBATION JURISDICTION as to Femi Felix-Ukwu Signed by Judge Donna F. Martinez on 3/29/19. (Wood, R.)
Related: [-]
5 5 1 pgs USM Return of Service on Arrest Warrant executed as to Femi Felix-Ukwu on 3/29/19 (Wood, R.)
Related: [-]