Consolidated
Lead case: 3:19-md-02885

Florida Northern District Court
Judge:M Casey Rodgers
Referred: Gary R Jones
Case #: 3:19-cv-01162
Nature of Suit365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Case Filed:Apr 29, 2019
Case in other court:Minnesota, 0:19-cv-00803
Last checked: Saturday Oct 26, 2019 4:23 AM EDT
Defendant
3M COMPANY
Represented By
JERRY W BLACKWELL
Blackwell Burke PA
contact info
BENJAMIN W HULSE
Blackwell Burke PA
contact info
MONICA L. DAVIES
Monica Davies
contact info
Defendant
AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC
Represented By
Faris Rashid
Greene Espel Pllp
contact info
Plaintiff
BRANDON LAHAY
Represented By
ERIN J ROGIERS
Watts Guerra Llp - San Antonio Tx
contact info
Lewis A Remele, Jr
Bassford Remele
contact info
CASEY D MARSHALL
Bassford Remele - Minneapolis Mn
contact info
Aram V. Desteian
Bassford Remele
contact info
Casey D Marshall
Bassford Remele, PA
contact info
ARAM V DESTEIAN
Bassford Remele - Minneapolis Mn
contact info
MIKAL WATTS
Watts Guerra Llp - San Antonio Tx
contact info
Brittany B Skemp
Bassford Remele, PA
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/02/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Monday, November 04, 2019
14 14 cmp Amended Complaint Mon 11/04 6:39 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT SHORT FORM against 3M COMPANY, AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC, filed by BRANDON LAHAY. (WATTS, MIKAL)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 10, 2019
13 13 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 05/10 1:19 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by ERIN J ROGIERS on behalf of BRANDON LAHAY (ROGIERS, ERIN)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 06, 2019
12 12 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 05/06 2:46 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by MIKAL WATTS on behalf of BRANDON LAHAY (WATTS, MIKAL)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 29, 2019
11 11 transfer Case Transferred In - District Transfer (COURT USE ONLY) Mon 04/29 11:23 AM
Case transferred in from District of Minnesota; Case Number 0:19-cv-00803. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 24, 2019
10 10 CERTIFIED COPY OF CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-3) from the Judicial Panel on Multi-District Litigation; transferring case to the Northern District of Florida for coordinated or consolidated pretrial proceedings. Case assigned to Judge M. Casey Rogers. Associated Cases: 0:19-cv-00782-JRT-KMM et al.(kt) [Transferred from Minnesota on 4/29/2019.]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 16, 2019
9 9 (Text-only) ORDER STAYING CASE: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that these proceedings are stayed in their entirety, including, without limitation, Defendants' obligation to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint, until such time as the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation determines whether this matter will be transferred to an MDL and, if so, in what jurisdiction. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Katherine M. Menendez on 4/16/2019. (KAT) [Transferred from Minnesota on 4/29/2019.]
Related: [-]
Monday, April 15, 2019
8 8 STIPULATION to Stay Proceeding Pending Transfer to MDL by 3M Company. Jointly Signed by Brandon Lahay, 3M Company, and Aearo Technologies LLC. (Hulse, Benjamin) [Transferred from Minnesota on 4/29/2019.]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 02, 2019
7 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Brandon Lahay. Aearo Technologies, LLC served on 3/25/2019, answer due 4/15/2019. Related [+] [Transferred from Minnesota on 4/29/2019.]
Related: [-] mele, Lewis
6 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Brandon Lahay. 3M Company served on 3/25/2019, answer due 4/15/2019. Related [+] [Transferred from Minnesota on 4/29/2019.]
Related: [-] mele, Lewis
Thursday, March 28, 2019
5 5 ORDER OF REASSIGNMENT OF RELATED CASES. Case reassigned to Chief Judge John R. Tunheim and Magistrate Judge Katherine M. Menendez for all further proceedings. Senior Judge Paul A. Magnuson, Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Cowan Wright no longer assigned to case. NOTE: the new case number is 19-cv-803 JRT/KMM . Please use this case number for all subsequent pleadings. Signed by Chief Judge John R. Tunheim, Judge Joan N. Ericksen, Judge Susan Richard Nelson, Judge Wilhelmina M. Wright, Judge Eric C. Tostrud on 3/26/2019 and by Judge Paul A. Magnuson on 3/27/2019. (kt) [Transferred from Minnesota on 4/29/2019.]
Related: [-]
Friday, March 22, 2019
4 4 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: Notice re: Non-Admitted Attorney We have received documents listing Mikal C. Watts, Francisco Guerra IV, Erin Rogiers, Paul Danziger, Rodrigo R. de Llano as counsel of record. If he or she wishes to be listed as an attorney of record in this case, he or she must be admitted to the bar of the U.S. District Court of Minnesota in accordance with [LINK:Local Rule 83.5 (a), (b) and (c)] or temporarily admitted pro hac vice in accordance with [LINK:Local Rule 83.5 (d) or (e)] . For more admissions information and forms, please see the Attorney Forms Section of the courts website at [LINK:href=http://www.mnd.uscourts.gov/FORMS/court_forms.shtml#attorneyforms] [LINK:. (KDS) [Transferred from Minnesota on 4/29/2019.]
Related: [-]
3 3 Summons Issued as to 3M Company, Aearo Technologies, LLC. (KDS) [Transferred from Minnesota on 4/29/2019.]
Related: [-]
2 2 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Paul A. Magnuson per Civil (3rd, 4th - Master) list, referred to Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Cowan Wright. Please use case number 19-cv-803 PAM/ECW. (KDS) [Transferred from Minnesota on 4/29/2019.]
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 21, 2019
1 1 COMPLAINT against 3M Company, Aearo Technologies, LLC (filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMNDC-6752245) filed by Brandon Lahay. Filer requests summons issued. Related [+] [Transferred from Minnesota on 4/29/2019.]
Related: [-] mele, Lewis
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet