Consolidated
Lead case: 3:19-md-02885

Florida Northern District Court
Judge:M Casey Rodgers
Referred: Gary R Jones
Case #: 3:19-cv-01166
Nature of Suit365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Case Filed:Apr 29, 2019
Terminated:Jun 08, 2020
Case in other court:Minnesota, 0:19-cv-00850
Last checked: Saturday Oct 26, 2019 5:44 AM EDT
Defendant
3M COMPANY
Plaintiff
SIDNEY BROWN
Represented By
ERIC S TAUBEL
Gustafson Gluek Pllc - Minneapolis Mn
contact info
KARLA M GLUEK
Gustafson Gluek Pllc - Minneapolis Mn
contact info
AMANDA MARIE WILLIAMS
Gustafson Gluek Pllc - Minneapolis Mn
contact info
DANIEL E GUSTAFSON
Gustafson Gluek Pllc - Minneapolis Mn
contact info


Docket last updated: 5 hours ago
Monday, June 08, 2020
14 14 3 pgs order Order Dismissing Case Mon 06/08 9:06 AM
ORDER - Plaintiff Sidney Brown's case is hereby DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE for failure to comply with Court orders. The Clerk is directed to close this case in its entirety for all purposes. Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 6/8/2020. (djb)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 22, 2020
utility Action Required by District Judge - No NEFs in SEALED Cases Wed 04/22 10:12 AM
ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re:13 Order,(short form complaint not filed) (djb)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 10, 2020
13 13 1 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings Fri 04/10 4:02 PM
ORDER - Accordingly, Mr. Brown was required to file a Short Form Complaint by May 20, 2019. See Case No. 3:19md2885, Pretrial Order No. 17, ECF No. 763. To date, no Short Form Complaint has been filed. On consideration, the Court will afford Mr. Brown another opportunity to file a Short Form Complaint by 4/17/2020 . Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 4/10/2020. (djb)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 18, 2020
utility Action Required by District Judge - No NEFs in SEALED Cases Wed 03/18 10:58 AM
ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re:8 Case Transferred In - District Transfer (amended short form complaint not filed) (djb)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 30, 2019
12 12 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 04/30 2:57 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by ERIC S TAUBEL on behalf of SIDNEY BROWN (TAUBEL, ERIC)
Related: [-]
11 11 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 04/30 2:50 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by AMANDA MARIE WILLIAMS on behalf of SIDNEY BROWN (WILLIAMS, AMANDA)
Related: [-]
10 10 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 04/30 2:41 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by KARLA M GLUEK on behalf of SIDNEY BROWN (GLUEK, KARLA)
Related: [-]
9 9 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 04/30 2:22 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by DANIEL E GUSTAFSON on behalf of SIDNEY BROWN (GUSTAFSON, DANIEL)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 29, 2019
8 8 transfer Case Transferred In - District Transfer (COURT USE ONLY) Mon 04/29 12:51 PM
Case transferred in from District of Minnesota; Case Number 0:19-cv-00850. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 24, 2019
7 7 CERTIFIED COPY OF CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-3) from the Judicial Panel on Multi-District Litigation; transferring case to the Northern District of Florida for coordinated or consolidated pretrial proceedings. Case assigned to Judge M. Casey Rogers. (kt) [Transferred from Minnesota on 4/29/2019.]
Related: [-]
Monday, April 01, 2019
5 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Sidney Brown. 3M Company served on 3/29/2019, answer due 4/19/2019. (Gustafson, Daniel) [Transferred from Minnesota on 4/29/2019.]
Related: [-]
Friday, March 29, 2019
6 6 ORDER OF REASSIGNMENT OF RELATED CASES. Case reassigned to Chief Judge John R. Tunheim and Magistrate Judge Katherine M. Menendez for all further proceedings. Senior Judge David S. Doty, Magistrate Judge Becky R. Thorson no longer assigned to case. NOTE: the new case number is 19-cv-850 JRT/KMM . Please use this case number for all subsequent pleadings. Signed by Chief Judge John R. Tunheim, Judge Patrick J. Schiltz, Judge David S. Doty on 3/29/2019(MMG) [Transferred from Minnesota on 4/29/2019.]
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 28, 2019
4 4 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: Notice re: Non-Admitted Attorney We have received documents listing Joseph G. Sauder, Matthew D. Schelkopf as counsel of record. If he or she wishes to be listed as an attorney of record in this case, he or she must be admitted to the bar of the U.S. District Court of Minnesota in accordance with [LINK:Local Rule 83.5 (a), (b) and (c)] or temporarily admitted pro hac vice in accordance with [LINK:Local Rule 83.5 (d) or (e)] . For more admissions information and forms, please see the Attorney Forms Section of the courts website at [LINK:href=http://www.mnd.uscourts.gov/FORMS/court_forms.shtml#attorneyforms] [LINK:. (MMG) [Transferred from Minnesota on 4/29/2019.]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 27, 2019
3 3 Summons Issued as to 3M Company. (MMG) [Transferred from Minnesota on 4/29/2019.]
Related: [-]
2 2 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge David S. Doty per 3rd/4th Master list, referred to Magistrate Judge Becky R. Thorson. Please use case number 19-cv-850 DSD/BRT. (MMG) [Transferred from Minnesota on 4/29/2019.]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 26, 2019
1 1 COMPLAINT against 3M Company (filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMNDC-6761885) filed by Sidney Brown. Filer requests summons issued. (Gustafson, Daniel) [Transferred from Minnesota on 4/29/2019.]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet