Consolidated
Lead case: 3:19-md-02885

Florida Northern District Court
Judge:M Casey Rodgers
Referred: Gary R Jones
Case #: 3:19-cv-01188
Nature of Suit365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability
Cause28:1446pl Petition for Removal - Product Liability
Case Filed:Apr 29, 2019
Case in other court:Minnesota, 0:19-cv-00978
Last checked: Saturday Oct 26, 2019 4:38 AM EDT
Defendant
3M COMPANY
Represented By
S Jamal Faleel
Blackwell Burke PA
contact info
BENJAMIN W HULSE
Blackwell Burke PA
contact info
JERRY W BLACKWELL
Blackwell Burke PA
contact info
MONICA L. DAVIES
Monica Davies
contact info
Defendant
AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC
Represented By
Faris Rashid
Greene Espel Pllp
contact info
Plaintiff
WALT EMBSER
Represented By
Brittany B Skemp
Bassford Remele, PA
contact info
Lewis A Remele, Jr
Bassford Remele
contact info
MIKAL WATTS
Watts Guerra Llp - San Antonio Tx
contact info
ARAM V DESTEIAN
Bassford Remele - Minneapolis Mn
contact info
CASEY D MARSHALL
Bassford Remele - Minneapolis Mn
contact info
ERIN J ROGIERS
Watts Guerra Llp - San Antonio Tx
contact info
Aram V. Desteian
Bassford Remele
contact info
Casey D Marshall
Bassford Remele, PA
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Plaintiff
SYLVESTER ALEONG
Terminated: 10/15/2019
Represented By
Brittany B Skemp
Bassford Remele, PA
contact info
Lewis A Remele, Jr
Bassford Remele
contact info
MIKAL WATTS
Watts Guerra Llp - San Antonio Tx
contact info
ARAM V DESTEIAN
Bassford Remele - Minneapolis Mn
contact info
ERIN J ROGIERS
Watts Guerra Llp - San Antonio Tx
contact info
Aram V. Desteian
Bassford Remele
contact info
Plaintiff
DUVAL HARVIN
Terminated: 10/15/2019
Represented By
Brittany B Skemp
Bassford Remele, PA
contact info
Lewis A Remele, Jr
Bassford Remele
contact info
MIKAL WATTS
Watts Guerra Llp - San Antonio Tx
contact info
ARAM V DESTEIAN
Bassford Remele - Minneapolis Mn
contact info
CASEY D MARSHALL
Bassford Remele - Minneapolis Mn
contact info
ERIN J ROGIERS
Watts Guerra Llp - San Antonio Tx
contact info
Aram V. Desteian
Bassford Remele
contact info
Casey D Marshall
Bassford Remele, PA
contact info
Plaintiff
IAN KIESSELBACH
Terminated: 10/15/2019
Represented By
Brittany B Skemp
Bassford Remele, PA
contact info
Lewis A Remele, Jr
Bassford Remele
contact info
MIKAL WATTS
Watts Guerra Llp - San Antonio Tx
contact info
ARAM V DESTEIAN
Bassford Remele - Minneapolis Mn
contact info
CASEY D MARSHALL
Bassford Remele - Minneapolis Mn
contact info
ERIN J ROGIERS
Watts Guerra Llp - San Antonio Tx
contact info
Aram V. Desteian
Bassford Remele
contact info
Casey D Marshall
Bassford Remele, PA
contact info
Plaintiff
JOSEPH LENT
Terminated: 10/15/2019
Represented By
Brittany B Skemp
Bassford Remele, PA
contact info
Lewis A Remele, Jr
Bassford Remele
contact info
MIKAL WATTS
Watts Guerra Llp - San Antonio Tx
contact info
ARAM V DESTEIAN
Bassford Remele - Minneapolis Mn
contact info
CASEY D MARSHALL
Bassford Remele - Minneapolis Mn
contact info
ERIN J ROGIERS
Watts Guerra Llp - San Antonio Tx
contact info
Aram V. Desteian
Bassford Remele
contact info
Casey D Marshall
Bassford Remele, PA
contact info
Plaintiff
HENRY STEELEY
Terminated: 10/15/2019
Represented By
Brittany B Skemp
Bassford Remele, PA
contact info
Lewis A Remele, Jr
Bassford Remele
contact info
MIKAL WATTS
Watts Guerra Llp - San Antonio Tx
contact info
ARAM V DESTEIAN
Bassford Remele - Minneapolis Mn
contact info
CASEY D MARSHALL
Bassford Remele - Minneapolis Mn
contact info
ERIN J ROGIERS
Watts Guerra Llp - San Antonio Tx
contact info
Aram V. Desteian
Bassford Remele
contact info
Casey D Marshall
Bassford Remele, PA
contact info
Plaintiff
ZACHARY TERSAK
Terminated: 10/15/2019
Represented By
Brittany B Skemp
Bassford Remele, PA
contact info
Lewis A Remele, Jr
Bassford Remele
contact info
MIKAL WATTS
Watts Guerra Llp - San Antonio Tx
contact info
ARAM V DESTEIAN
Bassford Remele - Minneapolis Mn
contact info
CASEY D MARSHALL
Bassford Remele - Minneapolis Mn
contact info
ERIN J ROGIERS
Watts Guerra Llp - San Antonio Tx
contact info
Aram V. Desteian
Bassford Remele
contact info
Casey D Marshall
Bassford Remele, PA
contact info
Plaintiff
STEPHEN WEAVER
Terminated: 10/15/2019
Represented By
Brittany B Skemp
Bassford Remele, PA
contact info
Lewis A Remele, Jr
Bassford Remele
contact info
MIKAL WATTS
Watts Guerra Llp - San Antonio Tx
contact info
ARAM V DESTEIAN
Bassford Remele - Minneapolis Mn
contact info
CASEY D MARSHALL
Bassford Remele - Minneapolis Mn
contact info
ERIN J ROGIERS
Watts Guerra Llp - San Antonio Tx
contact info
Aram V. Desteian
Bassford Remele
contact info
Casey D Marshall
Bassford Remele, PA
contact info
Plaintiff
JOHN ZELEZNIK
Terminated: 10/15/2019
Represented By
Brittany B Skemp
Bassford Remele, PA
contact info
Lewis A Remele, Jr
Bassford Remele
contact info
MIKAL WATTS
Watts Guerra Llp - San Antonio Tx
contact info
ARAM V DESTEIAN
Bassford Remele - Minneapolis Mn
contact info
CASEY D MARSHALL
Bassford Remele - Minneapolis Mn
contact info
ERIN J ROGIERS
Watts Guerra Llp - San Antonio Tx
contact info
Aram V. Desteian
Bassford Remele
contact info
Casey D Marshall
Bassford Remele, PA
contact info


Docket last updated: 1 hours ago
Thursday, November 21, 2019
14 14 cmp Amended Complaint Thu 11/21 5:10 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT -SHORT FORM- against 3M COMPANY, AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC, filed by WALT EMBSER. (WATTS, MIKAL)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 15, 2019
13 13 8 pgs order Order ~Util - Add and Terminate Parties Wed 10/16 9:27 AM
PRETRIAL ORDER NO. 16 MULTI-PLAINTIFF ACTIONS. All plaintiffs named in any multi-plaintiff complaint currently pending in this MDL, except derivative plaintiffs, will be severed. For multi-plaintiff actions in which no remand motion is currently pending, all plaintiffs, except for the first-named plaintiff, are hereby DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE, with the right to refile an individual short form complaint in the approved form, currently available on the master docket for the MDL at ECF No. 705. The Clerk is directed to file a copy of this Order on the master docket for the MDL, and also on the individual docket for each action refiled by a severed plaintiff pursuant to this Order, whether the action is direct filed in this district or transferred here by the Panel. Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 10/15/2019. IAN KIESSELBACH, JOSEPH LENT, HENRY STEELEY, ZACHARY TERSAK, STEPHEN WEAVER, JOHN ZELEZNIK, SYLVESTER ALEONG and DUVAL HARVIN terminated. (djb)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 10, 2019
12 12 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 05/10 1:16 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by ERIN J ROGIERS on behalf of All Plaintiffs (ROGIERS, ERIN)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 06, 2019
11 11 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 05/06 2:42 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by MIKAL WATTS on behalf of All Plaintiffs (WATTS, MIKAL)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 29, 2019
10 10 transfer Case Transferred In - District Transfer (COURT USE ONLY) Mon 04/29 3:10 PM
Case transferred in from District of Minnesota; Case Number 0:19-cv-00978. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 25, 2019
9 9 CERTIFIED COPY OF CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-5) transferring case to the Northern District of Florida per the MDL Panel for coordinated or consolidated pretrial proceedings. Case assigned to Judge M. Casey Rodgers. (kt) [Transferred from Minnesota on 4/29/2019.]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 16, 2019
8 8 STIPULATION to Stay Proceedings Pending Transfer to MDL by 3M Company. Jointly Signed by Walt Embser, et al. and Aearo Technologies LLC. (Hulse, Benjamin) [Transferred from Minnesota on 4/29/2019.]
Related: [-]
Friday, April 12, 2019
7 7 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Aearo LLC is a corporate parent of Defendant Aearo Technologies LLC. 3M Company is a publicly-held corporation owning 10 percent or more of stock of Defendant Aearo Technologies LLC. (Rashid, Faris) [Transferred from Minnesota on 4/29/2019.]
Related: [-]
6 6 NOTICE by Aearo Technologies LLC re1 Notice of Removal, CONSENT TO REMOVAL (Rashid, Faris) [Transferred from Minnesota on 4/29/2019.]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 09, 2019
5 5 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: Notice re: Non-Admitted Attorney We have received documents listing Mikal C. Watts, Francisco Guerra, Erin Rogiers, Paul Danziger, Rodrigo R. de Llano as counsel of record. If he or she wishes to be listed as an attorney of record in this case, he or she must be admitted to the bar of the U.S. District Court of Minnesota in accordance with [LINK:Local Rule 83.5 (a), (b) and (c)] or temporarily admitted pro hac vice in accordance with [LINK:Local Rule 83.5 (d) or (e)] . For more admissions information and forms, please see the Attorney Forms Section of the courts website at [LINK:href=http://www.mnd.uscourts.gov/FORMS/court_forms.shtml#attorneyforms] [LINK:. (MMP) [Transferred from Minnesota on 4/29/2019.]
Related: [-]
4 4 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Wilhelmina M. Wright per Civil 3rd, 4th Master list, referred to Magistrate Judge Becky R. Thorson. Please use case number 19-cv-978 (WMW/BRT). (MMP) [Transferred from Minnesota on 4/29/2019.]
Related: [-]
3 3 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by 3M Company re2 Rule 7.1 - Disclosure Statement,1 Notice of Removal, (Hulse, Benjamin) [Transferred from Minnesota on 4/29/2019.]
Related: [-]
2 2 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. There is no parent corporation, publicly held corporation or wholly-owned subsidiary to report for Defendant 3M Company. (Hulse, Benjamin) [Transferred from Minnesota on 4/29/2019.]
Related: [-]
1 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Fourth Judicial District, Hennepin County, case number 27-cv 19-4602 (filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMNDC-6795247) filed by 3M Company. No summons requested. (Hulse, Benjamin) [Transferred from Minnesota on 4/29/2019.]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Summons and Complaint,
Att: 2 Exhibit(s) State court letter to court re: jury fee,
Att: 3 Exhibit(s) State Order Companioning Cases,
Att: 4 Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal,
Att: 5 Civil Cover Sheet