DOWELL et al v. 3M COMPANY et al
Consolidated
Lead case: 3:19-md-02885
Lead case: 3:19-md-02885
Florida Northern District Court | |
Judge: | M Casey Rodgers |
Referred: | Gary R Jones |
Case #: | 3:19-cv-01206 |
Nature of Suit | 365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability |
Case Filed: | Apr 29, 2019 |
Case in other court: | Texas Western, 1:19-cv-00344 |
Last checked: Saturday Oct 26, 2019 5:47 AM EDT |
Defendant
3M COMPANY
|
|
Defendant
AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC
|
|
Plaintiff
DAVID DOWELL
|
Represented By
|
TERMINATED PARTIES | |
Plaintiff
ANDREW FELTHOUS
Terminated: 10/15/2019
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
PHILLIP HARRISON
Terminated: 10/15/2019
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
ERIC HARMON
Terminated: 10/15/2019
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
GARRETT GUTHRIE
Terminated: 10/15/2019
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
BRUCE GRIEGO
Terminated: 10/15/2019
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
JESUS GARZA
Terminated: 10/15/2019
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
ROGER GARCIA
Terminated: 10/15/2019
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
DAGOBERTO GALVAN
Terminated: 10/15/2019
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
JESUS FERNANDEZ-ARANADA
Terminated: 10/15/2019
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
JESSE FERNANDEZ
Terminated: 10/15/2019
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
PHILLIP EVANS
Terminated: 10/15/2019
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
GARY ELLIOTT
Terminated: 10/15/2019
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
EVAN EARLY
Terminated: 10/15/2019
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
BRYAN DUNCAN
Terminated: 10/15/2019
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 05/30/2023 11:59 PM EDT |
Thursday, November 21, 2019 | ||
10 | 10
cmp
Amended Complaint
Thu 11/21 5:39 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT -SHORT FORM- against 3M COMPANY, AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC, filed by DAVID DOWELL. (WATTS, MIKAL) |
|
Tuesday, October 15, 2019 | ||
9 | 9
8
pgs
order
Order ~Util - Add and Terminate Parties
Wed 10/16 9:30 AM
PRETRIAL ORDER NO. 16 MULTI-PLAINTIFF ACTIONS. All plaintiffs named in any multi-plaintiff complaint currently pending in this MDL, except derivative plaintiffs, will be severed. For multi-plaintiff actions in which no remand motion is currently pending, all plaintiffs, except for the first-named plaintiff, are hereby DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE, with the right to refile an individual short form complaint in the approved form, currently available on the master docket for the MDL at ECF No. 705. The Clerk is directed to file a copy of this Order on the master docket for the MDL, and also on the individual docket for each action refiled by a severed plaintiff pursuant to this Order, whether the action is direct filed in this district or transferred here by the Panel. Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 10/15/2019. GARY ELLIOTT, PHILLIP EVANS, ANDREW FELTHOUS, JESSE FERNANDEZ, JESUS FERNANDEZ-ARANADA, DAGOBERTO GALVAN, ROGER GARCIA, JESUS GARZA, BRUCE GRIEGO, GARRETT GUTHRIE, ERIC HARMON, PHILLIP HARRISON, BRYAN DUNCAN and EVAN EARLY terminated. (djb) |
|
Friday, May 10, 2019 | ||
8 | 8
notice
Notice of Appearance
Fri 05/10 1:14 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by ERIN J ROGIERS on behalf of All Plaintiffs (ROGIERS, ERIN) |
|
Monday, May 06, 2019 | ||
7 | 7
notice
Notice of Appearance
Mon 05/06 2:40 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by MIKAL WATTS on behalf of All Plaintiffs (WATTS, MIKAL) |
|
Monday, April 29, 2019 | ||
6 | 6
transfer
Case Transferred In - District Transfer (COURT USE ONLY)
Mon 04/29 4:16 PM
Case transferred in from District of Texas Western; Case Number 1:19-cv-00344. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. |
|
Thursday, April 25, 2019 | ||
Case transferred to Northern District of Florida. (mcda) [Transferred from Texas Western on 4/29/2019.] | ||
Friday, April 19, 2019 | ||
5 | 5 Conditional Transfer Order entered by the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation TRANSFERRING case to the United States District Court for the Northern District of Florida. Signed by John W. Nichols, Clerk of the Panel (mcda) [Transferred from Texas Western on 4/29/2019.] | |
Monday, March 25, 2019 | ||
4 | 4 Pro Hac Vice Letters mailed to Pail Danziger and Rodrigo R. de Llano for Plaintiffs re: non-admitted status. (cj) [Transferred from Texas Western on 4/29/2019.] | |
3 | 3 Summons Issued as to 3M Company, Aearo Technologies, LLC. (cj) [Transferred from Texas Western on 4/29/2019.] | |
Saturday, March 23, 2019 | ||
2 | 2 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by David Dowell, Bryan Duncan, Evan Early, Gary Elliott, Phillip Evans, Andrew Felthous, Jesse Fernandez, Jesus Fernandez-Aranada, Dagoberto Galvan, Roger Garcia, Jesus Garza, Bruce Griego, Garrett Guthrie, Eric Harmon, Phillip Harrison. (Sanford, Shelly) (Main Document 2 replaced and flattened on 3/25/2019) (cj). [Transferred from Texas Western on 4/29/2019.] | |
1 | 1 COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0542-11914522), filed by Jesus Garza, Jesse Fernandez, Bryan Duncan, David Dowell, Garrett Guthrie, Phillip Evans, Evan Early, Bruce Griego, Dagoberto Galvan, Eric Harmon, Phillip Harrison, Jesus Fernandez-Aranada, Gary Elliott, Roger Garcia, Andrew Felthous.(Sanford, Shelly) (Attachment 1 replaced and flattened on 3/25/2019) (cj). [Transferred from Texas Western on 4/29/2019.] | |
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet | ||
Case assigned to Judge Robert Pitman. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (cj) [Transferred from Texas Western on 4/29/2019.] | ||
DEMAND for Trial by Jury by David Dowell, Bryan Duncan, Evan Early, Gary Elliott, Phillip Evans, Andrew Felthous, Jesse Fernandez, Jesus Fernandez-Aranada, Dagoberto Galvan, Roger Garcia, Jesus Garza, Bruce Griego, Garrett Guthrie, Eric Harmon, Phillip Harrison. (cj) [Transferred from Texas Western on 4/29/2019.] |