Sitzer et al v. National Association of Realtors et al
Missouri Western District Court | |
Judge: | Stephen R Bough |
Case #: | 4:19-cv-00332 |
Nature of Suit | 410 Other Statutes - Antitrust |
Cause | 15:1 Antitrust Litigation |
Case Filed: | Apr 29, 2019 |
Case in other court: | 8th Circuit Court of Appeals, 20-01779 8th Circuit Court of Appeals, 22-02664 |
Last checked: Thursday Apr 28, 2022 11:48 AM CDT |
Defendant
HomeServices of America, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Re/Max LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
HSF Affiliates, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
BHH Affiliates, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Realogy Holdings Corp.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Keller Williams Realty, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
National Association of Realtors
|
Represented By
|
interested party
United States
|
Represented By
|
interested party
House of Brokers, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Miscellaneous
The Way Home, Inc. d/b/a Century 21 Access
Columbia 1301 Vandiver Suite N
Columbia, MO 65202 |
Represented By
|
Miscellaneous
Corelogic, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Movant
Southern Missouri Regional MLS LLC
|
Represented By
|
Movant
Re/Max Boone County Realty
|
Represented By
|
Movant
Re/Max 1st Choice
|
Represented By
|
Movant
Missouri Association of Realtors
|
Represented By
|
Movant
Columbia Board of Realtors
|
Represented By
|
Movant
Kansas City Regional Association of Realtors
|
Represented By
|
Movant
MARIS MLS
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Scott Trupiano
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jeremy Keel
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jerod Breit
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Ryan Hendrickson
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Scott Burnett
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Rhonda Burnett
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Amy Winger
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Joshua Sitzer
|
Represented By
|
TERMINATED PARTIES | |
Defendant
The Long & Foster Companies, Inc.
Terminated: 10/01/2019
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
RE/MAX Holdings, Inc.
Terminated: 06/24/2019
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/25/2024 5:49 AM CDT |
Wednesday, April 24, 2024 | ||
1461 | 1461
notice
Notice of Hearing
Wed 04/24 10:35 AM
NOTICE OF HEARING - This is the official notice for this hearing. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. Settlement Conference set for 11/26/2024 at 1:30 PM in Courtroom 7B, Kansas City (SRB) before District Judge Stephen R. Bough. (Peters, Tracey) |
|
Tuesday, April 23, 2024 | ||
1460 | 1460
8
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
Tue 04/23 9:10 AM
Before the Court is Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Approval of Proposed Settlement with the National Association of Realtors and the accompanying Memorandum. (Doc. #1458 .) Upon review, the motion is GRANTED. Signed on 4/22/2024 by District Judge Stephen R. Bough. (Peters, Tracey) |
|
Monday, April 22, 2024 | ||
1459 | 1459
order
Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice
Mon 04/22 8:22 AM
ORDER granting1457 motion to appear pro hac vice entered by Clerk of Court. Attorney Boris Bershteyn for Keller Williams Realty, Inc. allowed to appear pro hac vice. This entry will serve as authorization for the pro hac participation by the attorney. Western District of Missouri Local Rule 5.1 requires documents to be filed electronically. If pro hac vice counsel has not already done so, counsel is directed to immediately register for a WDMO e-filing account for NextGen CM/ECF. This will enable counsel to electronically file documents and receive electronic notification of filings. Register for a WDMO e-filing account at [LINK:PACER] . This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Berner, Crystal) |
|
Friday, April 19, 2024 | ||
1458 | 1458
37
pgs
motion
Order
Fri 04/19 10:01 PM
MOTION for order Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Approval of Settlement with the National Association of Realtors, Certification of Settlement Class, and Appointment of Class Representatives and Settlement Class Counsel filed by Eric L. Dirks on behalf of Jerod Breit, Rhonda Burnett, Hollee Ellis, Frances Harvey, Jeremy Keel. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 5/3/2024 unless otherwise directed by the court.(Dirks, Eric) |
|
Att: 1 116 pgs Exhibit 1, | ||
Att: 2 7 pgs Exhibit 2, | ||
Att: 3 24 pgs Exhibit 3 | ||
1457 | 1457
motion
Appear Pro Hac Vice
Fri 04/19 3:49 PM
Motion to allow Boris Bershteyn to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $100 receipt number AMOWDC-8970534) filed by David R. Buchanan on behalf of Keller Williams Realty, Inc.. (Buchanan, David) |
|
1456 | 1456
notice
Notice of Filing
Fri 04/19 2:37 PM
NOTICE of filing by Elaine Gerber.(Crocker, Susan) |
|
Att: 1 Envelope | ||
1455 | 1455
notice
Notice of Filing
Fri 04/19 2:34 PM
NOTICE of filing objection by Anthony Phillips.(Crocker, Susan) |
|
Att: 1 Envelope | ||
Wednesday, April 17, 2024 | ||
1454 | 1454
2
pgs
motion
Order
Wed 04/17 2:00 PM
Notice of filing objection by Sharon Saunders. (Crocker, Susan) Modified on 4/17/2024 to correct docket text (Crocker, Susan). |
|
1453 | 1453
3
pgs
notice
Notice of Filing
Wed 04/17 1:53 PM
NOTICE of filing objection by Cynthia L Goralski (Crocker, Susan) |