Consolidated
Lead case: 3:19-md-02885

Florida Northern District Court
Judge:M Casey Rodgers
Referred: Gary R Jones
Case #: 3:19-cv-01216
Nature of Suit365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Case Filed:Apr 30, 2019
Case in other court:Arkansas Western, 6:19-cv-06041
Last checked: Sunday Oct 27, 2019 4:51 AM EDT
Defendant
3M COMPANY
Defendant
AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC
Plaintiff
RICKEY THOMPSON
Represented By
TODD C WERTS
Lear Werts Llp - Columbia Mo
contact info


Docket last updated: 8 hours ago
Wednesday, October 30, 2019
12 12 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Wed 10/30 2:59 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by RICKEY THOMPSON (WERTS, TODD)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 25, 2019
11 11 service Summons Issued Tue 06/25 1:34 PM
Summons Issued as to 3M COMPANY, #1 AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC. (djb)
Related: [-]
10 10 notice Notice - Other - See Separate Menu for Ntc of Appeal Options Tue 06/25 9:53 AM
NOTICE of Summons to Issue for Aearo Technologies LLC by RICKEY THOMPSON (WERTS, TODD)
Related: [-]
9 9 notice Notice - Other - See Separate Menu for Ntc of Appeal Options Tue 06/25 9:52 AM
NOTICE of Summons to Issue for 3M Company by RICKEY THOMPSON (WERTS, TODD)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 18, 2019
8 8 misc Docket Annotation Tue 06/18 9:27 AM
DOCKET ANNOTATION BY COURT: This case is ready for issuance of summons. The clerk will issue summons upon submission. You may obtain the 2 page summons form by visiting our website @ www.flnd.uscourts.gov. Click on Forms & Publications; national court forms; AO 440 Summons in a Civil Action Related [+]. (djb)
Related: [-] vised 6/12
Thursday, May 02, 2019
7 7 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 05/02 6:17 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by TODD C WERTS on behalf of RICKEY THOMPSON (WERTS, TODD)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 30, 2019
6 6 transfer Case Transferred In - District Transfer (COURT USE ONLY) Tue 04/30 7:57 AM
Case transferred in from District of Arkansas Western; Case Number 6:19-cv-06041. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 25, 2019
5 5 MDL CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER. Case transferred to District of Northern District of Florida. Documents transmitted as requested. (hnc) [Transferred from Arkansas Western on 4/30/2019.]
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 11, 2019
4 4 Magistrate Notice/Consent Form. (mjm) [Transferred from Arkansas Western on 4/30/2019.]
Related: [-]
3 3 NOTICE by Rickey Thompson of Related Action (MDL 2885)(Werts, Todd) [Transferred from Arkansas Western on 4/30/2019.]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 - Transfer Order
2 2 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against 3M Company, Aearo Technologies, LLC ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number AARWDC-1897963), filed by Rickey Thompson.(Werts, Todd) [Transferred from Arkansas Western on 4/30/2019.]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet
1 1 CIVIL COVER SHEET for case initiated by Rickey Thompson. Please proceed with filing your case initiating document(s). (mjm) [Transferred from Arkansas Western on 4/30/2019.]
Related: [-]
Copy of Docket Sheet, Complaint and Notice of Related Action emailed to panelmdl@jpml.uscourts.gov. (mjm) [Transferred from Arkansas Western on 4/30/2019.]
Related: [-]