WALTON v 3M COMPANY
Consolidated
Lead case: 3:19-md-02885
Lead case: 3:19-md-02885
Florida Northern District Court | |
Judge: | M Casey Rodgers |
Referred: | Gary R Jones |
Case #: | 3:19-cv-01235 |
Nature of Suit | 365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability |
Case Filed: | Apr 30, 2019 |
Case in other court: | Texas Western, 6:19-cv-00080 |
Last checked: Sunday Oct 27, 2019 4:30 AM EDT |
Defendant
3M COMPANY
|
|
Defendant
3M OCCUPATIONAL SAFETY LLC
|
|
Defendant
AEARO HOLDING LLC
|
|
Defendant
AEARO INTERMEDIATE LLC
|
|
Defendant
AEARO LLC
|
|
Defendant
AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC
|
|
Plaintiff
AUSTIN W WALTON
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 2 hours ago |
Monday, November 04, 2019 | ||
16 | 16
![]() Short Form Complaint AMENDED COMPLAINT Short Form Complaint against All Defendants All Defendants., filed by AUSTIN W WALTON. (AZIZ, MUHAMMAD) |
|
15 | 15
![]() NOTICE of Appearance by CHARLES FRANKLIN BEALL, JR on behalf of All Defendants (BEALL, CHARLES) |
|
Wednesday, August 21, 2019 | ||
14 | 14
![]() Summons Issued as to 3M OCCUPATIONAL SAFETY LLC, AEARO HOLDING LLC, AEARO INTERMEDIATE LLC, AEARO LLC, AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC. (djb) |
|
Tuesday, August 20, 2019 | ||
13 | 13
![]() THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT and Jury Demand against All Defendants All Defendants., filed by AUSTIN W WALTON. (AZIZ, MUHAMMAD) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Att: 3
![]() |
||
Att: 4
![]() |
||
Att: 5
![]() |
||
Tuesday, August 13, 2019 | ||
12 | 12
![]() ORDER - All individual plaintiffs whose cases are identified on Exhibit A are granted one final opportunity to file an amended complaint that names all defendants in the caption, as required by Rule 10(a), by August 20, 2019 . The amended complaints must be accompanied by properly completed summonses. Thereafter, the Clerk will sign and issue summonses for service of the operative complaints in each of the cases. No further amendments to these plaintiffs complaints will be allowed. Going forward, counsel is directed to comply with Rules 10(a) and 15(a) when filing new and/or amended complaints, which must be accompanied by properly completed summonses. Failure to do so may result in sanctions, including dismissal. Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 8/13/2019. (djb) |
|
Friday, July 26, 2019 | ||
11 | 11
![]() Second AMENDED COMPLAINT and Jury Demand against 3M OCCUPATIONAL SAFETY LLC, filed by AUSTIN W WALTON. (AZIZ, MUHAMMAD) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Wednesday, July 24, 2019 | ||
10 | 10
misc
Docket Annotation
Wed 07/24 7:34 AM
DOCKET ANNOTATION BY COURT: The parties were added to the docket incorrectly and will have to be corrected by the clerk. Party names are to be entered in ALL CAPS and without punctuation. For future reference: Please review the procedure for adding/creating new parties in the "Style Guide for Electronic Case Filing" and/or chapter 10 of the "CM/ECF Attorney User's Guide," available at www.flnd.uscourts.gov. (djb) |
|
Tuesday, July 23, 2019 | ||
9 | 9
![]() First AMENDED COMPLAINT and Jury Demand against Aearo Holding, LLC, Aearo Technologies, LLC, AEARO, LLC, Aearo Intermediate, LLC, filed by AUSTIN W WALTON. (AZIZ, MUHAMMAD) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Att: 3
![]() |
||
Att: 4
![]() |
||
Tuesday, June 25, 2019 | ||
8 | 8
![]() SUMMONS Returned Executed by AUSTIN W WALTON. 3M COMPANY served on 6/24/2019, answer due 7/15/2019. (AZIZ, MUHAMMAD) |
|
Wednesday, June 19, 2019 | ||
7 | 7
![]() Summons Issued as to 3M COMPANY. (djb) |
|
Tuesday, June 18, 2019 | ||
6 | 6
![]() NOTICE re: Issuance of Summons by AUSTIN W WALTON (AZIZ, MUHAMMAD) |
|
Tuesday, May 28, 2019 | ||
5 | 5
![]() ORDER - More than 90 days have elapsed since the complaints were filed and no waiver of service or executed proof of service have been filed. All individual plaintiffs whose cases are identified in Exhibit A are directed to accomplish service and file proof of service with the Court in accordance with Rule 4 by Friday, June 28, 2019. Failure to comply with this directive will result in dismissal of a case without prejudice. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(m). Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 5/28/2019. (Service Deadline - by 6/28/2019 .) (djb) |
|
Tuesday, April 30, 2019 | ||
4 | 4
![]() Case transferred in from District of Texas Western; Case Number 6:19-cv-00080. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. |
|
Thursday, April 25, 2019 | ||
Case transferred to Northern District of Florida. (mcda) [Transferred from Texas Western on 4/30/2019.] | ||
Friday, April 19, 2019 | ||
3 | 3
![]() |
|
Wednesday, February 13, 2019 | ||
2 | 2
![]() |
|
1 | 1
![]() |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Case assigned to Judge Alan D Albright and REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Jeffrey C. Manske. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (lad) [Transferred from Texas Western on 4/30/2019.] |