Consolidated
Lead case: 3:19-md-02885

Florida Northern District Court
Judge:M Casey Rodgers
Referred: Gary R Jones
Case #: 3:19-cv-01238
Nature of Suit365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Case Filed:Apr 30, 2019
Terminated:May 06, 2022
Case in other court:Texas Western, 6:19-cv-00084
Last checked: Sunday Oct 27, 2019 5:54 AM EDT
Defendant
3M COMPANY
Defendant
3M OCCUPATIONAL SAFETY LLC
Defendant
AEARO HOLDING LLC
Defendant
AEARO INTERMEDIATE LLC
Defendant
AEARO LLC
Defendant
AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC
Plaintiff
FREDDY RIDDLE
Represented By
MUHAMMAD SULEIMAN AZIZ
Abraham Watkins Nichols Sorrels Agosto & Aziz
contact info
MUHAMMAD S AZIZ
Abraham Watkins Nichols Etc - Houston Tx
contact info


Docket last updated: 10 hours ago
Friday, May 06, 2022
15 15 30+ pgs order Order Dismissing Case Mon 05/09 9:11 AM
ORDER. The plaintiffs' cases identified on Exhibit A are hereby DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE for failure to comply with a court order. The Clerk is directed to enter a copy of this Order on the main MDL docket and on the individual dockets, and close the cases in their entirety for all purposes. Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 5/6/2022. (erl)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 04, 2019
14 14 cmp Amended Complaint Mon 11/04 2:57 PM
Short Form Complaint AMENDED COMPLAINT Short Form Complaint against All Defendants All Defendants., filed by FREDDY RIDDLE. (AZIZ, MUHAMMAD)
Related: [-]
13 13 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 11/04 2:28 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by CHARLES FRANKLIN BEALL, JR on behalf of All Defendants (BEALL, CHARLES)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 21, 2019
12 12 service Summons Issued Wed 08/21 11:25 AM
Summons Issued as to 3M OCCUPATIONAL SAFETY LLC. (sdw)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 AEARO HOLDING LLC,
Att: 2 AEARO INTERMEDIATE LLC,
Att: 3 AEARO LLC,
Att: 4 AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC
Tuesday, August 20, 2019
11 11 cmp Amended Complaint Tue 08/20 1:09 PM
Second AMENDED COMPLAINT and Jury Demand against All Defendants All Defendants., filed by FREDDY RIDDLE. (AZIZ, MUHAMMAD)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit,
Att: 2 Exhibit,
Att: 3 Exhibit,
Att: 4 Exhibit,
Att: 5 Exhibit
Tuesday, August 13, 2019
10 10 9 pgs order Order Tue 08/13 3:09 PM
ORDER - All individual plaintiffs whose cases are identified on Exhibit A are granted one final opportunity to file an amended complaint that names all defendants in the caption, as required by Rule 10(a), by August 20, 2019 . The amended complaints must be accompanied by properly completed summonses. Thereafter, the Clerk will sign and issue summonses for service of the operative complaints in each of the cases. No further amendments to these plaintiffs complaints will be allowed. Going forward, counsel is directed to comply with Rules 10(a) and 15(a) when filing new and/or amended complaints, which must be accompanied by properly completed summonses. Failure to do so may result in sanctions, including dismissal. Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 8/13/2019. (djb)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 24, 2019
9 9 cmp Amended Complaint Wed 07/24 12:37 PM
First AMENDED COMPLAINT and Jury Demand against 3M OCCUPATIONAL SAFETY LLC, AEARO HOLDING LLC, AEARO INTERMEDIATE LLC, AEARO LLC, AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC, filed by FREDDY RIDDLE. (AZIZ, MUHAMMAD)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Summons,
Att: 2 Exhibit Summons,
Att: 3 Exhibit Summons,
Att: 4 Exhibit Summons,
Att: 5 Exhibit Summons
Wednesday, June 26, 2019
8 8 service Summons Returned Executed Wed 06/26 10:25 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by FREDDY RIDDLE. 3M COMPANY served on 6/24/2019, answer due 7/15/2019. (AZIZ, MUHAMMAD)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 19, 2019
7 7 service Summons Issued Wed 06/19 1:07 PM
Summons Issued as to 3M COMPANY. (djb)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 18, 2019
6 6 notice Notice - Other - See Separate Menu for Ntc of Appeal Options Tue 06/18 5:43 PM
NOTICE re: Issuance of Summons by FREDDY RIDDLE (AZIZ, MUHAMMAD)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 28, 2019
5 5 6 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings Tue 05/28 1:49 PM
ORDER - More than 90 days have elapsed since the complaints were filed and no waiver of service or executed proof of service have been filed. All individual plaintiffs whose cases are identified in Exhibit A are directed to accomplish service and file proof of service with the Court in accordance with Rule 4 by Friday, 6/28/2019 . Failure to comply with this directive will result in dismissal of a case without prejudice. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(m). Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 5/28/2019. (djb)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 30, 2019
4 4 transfer Case Transferred In - District Transfer (COURT USE ONLY) Tue 04/30 11:23 AM
Case transferred in from District of Texas Western; Case Number 6:19-cv-00084. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 25, 2019
Case transferred to Northern District of Florida. (mcda) [Transferred from Texas Western on 4/30/2019.]
Related: [-]
Friday, April 19, 2019
3 3 Conditional Transfer Order entered by the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation TRANSFERRING case to the United States District Court for the Northern District of Florida. Signed by John W. Nichols, Clerk of the Panel (mcda) [Transferred from Texas Western on 4/30/2019.]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 13, 2019
2 2 Pro Hac Vice Letter to MARK A. METZGER III. (tb) [Transferred from Texas Western on 4/30/2019.]
Related: [-]
1 1 COMPLAINT and Jury Demand ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0542-11758301). No Summons requested at this time, filed by Freddy Riddle.(Aziz, Muhammad) [Transferred from Texas Western on 4/30/2019.]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet
Case assigned to Judge Alan D Albright and REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Jeffrey C. Manske. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (lad) [Transferred from Texas Western on 4/30/2019.]
Related: [-]