Arizona District Court
Judge:Dominic W Lanza
Case #: 2:19-cv-02746
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause28:1331 Fed. Question: Breach of Contract
Case Filed:Apr 30, 2019
Terminated:Jul 16, 2024
Last checked: Sunday Oct 27, 2019 3:02 AM MST
Defendant
GoDaddy.com LLC
Represented By
Jeffrey M Monhait
Cozen Oconnor - Philadelphia, PA
contact info
Paula L Zecchini
Cozen Oconnor Pc - Seattle, Wa
contact info
Plaintiff
SiteLock LLC
Represented By
Thomas Graham Schultz
Kellogg Hansen Todd Figel & Frederick PLLC
contact info
Thomas Andrew Gilson
Beus Gilbert PLLC
contact info
Kevin Brent Huff
Kellogg Hansen Todd Figel & Frederick PLLC
contact info

GPO Jul 01 2020
ORDER: IT IS ORDERED that: (1) GoDaddy's first motion (Doc. 50), which seeks relief pursuant to the protective order, not "from" it, is granted. SiteLock must change the designation of its third-party reseller agreements from "CONFIDENTIAL - FOR COUNSEL ONLY" to "CONFIDENTIAL." (2) GoDaddy's second motion (Doc. 57) is denied without prejudice. (3) SiteLock's motion to seal (Doc. 68) is granted. The Clerk of Court shall file under seal the exhibits at Docs. 54, 55, 56, and 61 [see attached Order for details]. Signed by Judge Dominic W Lanza on 7/1/20. (MAW)
GPO Aug 14 2020
ORDER: IT IS ORDERED that the parties' stipulation to redact information from certain documents and to file certain other documents under seal (Doc. 97) is denied without prejudice. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that, pursuant to LRCiv 5.6(e), the lodged documents will not be filed, but will remain under seal. The Court will extend the time provided by LRCiv 5.6(e) for GoDaddy to act. GoDaddy may, within 15 days of the entry of this Order, (1) file unredacted versions of the documents in the public record or (2) file a new motion to seal that conforms with the requirements delineated in this order [see attached Order for details]. Signed by Judge Dominic W Lanza on 8/14/20. (MAW)
GPO Sep 21 2020
ORDER: IT IS ORDERED that: (1) GoDaddy's notice of discovery dispute (Doc. 147) is denied without prejudice to GoDaddy's ability to present the disputes addressed therein in the form of a motion to compel. (2) SiteLock's notices of discovery dispute (Docs. 152, 154) are denied without prejudice to SiteLock's ability to present the disputes addressed therein in the form of a motion to compel. (3) The parties' stipulation to seal (Doc. 148) and SiteLock's motion to seal (Doc. 150) are denied as moot. (4) GoDaddy's motion to strike (Doc. 155) is denied as moot. (5) GoDaddy's objection (Doc. 159) is denied as moot. (6) The parties may no longer utilize the Court's informal discovery dispute process in this action. Paragraph 7(a) of the scheduling order (Doc. 22 at 4-5) is vacated. To the extent the parties have discovery disputes, they shall confer and attempt to resolve the disputes, and if that is not possible, they shall file motions to compel. Any motion to compel shall be accompanied by the certification required by Local Rule of Civil Procedure 7.2(j) [see attached Order for details]. Signed by Judge Dominic W Lanza on 9/21/20. (MAW)
GPO Oct 19 2020
ORDER: IT IS ORDERED that: (1) GoDaddy's motion for leave to file an amended answer and amended counterclaims (Doc. 93) is denied. (2) SiteLock's motion to compel (Doc. 121) is granted. However, no fees will be awarded to the prevailing party. 3) GoDaddy's motion to compel (Doc. 124) is denied. 4) GoDaddy's motion to strike (Doc. 171) is denied. (5) GoDaddy's motion to amend scheduling order (Doc. 133) is granted in part. The deadline for answers to interrogatories and production of documents is extended to three weeks from today (i.e., November 8, 2020). The deadline for fact discovery is extended to December 2, 2020. The deadline for expert disclosures for the party with dline for good faith settlement talks is extended to April 16, 2021. The dispositive motions deadline is extended to May 12, 2021 [see attached Order for details]. Signed by Judge Dominic W Lanza on 10/19/20. (MAW)the burden of proof is extended to January 11, 2021, for the responding party to February 8, 2021, and for rebuttal experts to March 5, 2021. The deadline for expert depositions is extended to April 5, 2021. The dea
GPO Jan 06 2021
and denied in part. 4. SiteLock's motion for protective order (Doc. 220) is denied. 5. GoDaddy's motion to strike (Doc. 221) is denied [see attached Order for details]. Signed by Judge Dominic W Lanza on 1/6/21. (MAW)ORDER: IT IS ORDERED that: 1. SiteLock's motion to compel (Doc. 181) is granted in part and denied in part. 2. SiteLock's motion to compel (Doc. 187) is granted. 3. GoDaddy's motion to compel (Doc. 205) is granted in part
GPO Apr 22 2021
file the unredacted reply (Doc. 281) in the public record. (See document for further details). Signed by Judge Dominic W Lanza on 4/21/2021. (LAD)ORDER - (1) GoDaddy's motion for protective order (Doc. 251) is denied. (2) SiteLock's motion to compel (Doc. 255) is granted. (3) GoDaddy's first motion to seal (Doc. 262) is granted in part and denied in part. The Clerk of Court shall file in the public record Exhibits E and F (Docs. 264, 264-1), and shall file under seal Exhibit H (Doc. 264-2). (4) GoDaddy's second motion to seal (Doc. 265) is granted in part and denied in part. The Clerk of Court shall file in the public record the unredacted version of SiteLock's motion to compel (Doc. 257) and all of the attachments thereto (Doc. 257-1), except that the Clerk shall file under seal Exhibits 7 and 13 of SiteLock's motion to compel (Doc. 257-1 at 98-99; id. at 127-29). (5) GoDaddy's third motion to seal (Doc. 270) is denied. The Clerk of Court shall file the unredacted response (Doc. 272) and the unredacted exhibits thereto (Doc. 272-1, -2, -3) in the public record. (6) GoDaddy's fourth motion to seal (Doc. 274) is denied. The Clerk of Court shall file Exhibits 10-12 (Doc. 259-1, -2, -3) in the public record. (7) GoDaddy's fifth motion to seal (Doc. 284) is denied. The Clerk of Court shall
GPO May 14 2021
ORDER: IT IS ORDERED that SiteLock's motion to amend the case management order (Doc. 302) is granted in part and denied in part [see attached Order for details]. Signed by Judge Dominic W Lanza on 5/14/21. (MAW)
GPO Jul 09 2021
ORDER that GoDaddy's 306 Motion for Rule 37(c)(1) Sanctions is granted. SiteLock's 320 Cross-motion for Additional Discovery is denied. Signed by Judge Dominic W. Lanza on 7/09/2021. (ESG)
GPO Mar 02 2022
ORDER: IT IS ORDERED that: 1. GoDaddy's motion for summary judgment (Doc. 340) is granted in part and denied in part. 2. SiteLock's motion for partial summary judgment (Doc. 341) is granted in part and denied in part. 3. SiteLock's motion for sanctions (Doc. 348) is granted. 4. GoDaddy's motion to exclude (Doc. 356) is denied [see attached Order for details]. Signed by Judge Dominic W Lanza on 3/2/22. (MAW)
GPO Aug 29 2022
ORDER: IT IS ORDERED that: 1. GoDaddy's motion for disclosure sanctions (Doc. 457) is denied. 2. GoDaddy's motion for spoliation sanctions (Doc. 467) is denied [see attached Order for details]. Signed by Judge Dominic W Lanza on 8/29/22. (MAW)
GPO Sep 02 2022
ORDER: IT IS ORDERED that GoDaddy's motion to postpone trial and modify the case management order (Doc. 499) is denied. The trial date of November 1, 2022 is confirmed, as is the deadline of September 12, 2022 for any motion to exclude Harper. The latter deadline cannot be further extended without running up against the trial date, which is firm [see attached Order for details]. Signed by Judge Dominic W Lanza on 9/2/22. (MAW)
GPO May 10 2023
ORDER: IT IS ORDERED that: (1) GoDaddy's motion to dismiss (Doc. 579) is denied. (2) SiteLock's motion to enforce the Court's order and set a trial date (Doc. 597) is granted in part and denied in part, as discussed herein. (3) GoDaddy's motion to compel (Doc. 598) is granted in part and denied in part, as discussed herein. (4) Within one week of the issuance of this order, the parties must meet and confer and then file a joint notice setting forth their trial availability in November 2023 or from January 2024 onward [see attached Order for details]. Signed by Judge Dominic W Lanza on 5/10/23. (MAW)
GPO Jul 20 2023
ORDER: IT IS ORDERED that GoDaddy's motion to amend the case management order (Doc. 623) is granted in part and denied in part. The case management order is amended as follows: (1) Within 30 days of the issuance of this order, GoDaddy is permitted to serve third-party subpoenas on each of the following entities: SIH, IBS, ABRY, Unitedweb Hold ings, Unitedweb, and SGH. (2) The deadline for motions related to the third-party subpoenas is 60 days from the issuance of this order. (3) All other deadlines in the case management order remain unchanged [see attached Order for details].. Signed by Judge Dominic W Lanza on 7/20/23. (MAW)

Docket last updated: 05/14/2025 11:59 PM MST
Tuesday, July 16, 2024
706 706 1 pgs order Order on Stipulation Order Dismissing Case ~Util - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings ~Util - Terminate Motions Tue 07/16 11:26 AM
ORDER - IT IS ORDERED granting the stipulation of dismissal (Doc.705 ). IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that all claims in the above-captioned case are dismissed with prejudice, with each party bearing its own costs and attorneys' fees. Signed by Judge Dominic W Lanza on 7/16/24. (SLQ)
Related: [-]