Original Case: 1:18-cv-02714

Second Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals
Case #: 0:19-cv-01155
Typecivil / private
Nature of Suit896 Other Statutes - Arbitration
Case Filed:Apr 25, 2019
Terminated:Nov 12, 2019
Last checked: Thursday Nov 14, 2019 3:35 AM EST
Defendant - Appellant
Chongqing Senci Import & Export Trade Co., Ltd.
Represented By
Constantine Alexei Brenot
Law Offices of Sam X.J. Wu, Apc
contact info
Defendant - Appellant
Chongqing AM Pride Power & Machinery Co. Ltd.
Represented By
Constantine Alexei Brenot
Law Offices of Sam X.J. Wu, Apc
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellee
Smarter Tools Inc.
Represented By
Michael Harper Gladstone
McCandlish Holton, P.C.
contact info


Docket last updated: 11/14/2019 3:29 AM EST
Thursday, April 25, 2019
1 1 NOTICE OF CIVIL APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellant Chongqing AM Pride Power & Machinery Co. Ltd. and Chongqing Senci Import & Export Trade Co., Ltd., FILED. [2550086] 19-1155 [Entered: 04/29/2019 09:42 AM]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 2 pgs Dkt_Ntc_BK_CV_PR_Tax
Att: 2 8 pgs Case FILED
2 2 10 pgs DISTRICT COURT OPINION & ORDER, dated 03/26/2019, RECEIVED.[2550090] 19-1155 [Entered: 04/29/2019 09:44 AM]
Related: [-]
3 3 ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[2550096] 19-1155 [Entered: 04/29/2019 09:46 AM]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 1 pgs Notice_of_Index_or_ROA_Filed
Att: 2 8 pgs Index/FRAP 10(d) in lieu of ROA FILED
4 4 NOTE: See lead case, 19-943, containing complete set of docket entries.[2550098] 19-1155 [Entered: 04/29/2019 09:47 AM]
Related: [-]