Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 5:18-bk-02010

North Carolina Eastern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Stephani W Humrickhouse
Case #: 5:19-ap-00066
Nature of Suit14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:May 01, 2019
Terminated:Jul 29, 2022
Last checked: never
Defendant
William Gary Adams
1075 Adams Road
Benson, NC 27504
Represented By
William Gary Adams
contact info
Plaintiff
Southern Produce Distributors, Inc.
111 West Center Street North
Faison, NC 28341
Represented By
Gregory B Crampton
Nicholls & Crampton, P.A.
contact info

GPO Mar 11 2020
Order Holding Objections to Claims in Abeyance and Striking Defendants' Demand for Jury Trial. Judge Entering Opinion: SWH . (Gurgone, Christy)
GPO Mar 28 2022
Order filed in District Court on March 28, 2022, (Affirming) (RE: related document(s)42 Notice of Appeal filed by Defendant and Counter-Claimant William Gary Adams ). (Howard, Allyson)

Docket last updated: 05/26/2025 1:08 PM EDT
Friday, July 29, 2022
court Close Adversary Case Fri 07/29 10:52 AM
Adversary Case 5:19-ap-66 Closed (Gurgone, Christy)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 28, 2022
103 103 notice Stipulation of Dismissal Thu 07/28 2:30 PM
Stipulation of Dismissal filed by J. Michael Fields, Gregory T. Griffin, John A. Northen, Steven Craig Newton II on behalf of William Gary Adams, Southern Produce Distributors, Inc.. (Newton, Steven) **Corrective Entry: Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Gregory T. Griffin, Steven Craig Newton II, John A. Northen, Michael J Parrish on behalf of William Gary Adams, Southern Produce Distributors, Inc.. ** Modified on 7/29/2022 (Gurgone, Christy)
Related: [-]