Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:19-bk-11659

Colorado Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Michael E Romero
Case #: 1:19-ap-01117
Nature of Suit13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:May 02, 2019
Terminated:Jul 09, 2020
Last checked: never
Defendant
Patrick Lillis
Represented By
Patrick Lillis
contact info
Defendant
Tracy Amick
Represented By
Tracy Amick
contact info
Plaintiff
Lake Loveland Dermatology, P.C.
776 West Eisenhower Boulevard
Loveland, CO 80537
Represented By
Jordan D. Factor
contact info
Jeremy T Jonsen
Allen Vellone Wolf Helfrich & Factor, P.
contact info
Michael T Gilbert
contact info
Plaintiff
Skin, P.C.
905 Alpine Avenue
Boulder, CO 80304
Represented By
Lee M. Kutner
contact info
Plaintiff
Kevin John Mott
9626 Mountain Ridge Drive
Boulder, CO 80302
Represented By
Lance J. Goff
contact info


Docket last updated: 12 hours ago
Thursday, July 09, 2020
court Close Adversary Case Thu 07/09 9:22 AM
Adversary Case Number 19-0117 MER Closed. (rxc)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 11, 2020
44 44 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Thu 06/11 10:22 PM
Courts Notice or Order and BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+]. No. of Notices: 7. Notice Date 06/11/2020. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 43 Order Dismissing Adversary Proceeding
Tuesday, June 09, 2020
43 43 order Dismiss Adversary Proceeding Tue 06/09 11:09 AM
Order Dismissing Adversary Proceeding Related [+]. (rxc)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint,42 Stipulation
utility Disposition of Adversary Tue 06/09 11:12 AM
Disposition of Adversary Proceeding Number 19-01117 MER. Final Order or Judgment Has Entered. Tickle Due Date 6/22/2020. (rxc)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 05, 2020
42 42 motion Stipulation Fri 06/05 3:49 PM
Stipulation Between Kevin John Mott and Defendants Re: Dismissal of All Claims and Counterclaims With Prejudice Filed by Lance J. Goff on behalf of Kevin John Mott. (Goff, Lance)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed/Unsigned Order Proposed Order for Dismissal
Thursday, February 27, 2020
41 41 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Thu 02/27 10:26 PM
Courts Notice or Order and BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+]. No. of Notices: 7. Notice Date 02/27/2020. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 40 Order On Stipulation
Tuesday, February 25, 2020
40 40 order Stipulation Tue 02/25 2:47 PM
Order Granting Stipulation To Amend Discovery Schedule Related [+]. (rxc)
Related: [-] 38 Stipulation
Monday, February 24, 2020
39 39 misc Change of Address Mon 02/24 7:17 PM
Notice of Change of Address For Matthew T. Faga Filed by Matthew T. Faga on behalf of Tracy Amick, Patrick Lillis. (Faga, Matthew)
Related: [-]
38 38 motion Stipulation Mon 02/24 1:47 PM
Stipulation Between Lake Loveland Dermatology, P.C. and Defendants Re: Amend Discovery Schedule Filed by Jordan D. Factor on behalf of Lake Loveland Dermatology, P.C. Related [+]. (Factor, Jordan)
Related: [-] 18 Generic Order,36 Order On Stipulation
Att: 1 Proposed/Unsigned Order
Wednesday, December 18, 2019
37 37 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Wed 12/18 10:30 PM
Courts Notice or Order and BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+]. No. of Notices: 7. Notice Date 12/18/2019. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 36 Order On Stipulation
Monday, December 16, 2019
36 36 order Stipulation Mon 12/16 1:26 PM
Order Granting Stipulation To Amend Deadlines Related [+]. (rxc)
Related: [-] 35 Stipulation
Friday, December 13, 2019
35 35 motion Stipulation Fri 12/13 3:45 PM
Stipulation Between Lake Loveland Dermatology, P.C. and Skin, P.C.; Kevin John Mott; Patrick Lillis and Tracy Amick Re: Amend Corrected Order regarding Discovery Schedule Filed by Jordan D. Factor on behalf of Lake Loveland Dermatology, P.C. Related [+]. (Factor, Jordan)
Related: [-] 18 Generic Order
Att: 1 Proposed/Unsigned Order
Wednesday, November 06, 2019
34 34 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Wed 11/06 10:31 PM
Courts Notice or Order and BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+]. No. of Notices: 3. Notice Date 11/06/2019. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 33 Notice of Filing of Official Transcript
Monday, November 04, 2019
33 33 court Notice of Filing of Official Transcript Mon 11/04 3:12 PM
Notice of Filing of Official Transcript. Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of the Oral Arguments On Motion To Assume Lease Agreement Dated November 1, 2011 (Loveland Premises), Objection Filed By 790 Eisenhower, LLC, And Reply By Lake Loveland Dermatology, P.C., And Oral Arguments On Motion For Leave To File Amended Complaint Pursuant To F.R.C.P. 15(A), Opposition Filed By Defendants, And Reply Filed By Plaintiffs held on September 26, 2019 has been filed. Pursuant to the policy adopted by the Judicial Conference, transcripts are available for inspection only at the clerk's office or may be purchased from the court transcriber for a 90 day period. Related [+]. (mmm)
Related: [-] 32 Transcript
32 32 trans Transcript Mon 11/04 3:07 PM
Transcript of ORAL ARGUMENTS ON MOTION TO ASSUME LEASE AGREEMENT DATED NOVEMBER 1, 2011 (LOVELAND PREMISES), OBJECTION FILED BY 790 EISENHOWER, LLC, AND REPLY BY LAKE LOVELAND DERMATOLOGY, P.C., AND ORAL ARGUMENTS ON MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE AMENDED COMPLAINT PURSUANT TO F.R.C.P. 15(a), OPPOSITION FILED BY DEFENDANTS, AND REPLY FILED BY PLAINTIFFS. Date Of Hearing: September 26, 2019 before Judge Michael E. Romero. THIS TRANSCRIPT WILL BE MADE ELECTRONICALLY AVAILABLE TO THE GENERAL PUBLIC 90 DAYS AFTER THE DATE OF FILING, TRANSCRIPT RELEASE DATE IS 2/3/2020. Until that time the transcript may be viewed at the Bankruptcy Court or a copy may be obtained from the official court transcriber. Requested by Matthew T. Faga, Esq. on November 1, 2019. Transcribed and filed by AB Court Reporting & Video. Total cost of Transcript $327.00 Related [+]. Notice of Intent to Request Redaction Deadline Due By 11/12/2019. Redaction Request Due By 11/25/2019. Redacted Transcript Submission Due By 12/5/2019. Transcript Access Will Be Restricted Through 2/3/2020. (mmm)
Related: [-] 29 Other Order
Wednesday, October 16, 2019
31 31 answer Answer to Amended Complaint Wed 10/16 3:57 PM
Answer to Amended Complaint Filed by Frank W. Visciano on behalf of Tracy Amick, Patrick Lillis Related [+]. (Visciano, Frank)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint,6 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim
Sunday, September 29, 2019
30 30 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Mon 09/30 5:17 AM
Courts Notice or Order and BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+]. No. of Notices: 7. Notice Date 09/29/2019. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 29 Other Order
Thursday, September 26, 2019
29 29 order Other Order Fri 09/27 7:42 AM
Minute Order: For reasons stated on the record, the Debtors Motion to Assume Lease Agreement Dated November 1, 2011 (Loveland Premises) is DENIED.For reasons stated on the record, Plaintiffs Motion for Leave to File Amended Complaint Pursuant to F.R.C.P. 15(a) is GRANTED.790 Eisenhower, LLCs unopposed oral request for an extension of time in which to file a reply in support of the Motion to Dismiss in Adversary Proceeding No. 19-1233 MER is GRANTED. 790 Eisenhower, LLC shall have until October 7, 2019 in which to file its reply. Related [+]. (rxc)
Related: [-] 19 Motion
Saturday, September 07, 2019
28 28 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Sat 09/07 10:29 PM
Courts Notice or Order and BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+]. No. of Notices: 7. Notice Date 09/07/2019. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 27 Order Setting Hearing
Thursday, September 05, 2019
27 27 order Set Hearing (Adversary) Thu 09/05 10:37 AM
Order Rescheduling Hearing RE: Related [+]. Hearing to be held on 9/26/2019 at 01:30 PM Courtroom C for1 , . (rxc)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
Saturday, August 31, 2019
26 26 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Sat 08/31 10:27 PM
Courts Notice or Order and BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+]. No. of Notices: 7. Notice Date 08/31/2019. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 25 Notice of Hearing
Thursday, August 29, 2019
25 25 court Notice of Hearing Thu 08/29 2:59 PM
Notice of Hearing RE: Related [+]. Hearing to be held on 9/18/2019 at 10:30 AM Courtroom C for1 , . (rxc)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
Wednesday, August 28, 2019
24 24 answer Reply Wed 08/28 6:11 PM
Reply Filed by Jordan D. Factor on behalf of Lake Loveland Dermatology, P.C. Related [+]. (Factor, Jordan)
Related: [-] 19 Motion
Wednesday, August 21, 2019
23 23 answer Response Wed 08/21 2:47 PM
Response Filed by Frank W. Visciano on behalf of Tracy Amick, Patrick Lillis Related [+]. (Visciano, Frank)
Related: [-] 19 Motion
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Stock Purchase Agreement
Att: 2 Exhibit B - Consent
22 22 notice Notice of Withdrawal of Document Wed 08/21 2:35 PM
Notice of Withdrawal of Document Filed by Frank W. Visciano on behalf of Tracy Amick, Patrick Lillis Related [+]. (Visciano, Frank)
Related: [-] 21 Motion
21 21 motion Motion Wed 08/21 8:23 AM
Motion For Extension of Time to File a Response to Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to Amend Complaint Filed by Frank W. Visciano on behalf of Tracy Amick, Patrick Lillis Related [+]. (Visciano, Frank)
Related: [-] 19 Motion
Wednesday, August 07, 2019
19 19 motion Motion Wed 08/07 11:20 AM
Motion For Leave to File Amended Complaint Pursuant to FRCP 15(a) Filed by Jordan D. Factor on behalf of Lake Loveland Dermatology, P.C., Kevin John Mott, Skin, P.C. Related [+]. (Factor, Jordan)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Att: 2 Exhibit B
Att: 3 Proposed/Unsigned Order
Sunday, August 04, 2019
20 20 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Mon 08/12 3:52 PM
Courts Notice or Order and BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+]. No. of Notices: 4. Notice Date 08/04/2019. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 18 Generic Order
Friday, August 02, 2019
18 18 2 pgs order Order (Generic) Fri 08/02 1:44 PM
Corrected 7016 Scheduling Order RE: Related [+]. (dmu)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint,16 7016 Scheduling Order
Saturday, July 27, 2019
17 17 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Sat 07/27 10:39 PM
Courts Notice or Order and BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+]. No. of Notices: 8. Notice Date 07/27/2019. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 16 7016 Scheduling Order
Wednesday, July 24, 2019
16 16 order 7016 Scheduling Order (Adversary) Wed 07/24 1:38 PM
7016 Scheduling Order RE: Related [+]. Discovery due by 2/7/2020 for1 , Dispositive Motion due 2/28/2020 for1 , (rxc)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
Tuesday, July 23, 2019
15 15 misc Document/Discovery or Support Document Tue 07/23 1:59 PM
Joint Discovery Document Filed by Jordan D. Factor on behalf of Lake Loveland Dermatology, P.C., Kevin John Mott, Skin, P.C. Related [+]. (Factor, Jordan)
Related: [-] 13 Order to File
Thursday, June 20, 2019
14 14 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Fri 06/21 4:44 PM
Courts Notice or Order and BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+]. No. of Notices: 7. Notice Date 06/20/2019. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 13 Order to File
Tuesday, June 18, 2019
13 13 order File Tue 06/18 1:45 PM
Order Related [+]. Written Report due by 7/23/2019 for1 , (klm)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
Friday, June 14, 2019
12 12 answer Answer to Counterclaim Fri 06/14 3:12 PM
Answer to Counterclaim Filed by Lee M. Kutner on behalf of Skin, P.C. Related [+]. (Kutner, Lee)
Related: [-] 6 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim
11 11 answer Answer to Counterclaim Fri 06/14 2:05 PM
Answer to Counterclaim Filed by Lance J. Goff on behalf of Kevin John Mott Related [+]. (Goff, Lance)
Related: [-] 6 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim
Wednesday, June 12, 2019
10 10 misc Certificate of Service Wed 06/12 12:15 PM
Certificate of Service Filed by Frank W. Visciano on behalf of Tracy Amick, Patrick Lillis Related [+]. (Visciano, Frank)
Related: [-] 6 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim
9 9 misc Certificate of Service Wed 06/12 12:08 PM
Certificate of Service Filed by Frank W. Visciano on behalf of Tracy Amick, Patrick Lillis Related [+]. (Visciano, Frank)
Related: [-] 6 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim
Wednesday, May 29, 2019
8 8 notice Entry of Appearance and Request for Notice Wed 05/29 11:58 AM
Entry of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Jennifer M Salisbury on behalf of Tracy Amick, Patrick Lillis. (Salisbury, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
7 7 notice Entry of Appearance and Request for Notice Wed 05/29 11:56 AM
Entry of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Matthew T. Faga on behalf of Tracy Amick, Patrick Lillis. (Faga, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 24, 2019
6 6 answer|cmp Answer to Complaint|Counterclaim Fri 05/24 2:06 PM
Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim by Tracy Amick, Patrick Lillis against Kevin John Mott, Skin, P.C. Filed by Frank W. Visciano on behalf of Tracy Amick, Patrick Lillis Related [+]. (Visciano, Frank)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
Tuesday, May 21, 2019
5 5 misc Summons Service Executed (Adversary) Tue 05/21 3:10 PM
Summons Service Executed On: Patrick Lillis 5/7/2019 Filed by Michael T Gilbert on behalf of Lake Loveland Dermatology, P.C.. (Gilbert, Michael)
Related: [-]
4 4 misc Summons Service Executed (Adversary) Tue 05/21 3:09 PM
Summons Service Executed On: Tracy Amick 5/7/2019 Filed by Michael T Gilbert on behalf of Lake Loveland Dermatology, P.C.. (Gilbert, Michael)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 02, 2019
3 3 court Summons Issued (auto) Thu 05/02 4:29 PM
Summons Issued on Tracy Amick Answer Due 06/3/2019; Patrick Lillis Answer Due 06/3/2019. Government Agencies Are Allowed 35 Days From Service Of The Summons To Answer This Complaint.[LINK:Notice To Litigants] required to be served with Summons per General Procedure Order. (Gilbert, Michael)
Related: [-]
2 2 crditcrd Auto-Docket of Credit Card Thu 05/02 4:25 PM
Receipt of Complaint 19-01117 MER) [cmp,cmpt] ( 350.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 27121651. Fee amount 350.00 (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Thu 05/02 4:24 PM
Adversary case 19-01117 Complaint by Lake Loveland Dermatology, P.C., Skin, P.C., Kevin John Mott against Patrick Lillis, Tracy Amick. Fee Paid.. Adversary Status Deadline 08/30/2019 (13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)) (Gilbert, Michael)
Related: [-]