Consolidated
Lead case: 3:19-md-02885

Florida Northern District Court
Judge:M Casey Rodgers
Referred: Gary R Jones
Case #: 3:19-cv-01366
Nature of Suit365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability
Cause28:1446pl Petition for Removal - Product Liability
Case Filed:May 06, 2019
Case in other court:Minnesota, 0:19-cv-01004
Last checked: Saturday Nov 02, 2019 4:20 AM EDT
Defendant
3M COMPANY
Represented By
BENJAMIN W HULSE
Blackwell Burke PA
contact info
S Jamal Faleel
Blackwell Burke PA
contact info
JERRY W BLACKWELL
Blackwell Burke PA
contact info
Defendant
AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC
Represented By
Faris Rashid
Greene Espel Pllp
contact info
Plaintiff
SHAWNNE SPRINGMAN
Represented By
ERIN J ROGIERS
Watts Guerra Llp - San Antonio Tx
contact info
Aram V. Desteian
Bassford Remele
contact info
Lewis A Remele, Jr
Bassford Remele
contact info
Brittany B Skemp
Bassford Remele, PA
contact info
MIKAL WATTS
Watts Guerra Llp - San Antonio Tx
contact info
Casey D Marshall
Bassford Remele, PA
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Plaintiff
BARRY ADAMS
Terminated: 10/15/2019
Represented By
ERIN J ROGIERS
Watts Guerra Llp - San Antonio Tx
contact info
Aram V. Desteian
Bassford Remele
contact info
Lewis A Remele, Jr
Bassford Remele
contact info
Brittany B Skemp
Bassford Remele, PA
contact info
MIKAL WATTS
Watts Guerra Llp - San Antonio Tx
contact info
Casey D Marshall
Bassford Remele, PA
contact info
Plaintiff
WILLIAM BURNETTE
Terminated: 10/15/2019
Represented By
ERIN J ROGIERS
Watts Guerra Llp - San Antonio Tx
contact info
Aram V. Desteian
Bassford Remele
contact info
Lewis A Remele, Jr
Bassford Remele
contact info
Brittany B Skemp
Bassford Remele, PA
contact info
MIKAL WATTS
Watts Guerra Llp - San Antonio Tx
contact info
Casey D Marshall
Bassford Remele, PA
contact info
Plaintiff
JORDAN CHESTNUT
Terminated: 10/15/2019
Represented By
ERIN J ROGIERS
Watts Guerra Llp - San Antonio Tx
contact info
Aram V. Desteian
Bassford Remele
contact info
Lewis A Remele, Jr
Bassford Remele
contact info
Brittany B Skemp
Bassford Remele, PA
contact info
MIKAL WATTS
Watts Guerra Llp - San Antonio Tx
contact info
Casey D Marshall
Bassford Remele, PA
contact info
Plaintiff
MARIO MOORE
Terminated: 10/15/2019
Represented By
ERIN J ROGIERS
Watts Guerra Llp - San Antonio Tx
contact info
Aram V. Desteian
Bassford Remele
contact info
Lewis A Remele, Jr
Bassford Remele
contact info
Brittany B Skemp
Bassford Remele, PA
contact info
MIKAL WATTS
Watts Guerra Llp - San Antonio Tx
contact info
Casey D Marshall
Bassford Remele, PA
contact info
Plaintiff
JUSTIN MYERS
Terminated: 10/15/2019
Represented By
ERIN J ROGIERS
Watts Guerra Llp - San Antonio Tx
contact info
Aram V. Desteian
Bassford Remele
contact info
Lewis A Remele, Jr
Bassford Remele
contact info
Brittany B Skemp
Bassford Remele, PA
contact info
MIKAL WATTS
Watts Guerra Llp - San Antonio Tx
contact info
Casey D Marshall
Bassford Remele, PA
contact info


Docket last updated: 12 hours ago
Wednesday, March 18, 2020
16 16 1 pgs order Order Wed 03/18 4:06 PM
ORDER - The Court has been advised that the above-captioned cases are one and the same. The Clerk is directed to administratively close the second-filed case, Case No. 3:20cv287 In the future, all pleadings and papers must be filed on the docket for the first-filed case, Case No. 3:19cv1366 only. The Clerk is directed to file a copy of this Order on the docket for each of the above-captioned cases. Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 3/18/2020. (djb)
Related: [-]
15 15 cmp Amended Complaint Wed 03/18 1:40 PM
MASTER SHORT FORM COMPLAINT AND JURY TRIAL DEMAND against 3M COMPANY, AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC, filed by SHAWNNE SPRINGMAN. (djb)
Related: [-]
utility Action Required by District Judge - No NEFs in SEALED Cases Wed 03/18 10:02 AM
ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re:14 Order, (amended short form complaint not filed) (djb)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 15, 2019
14 14 8 pgs order Order ~Util - Add and Terminate Parties Wed 10/16 9:33 AM
PRETRIAL ORDER NO. 16 MULTI-PLAINTIFF ACTIONS. All plaintiffs named in any multi-plaintiff complaint currently pending in this MDL, except derivative plaintiffs, will be severed. For multi-plaintiff actions in which no remand motion is currently pending, all plaintiffs, except for the first-named plaintiff, are hereby DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE, with the right to refile an individual short form complaint in the approved form, currently available on the master docket for the MDL at ECF No. 705. The Clerk is directed to file a copy of this Order on the master docket for the MDL, and also on the individual docket for each action refiled by a severed plaintiff pursuant to this Order, whether the action is direct filed in this district or transferred here by the Panel. Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 10/15/2019. JORDAN CHESTNUT, MARIO MOORE, JUSTIN MYERS, BARRY ADAMS and WILLIAM BURNETTE terminated. (djb)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 10, 2019
13 13 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 05/10 1:40 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by ERIN J ROGIERS on behalf of All Plaintiffs (ROGIERS, ERIN)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 06, 2019
12 12 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 05/06 2:55 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by MIKAL WATTS on behalf of All Plaintiffs (WATTS, MIKAL)
Related: [-]
11 11 transfer Case Transferred In - District Transfer (COURT USE ONLY) Mon 05/06 9:02 AM
Case transferred in from District of Minnesota; Case Number 0:19-cv-01004. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 01, 2019
10 10 CERTIFIED COPY OF CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-7) transferring case to the Northern District of Florida per the MDL Panel for coordinated or consolidated pretrial proceedings. Case assigned to the Honorable M. Casey Rodgers. (lmb) [Transferred from Minnesota on 5/6/2019.]
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 18, 2019
9 9 STIPULATION to Stay Proceedings Pending Transfer to MDL by 3M Company. Jointly Signed by Shawnne Springman, et al. and Aearo Technologies LLC. (Hulse, Benjamin) [Transferred from Minnesota on 5/6/2019.]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 16, 2019
8 8 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Aearo LLC is a corporate parent of Defendant Aearo Technologies, LLC. 3M Company is a publicly-held corporation owning 10 percent or more of stock of Defendant Aearo Technologies, LLC. (Rashid, Faris) [Transferred from Minnesota on 5/6/2019.]
Related: [-]
7 7 NOTICE by Aearo Technologies, LLC re1 Notice of Removal, CONSENT TO REMOVAL (Rashid, Faris) [Transferred from Minnesota on 5/6/2019.]
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 11, 2019
5 5 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: Notice re: Non-Admitted Attorney We have received documents listing Mikal C. Watts, Francisco Guerra, Erin Rogiers, Paul Danziger, Rodrigo R. de Llano as counsel of record. If he or she wishes to be listed as an attorney of record in this case, he or she must be admitted to the bar of the U.S. District Court of Minnesota in accordance with [LINK:Local Rule 83.5 (a), (b) and (c)] or temporarily admitted pro hac vice in accordance with [LINK:Local Rule 83.5 (d) or (e)] . For more admissions information and forms, please see the Attorney Forms Section of the courts website at [LINK:href=http://www.mnd.uscourts.gov/FORMS/court_forms.shtml#attorneyforms] [LINK:. (MMP) [Transferred from Minnesota on 5/6/2019.]
Related: [-]
4 4 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Paul A. Magnuson per Civil 3rd, 4th Master list, referred to Magistrate Judge Becky R. Thorson. Please use case number 19-cv-1004 (PAM/BRT). (MMP) [Transferred from Minnesota on 5/6/2019.]
Related: [-]
3 3 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by 3M Company re1 Notice of Removal,2 Rule 7.1 - Disclosure Statement (Hulse, Benjamin) [Transferred from Minnesota on 5/6/2019.]
Related: [-]
2 2 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. There is no parent corporation, publicly held corporation or wholly-owned subsidiary to report for Defendant 3M Company. (Hulse, Benjamin) [Transferred from Minnesota on 5/6/2019.]
Related: [-]
1 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Fourth Judicial District, Hennepin County, case number 27-cv 19-4687 (filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMNDC-6800658) filed by 3M Company. No summons requested. (Hulse, Benjamin) [Transferred from Minnesota on 5/6/2019.]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Summons and Complaint,
Att: 2 Exhibit(s) State Order Companioning Cases,
Att: 3 Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal,
Att: 4 Civil Cover Sheet