Consolidated
Lead case: 3:19-md-02885

Florida Northern District Court
Judge:M Casey Rodgers
Referred: Gary R Jones
Case #: 3:19-cv-01372
Nature of Suit365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability
Cause28:1446pl Petition for Removal - Product Liability
Case Filed:May 06, 2019
Case in other court:Minnesota, 0:19-cv-00964
Last checked: Saturday Nov 02, 2019 5:08 AM EDT
Defendant
3M COMPANY
Represented By
JERRY W BLACKWELL
Blackwell Burke PA
contact info
S Jamal Faleel
Blackwell Burke PA
contact info
BENJAMIN W HULSE
Blackwell Burke PA
contact info
Defendant
AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC
Represented By
Faris Rashid
Greene Espel Pllp
contact info
Plaintiff
MIKE HORKEY
Represented By
Brittany B Skemp
Bassford Remele, PA
contact info
Lewis A Remele, Jr
Bassford Remele
contact info
ARAM V DESTEIAN
Bassford Remele - Minneapolis Mn
contact info
Aram V. Desteian
Bassford Remele
contact info
Casey D Marshall
Bassford Remele, PA
contact info
MIKAL WATTS
Watts Guerra Llp - San Antonio Tx
contact info
ERIN J ROGIERS
Watts Guerra Llp - San Antonio Tx
contact info
CASEY D MARSHALL
Bassford Remele - Minneapolis Mn
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Plaintiff
MICHAEL YOUNG
Terminated: 10/15/2019
1341 LOLA DR
TALLAHASSEE, FL 32301
Represented By
Brittany B Skemp
Bassford Remele, PA
contact info
Lewis A Remele, Jr
Bassford Remele
contact info
ARAM V DESTEIAN
Bassford Remele - Minneapolis Mn
contact info
Aram V. Desteian
Bassford Remele
contact info
Casey D Marshall
Bassford Remele, PA
contact info
MIKAL WATTS
Watts Guerra Llp - San Antonio Tx
contact info
ERIN J ROGIERS
Watts Guerra Llp - San Antonio Tx
contact info
CASEY D MARSHALL
Bassford Remele - Minneapolis Mn
contact info
Plaintiff
DAVID WRIGHT
Terminated: 10/15/2019
Represented By
Brittany B Skemp
Bassford Remele, PA
contact info
Lewis A Remele, Jr
Bassford Remele
contact info
ARAM V DESTEIAN
Bassford Remele - Minneapolis Mn
contact info
Aram V. Desteian
Bassford Remele
contact info
Casey D Marshall
Bassford Remele, PA
contact info
MIKAL WATTS
Watts Guerra Llp - San Antonio Tx
contact info
ERIN J ROGIERS
Watts Guerra Llp - San Antonio Tx
contact info
CASEY D MARSHALL
Bassford Remele - Minneapolis Mn
contact info
Plaintiff
JEFF WINNER
Terminated: 10/15/2019
Represented By
Brittany B Skemp
Bassford Remele, PA
contact info
Lewis A Remele, Jr
Bassford Remele
contact info
ARAM V DESTEIAN
Bassford Remele - Minneapolis Mn
contact info
Aram V. Desteian
Bassford Remele
contact info
Casey D Marshall
Bassford Remele, PA
contact info
MIKAL WATTS
Watts Guerra Llp - San Antonio Tx
contact info
ERIN J ROGIERS
Watts Guerra Llp - San Antonio Tx
contact info
CASEY D MARSHALL
Bassford Remele - Minneapolis Mn
contact info
Plaintiff
KACEE TETZLAFF
Terminated: 10/15/2019
Represented By
Brittany B Skemp
Bassford Remele, PA
contact info
Lewis A Remele, Jr
Bassford Remele
contact info
ARAM V DESTEIAN
Bassford Remele - Minneapolis Mn
contact info
Aram V. Desteian
Bassford Remele
contact info
Casey D Marshall
Bassford Remele, PA
contact info
MIKAL WATTS
Watts Guerra Llp - San Antonio Tx
contact info
ERIN J ROGIERS
Watts Guerra Llp - San Antonio Tx
contact info
CASEY D MARSHALL
Bassford Remele - Minneapolis Mn
contact info
Plaintiff
BENJAMIN TARDIF
Terminated: 10/15/2019
Represented By
Brittany B Skemp
Bassford Remele, PA
contact info
Lewis A Remele, Jr
Bassford Remele
contact info
ARAM V DESTEIAN
Bassford Remele - Minneapolis Mn
contact info
Aram V. Desteian
Bassford Remele
contact info
Casey D Marshall
Bassford Remele, PA
contact info
MIKAL WATTS
Watts Guerra Llp - San Antonio Tx
contact info
ERIN J ROGIERS
Watts Guerra Llp - San Antonio Tx
contact info
CASEY D MARSHALL
Bassford Remele - Minneapolis Mn
contact info
Plaintiff
NICHOLAS SCHEFFER
Terminated: 10/15/2019
Represented By
Brittany B Skemp
Bassford Remele, PA
contact info
Lewis A Remele, Jr
Bassford Remele
contact info
ARAM V DESTEIAN
Bassford Remele - Minneapolis Mn
contact info
Aram V. Desteian
Bassford Remele
contact info
Casey D Marshall
Bassford Remele, PA
contact info
MIKAL WATTS
Watts Guerra Llp - San Antonio Tx
contact info
ERIN J ROGIERS
Watts Guerra Llp - San Antonio Tx
contact info
CASEY D MARSHALL
Bassford Remele - Minneapolis Mn
contact info
Plaintiff
JASON RYAN
Terminated: 10/15/2019
Represented By
Brittany B Skemp
Bassford Remele, PA
contact info
Lewis A Remele, Jr
Bassford Remele
contact info
ARAM V DESTEIAN
Bassford Remele - Minneapolis Mn
contact info
Aram V. Desteian
Bassford Remele
contact info
Casey D Marshall
Bassford Remele, PA
contact info
MIKAL WATTS
Watts Guerra Llp - San Antonio Tx
contact info
ERIN J ROGIERS
Watts Guerra Llp - San Antonio Tx
contact info
CASEY D MARSHALL
Bassford Remele - Minneapolis Mn
contact info
Plaintiff
PATRICK RUSSELL
Terminated: 10/15/2019
Represented By
Brittany B Skemp
Bassford Remele, PA
contact info
Lewis A Remele, Jr
Bassford Remele
contact info
ARAM V DESTEIAN
Bassford Remele - Minneapolis Mn
contact info
Aram V. Desteian
Bassford Remele
contact info
Casey D Marshall
Bassford Remele, PA
contact info
MIKAL WATTS
Watts Guerra Llp - San Antonio Tx
contact info
ERIN J ROGIERS
Watts Guerra Llp - San Antonio Tx
contact info
CASEY D MARSHALL
Bassford Remele - Minneapolis Mn
contact info
Plaintiff
RICHARD RUIZ
Terminated: 10/15/2019
Represented By
Brittany B Skemp
Bassford Remele, PA
contact info
Lewis A Remele, Jr
Bassford Remele
contact info
ARAM V DESTEIAN
Bassford Remele - Minneapolis Mn
contact info
Aram V. Desteian
Bassford Remele
contact info
Casey D Marshall
Bassford Remele, PA
contact info
MIKAL WATTS
Watts Guerra Llp - San Antonio Tx
contact info
ERIN J ROGIERS
Watts Guerra Llp - San Antonio Tx
contact info
CASEY D MARSHALL
Bassford Remele - Minneapolis Mn
contact info
Plaintiff
STEVEN REED
Terminated: 10/15/2019
Represented By
Brittany B Skemp
Bassford Remele, PA
contact info
Lewis A Remele, Jr
Bassford Remele
contact info
ARAM V DESTEIAN
Bassford Remele - Minneapolis Mn
contact info
Aram V. Desteian
Bassford Remele
contact info
Casey D Marshall
Bassford Remele, PA
contact info
MIKAL WATTS
Watts Guerra Llp - San Antonio Tx
contact info
ERIN J ROGIERS
Watts Guerra Llp - San Antonio Tx
contact info
CASEY D MARSHALL
Bassford Remele - Minneapolis Mn
contact info
Plaintiff
CHAD MCCLAIN
Terminated: 10/15/2019
Represented By
Brittany B Skemp
Bassford Remele, PA
contact info
Lewis A Remele, Jr
Bassford Remele
contact info
ARAM V DESTEIAN
Bassford Remele - Minneapolis Mn
contact info
Aram V. Desteian
Bassford Remele
contact info
Casey D Marshall
Bassford Remele, PA
contact info
MIKAL WATTS
Watts Guerra Llp - San Antonio Tx
contact info
ERIN J ROGIERS
Watts Guerra Llp - San Antonio Tx
contact info
CASEY D MARSHALL
Bassford Remele - Minneapolis Mn
contact info
Plaintiff
TYLER MACDONALD
Terminated: 10/15/2019
Represented By
Brittany B Skemp
Bassford Remele, PA
contact info
Lewis A Remele, Jr
Bassford Remele
contact info
ARAM V DESTEIAN
Bassford Remele - Minneapolis Mn
contact info
Aram V. Desteian
Bassford Remele
contact info
Casey D Marshall
Bassford Remele, PA
contact info
MIKAL WATTS
Watts Guerra Llp - San Antonio Tx
contact info
ERIN J ROGIERS
Watts Guerra Llp - San Antonio Tx
contact info
CASEY D MARSHALL
Bassford Remele - Minneapolis Mn
contact info
Plaintiff
SCOTT KELLY
Terminated: 10/15/2019
Represented By
Brittany B Skemp
Bassford Remele, PA
contact info
Lewis A Remele, Jr
Bassford Remele
contact info
ARAM V DESTEIAN
Bassford Remele - Minneapolis Mn
contact info
Aram V. Desteian
Bassford Remele
contact info
Casey D Marshall
Bassford Remele, PA
contact info
MIKAL WATTS
Watts Guerra Llp - San Antonio Tx
contact info
ERIN J ROGIERS
Watts Guerra Llp - San Antonio Tx
contact info
CASEY D MARSHALL
Bassford Remele - Minneapolis Mn
contact info
Plaintiff
DANIEL JOHANSEN
Terminated: 10/15/2019
Represented By
Brittany B Skemp
Bassford Remele, PA
contact info
Lewis A Remele, Jr
Bassford Remele
contact info
ARAM V DESTEIAN
Bassford Remele - Minneapolis Mn
contact info
Aram V. Desteian
Bassford Remele
contact info
Casey D Marshall
Bassford Remele, PA
contact info
MIKAL WATTS
Watts Guerra Llp - San Antonio Tx
contact info
ERIN J ROGIERS
Watts Guerra Llp - San Antonio Tx
contact info
CASEY D MARSHALL
Bassford Remele - Minneapolis Mn
contact info
Plaintiff
DELRICK HARDCASTLE
Terminated: 10/15/2019
Represented By
Brittany B Skemp
Bassford Remele, PA
contact info
Lewis A Remele, Jr
Bassford Remele
contact info
ARAM V DESTEIAN
Bassford Remele - Minneapolis Mn
contact info
Aram V. Desteian
Bassford Remele
contact info
Casey D Marshall
Bassford Remele, PA
contact info
MIKAL WATTS
Watts Guerra Llp - San Antonio Tx
contact info
ERIN J ROGIERS
Watts Guerra Llp - San Antonio Tx
contact info
CASEY D MARSHALL
Bassford Remele - Minneapolis Mn
contact info
Plaintiff
KELVIN GILLIAM
Terminated: 10/15/2019
Represented By
Brittany B Skemp
Bassford Remele, PA
contact info
Lewis A Remele, Jr
Bassford Remele
contact info
ARAM V DESTEIAN
Bassford Remele - Minneapolis Mn
contact info
Aram V. Desteian
Bassford Remele
contact info
Casey D Marshall
Bassford Remele, PA
contact info
MIKAL WATTS
Watts Guerra Llp - San Antonio Tx
contact info
ERIN J ROGIERS
Watts Guerra Llp - San Antonio Tx
contact info
CASEY D MARSHALL
Bassford Remele - Minneapolis Mn
contact info
Plaintiff
ANTONIO CRAWFORD
Terminated: 10/15/2019
Represented By
Brittany B Skemp
Bassford Remele, PA
contact info
Lewis A Remele, Jr
Bassford Remele
contact info
ARAM V DESTEIAN
Bassford Remele - Minneapolis Mn
contact info
Aram V. Desteian
Bassford Remele
contact info
Casey D Marshall
Bassford Remele, PA
contact info
MIKAL WATTS
Watts Guerra Llp - San Antonio Tx
contact info
ERIN J ROGIERS
Watts Guerra Llp - San Antonio Tx
contact info
CASEY D MARSHALL
Bassford Remele - Minneapolis Mn
contact info
Plaintiff
RYAN CHANEY
Terminated: 10/15/2019
Represented By
Brittany B Skemp
Bassford Remele, PA
contact info
Lewis A Remele, Jr
Bassford Remele
contact info
ARAM V DESTEIAN
Bassford Remele - Minneapolis Mn
contact info
Aram V. Desteian
Bassford Remele
contact info
Casey D Marshall
Bassford Remele, PA
contact info
MIKAL WATTS
Watts Guerra Llp - San Antonio Tx
contact info
ERIN J ROGIERS
Watts Guerra Llp - San Antonio Tx
contact info
CASEY D MARSHALL
Bassford Remele - Minneapolis Mn
contact info
Plaintiff
PETER CAROTHERS
Terminated: 10/15/2019
Represented By
Brittany B Skemp
Bassford Remele, PA
contact info
Lewis A Remele, Jr
Bassford Remele
contact info
ARAM V DESTEIAN
Bassford Remele - Minneapolis Mn
contact info
Aram V. Desteian
Bassford Remele
contact info
Casey D Marshall
Bassford Remele, PA
contact info
MIKAL WATTS
Watts Guerra Llp - San Antonio Tx
contact info
ERIN J ROGIERS
Watts Guerra Llp - San Antonio Tx
contact info
CASEY D MARSHALL
Bassford Remele - Minneapolis Mn
contact info
Plaintiff
ADAM BEYER
Terminated: 10/15/2019
Represented By
Brittany B Skemp
Bassford Remele, PA
contact info
Lewis A Remele, Jr
Bassford Remele
contact info
ARAM V DESTEIAN
Bassford Remele - Minneapolis Mn
contact info
Aram V. Desteian
Bassford Remele
contact info
Casey D Marshall
Bassford Remele, PA
contact info
MIKAL WATTS
Watts Guerra Llp - San Antonio Tx
contact info
ERIN J ROGIERS
Watts Guerra Llp - San Antonio Tx
contact info
CASEY D MARSHALL
Bassford Remele - Minneapolis Mn
contact info
Plaintiff
VLADIMIR AYALA
Terminated: 10/15/2019
Represented By
Brittany B Skemp
Bassford Remele, PA
contact info
Lewis A Remele, Jr
Bassford Remele
contact info
ARAM V DESTEIAN
Bassford Remele - Minneapolis Mn
contact info
Aram V. Desteian
Bassford Remele
contact info
Casey D Marshall
Bassford Remele, PA
contact info
MIKAL WATTS
Watts Guerra Llp - San Antonio Tx
contact info
ERIN J ROGIERS
Watts Guerra Llp - San Antonio Tx
contact info
CASEY D MARSHALL
Bassford Remele - Minneapolis Mn
contact info
Plaintiff
KURTIS ARMSTRONG
Terminated: 10/15/2019
Represented By
Brittany B Skemp
Bassford Remele, PA
contact info
Lewis A Remele, Jr
Bassford Remele
contact info
ARAM V DESTEIAN
Bassford Remele - Minneapolis Mn
contact info
Aram V. Desteian
Bassford Remele
contact info
Casey D Marshall
Bassford Remele, PA
contact info
MIKAL WATTS
Watts Guerra Llp - San Antonio Tx
contact info
ERIN J ROGIERS
Watts Guerra Llp - San Antonio Tx
contact info
CASEY D MARSHALL
Bassford Remele - Minneapolis Mn
contact info


Docket last updated: 12 hours ago
Thursday, November 21, 2019
14 14 cmp Amended Complaint Thu 11/21 5:13 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT -SHORT FORM- against 3M COMPANY, AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC, filed by MIKE HORKEY. (WATTS, MIKAL)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 15, 2019
13 13 8 pgs order Order ~Util - Add and Terminate Parties Wed 10/16 9:35 AM
PRETRIAL ORDER NO. 16 MULTI-PLAINTIFF ACTIONS. All plaintiffs named in any multi-plaintiff complaint currently pending in this MDL, except derivative plaintiffs, will be severed. For multi-plaintiff actions in which no remand motion is currently pending, all plaintiffs, except for the first-named plaintiff, are hereby DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE, with the right to refile an individual short form complaint in the approved form, currently available on the master docket for the MDL at ECF No. 705. The Clerk is directed to file a copy of this Order on the master docket for the MDL, and also on the individual docket for each action refiled by a severed plaintiff pursuant to this Order, whether the action is direct filed in this district or transferred here by the Panel. Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 10/15/2019. ADAM BEYER, PETER CAROTHERS, RYAN CHANEY, ANTONIO CRAWFORD, KELVIN GILLIAM, DELRICK HARDCASTLE, DANIEL JOHANSEN, SCOTT KELLY, TYLER MACDONALD, CHAD MCCLAIN, STEVEN REED, RICHARD RUIZ, PATRICK RUSSELL, JASON RYAN, NICHOLAS SCHEFFER, BENJAMIN TARDIF, KACEE TETZLAFF, JEFF WINNER, DAVID WRIGHT, MICHAEL YOUNG, KURTIS ARMSTRONG and VLADIMIR AYALA terminated. (djb)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 10, 2019
12 12 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 05/10 1:17 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by ERIN J ROGIERS on behalf of All Plaintiffs (ROGIERS, ERIN)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 06, 2019
11 11 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 05/06 2:43 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by MIKAL WATTS on behalf of All Plaintiffs (WATTS, MIKAL)
Related: [-]
10 10 transfer Case Transferred In - District Transfer (COURT USE ONLY) Mon 05/06 9:31 AM
Case transferred in from District of Minnesota; Case Number 0:19-cv-00964. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 18, 2019
9 9 CERTIFIED COPY OF CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-4) transferring case to the Northern District of Florida per the MDL Panel for coordinated or consolidated pretrial proceedings. Case assigned to the Honorable M. Casey Rodgers. (lmb) [Transferred from Minnesota on 5/6/2019.]
Related: [-]
Monday, April 15, 2019
8 8 STIPULATION to Stay Proceedings Pending Transfer to MDL by 3M Company. Jointly Signed by Mike Horkey, et al. and Aero Technologies, LLC. (Hulse, Benjamin) [Transferred from Minnesota on 5/6/2019.]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 10, 2019
7 7 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Aearo LLC is a corporate parent of Defendant Aearo Technologies, LLC. 3M Company is a publicly-held corporation owning 10 percent or more of stock of Defendant Aearo Technologies, LLC. (Rashid, Faris) [Transferred from Minnesota on 5/6/2019.]
Related: [-]
6 6 NOTICE by Aearo Technologies, LLC re1 Notice of Removal, CONSENT TO REMOVAL (Rashid, Faris) [Transferred from Minnesota on 5/6/2019.]
Related: [-]
Monday, April 08, 2019
5 5 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: Notice re: Non-Admitted Attorney We have received documents listing Michael C. Watts, Francisco Guerra IV, Erin Rogiers, Paul Danziger, Rodrigo R. de Llano as counsel of record. If he or she wishes to be listed as an attorney of record in this case, he or she must be admitted to the bar of the U.S. District Court of Minnesota in accordance with [LINK:Local Rule 83.5 (a), (b) and (c)] or temporarily admitted pro hac vice in accordance with [LINK:Local Rule 83.5 (d) or (e)] . For more admissions information and forms, please see the Attorney Forms Section of the courts website at [LINK:href=http://www.mnd.uscourts.gov/FORMS/court_forms.shtml#attorneyforms] [LINK:. (MMP) [Transferred from Minnesota on 5/6/2019.]
Related: [-]
4 4 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Eric C. Tostrud per 3rd, 4th Civil Master list, referred to Magistrate Judge David T. Schultz. Please use case number 19-cv-964 (ECT/DTS). (MMP) [Transferred from Minnesota on 5/6/2019.]
Related: [-]
3 3 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by 3M Company re1 Notice of Removal,2 Rule 7.1 - Disclosure Statement (Hulse, Benjamin) [Transferred from Minnesota on 5/6/2019.]
Related: [-]
2 2 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. There is no parent corporation, publicly held corporation or wholly-owned subsidiary to report for Defendant 3M Company. (Hulse, Benjamin) [Transferred from Minnesota on 5/6/2019.]
Related: [-]
1 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Hennepin County, case number 27-cv 19-4623 (filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMNDC-6791975) filed by 3M Company. No summons requested. (Hulse, Benjamin) [Transferred from Minnesota on 5/6/2019.]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Summons and Complaint,
Att: 2 Exhibit(s) Order Companioning Cases,
Att: 3 Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal,
Att: 4 Civil Cover Sheet