Florida Southern District Court
Judge:K Michael Moore
Referred: Jacqueline Becerra
Case #: 1:19-cv-21808
Nature of Suit370 Torts - Personal Property - Other Fraud
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Fraud
Case Filed:May 03, 2019
Terminated:Sep 12, 2019
Last checked: Wednesday Oct 30, 2019 4:48 AM EDT
Defendant
Dawn J. Miller
Plaintiff
Alejandro Amor
06859-104 Pensacola FPC Federal Prison Camp Inmate Mail/Parcels Post Office Box 3949
Pensacola, FL 32516


Docket last updated: 05/23/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Wednesday, October 30, 2019
17 17 notice Clerk's Notice of Undeliverable Mail Wed 10/30 10:22 AM
SECOND Clerk's Notice of Undeliverable Mail re 16 Clerk's Notice of Undeliverable Mail,. US Mail returned for: Alejandro Amor. Updated address found and document resent to new address. FPC PensacolaFEDERAL PRISON CAMPP.O. BOX 3949PENSACOLA, FL 32516 (mp)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 26, 2019
16 16 notice Clerk's Notice of Undeliverable Mail Thu 09/26 8:52 AM
FIRST Clerk's Notice of Undeliverable Mail re 15 Order Dismissing Case,,,,. US Mail returned for: Alejandro Amor. Updated address found and document resent to new address. RRM OrlandoRESIDENTIAL REENTRY OFFICE6303 COUNTY ROAD 500WILDWOOD, FL 34785 (mp)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 12, 2019
15 15 order Order Dismissing Case Thu 09/12 1:49 PM
PAPERLESS ORDER. THIS CAUSE came before the Court upon a sua sponte examination of the record. On August 1, 2019, the Court entered a Pretrial Order 13 requiring the Parties to file a joint scheduling report within ten (10) days of their joint scheduling conference, which was to be held no later than thirty (30) days after the filing of the Pretrial Order 13 . The Order cautioned, "[f]ailure of counsel to file a joint scheduling report within the deadlines set forth above may result in dismissal, default, and the imposition of other sanctions including attorney's fees and costs." The deadline for filing a joint scheduling report has passed and no extension of time has been requested. Accordingly, based on the foregoing, it is ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that this action is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. The Clerk of Court is instructed to CLOSE this case. All pending motions, if any, are DENIED AS MOOT. The Parties may move to reopen this matter upon the Parties filing a joint scheduling report. Signed by Chief Judge K. Michael Moore on 9/12/2019. (mh01)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 01, 2019
14 14 order Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge Thu 08/01 10:45 AM
PAPERLESS ORDER REFERRING PRETRIAL DISCOVERY MATTERS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE JACQUELINE BECERRA. PURSUANT to 28 U.S.C. § 636 and the Magistrate Rules of the Local Rules of the Southern District of Florida, the above-captioned Cause is referred to United States Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Becerra to take all necessary and proper action as required by law with respect to any and all pretrial discovery matters. Any motion affecting deadlines set by the Court's Scheduling Order is excluded from this referral, unless specifically referred by separate Order. It is FURTHER ORDERED that the parties shall comply with Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Becerra's discovery procedures. Signed by Chief Judge K. Michael Moore on 8/1/2019. (ah03)
Related: [-]
13 13 order Pretrial Order Thu 08/01 10:43 AM
PAPERLESS PRETRIAL ORDER. This Order has been entered upon the transfer of the case from Judge Ursula Ungaro. Plaintiff is hereby ORDERED to forward to all defendants a copy of this Order. It is further ORDERED that S.D. Fla. L.R. 16.1 shall apply to this case and the parties shall hold a scheduling conference no later than thirty (30) days after the filing of this Order. Within ten (10) days of the scheduling conference, counsel shall file a joint scheduling report. Failure of counsel to file a joint scheduling report within the deadlines set forth above may result in dismissal, default, and the imposition of other sanctions including attorney's fees and costs. The parties should note that the time period for filing a joint scheduling report is not tolled by the filing of any other pleading, such as an amended complaint or Rule 12 motion. The scheduling conference may be held via telephone. At the conference, the parties shall comply with the following agenda that the Court adopts from S.D. Fla. L.R. 16.1: (1) Documents (S.D. Fla. L.R. 16.1.B.1 and 2) - The parties shall determine the procedure for exchanging a copy of, or a description by category and location of, all documents and other evidence that is reasonably available and that a party expects to offer or may offer if the need arises. Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a)(1)(B). (a) Documents include computations of the nature and extent of any category of damages claimed by the disclosing party unless the computations are privileged or otherwise protected from disclosure. Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a)(1)(C). (b) Documents include insurance agreements which may be at issue with the satisfaction of the judgment. Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a)(1)(D). (2) List of Witnesses - The parties shall exchange the name, address and telephone number of each individual known to have knowledge of the facts supporting the material allegations of the pleading filed by the party. Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a)(1)(A). The parties have a continuing obligation to disclose this information. (3) Discussions and Deadlines (S.D. Fla. L.R. 16.1.B.2) - The parties shall discuss the nature and basis of their claims and defenses and the possibilities for a prompt settlement or resolution of the case. Failure to comply with this Order or to exchange the information listed above may result in sanctions and/or the exclusion of documents or witnesses at the time of trial. S.D. Fla. L.R. 16.1.I. Pursuant to Administrative Order 2016-70 of the Southern District of Florida and consistent with the Court of Appeals for the Eleventh Circuit's Local Rules and Internal Operating Procedures, within three days of the conclusion of a trial or other proceeding, parties must file via CM/ECF electronic versions of documentary exhibits admitted into evidence, including photographs of non-documentary physical exhibits. The Parties are directed to comply with each of the requirements set forth in Administrative Order 2016-70 unless directed otherwise by the Court. Telephonic appearances are not permitted for any purpose. Upon reaching a settlement in this matter the parties are instructed to notify the Court by telephone and to file a Notice of Settlement within twenty-four (24) hours. Signed by Chief Judge K. Michael Moore on 8/1/2019. (ah03)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 30, 2019
12 12 misc Clerks Receipt (combines Filing Fee and Partial Filing Fee) Tue 07/30 3:36 PM
Clerks Notice of Receipt of Filing Fee received on 7/30/2019 in the amount of $ 400.00, receipt number FLS100191919. (vt)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 19, 2019
11 11 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis Fri 07/19 1:17 PM
ORDER denying7 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. On or before August 8, 2019, the petitioner shall file a legally sufficient motion to proceed in forma pauperis with supporting, certified inmate account statement, or pay the Clerks filing fee of $400.00. Signed by Chief Judge K. Michael Moore on 7/19/2019. See attached document for full details. (ah03)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 01, 2019
10 10 2 pgs order Order Reassigning/Transferring Case Mon 07/01 2:31 PM
ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE to Chief Judge K. Michael Moore for all further proceedings, accepted and signed on 7/1/2019. Judge Ursula Ungaro no longer assigned to case. Signed by Chief Judge K. Michael Moore on 7/1/2019. See attached document for full details. (eso)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 07, 2019
9 9 notice Notice (Other) Fri 06/07 9:33 AM
NOTICE of Filing: Civil Cover Sheet by Alejandro Amor (vmz)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 06, 2019
8 8 3 pgs order Order Requiring Joint Scheduling Report ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings Thu 06/06 1:57 PM
Order Setting Initial Planning and Scheduling Conference, ( Scheduling Conference set for 7/12/2019 10:00 AM in Miami Division before Judge Ursula Ungaro.) Joint Scheduling Report due by 6/28/2019 Signed by Judge Ursula Ungaro on 6/5/2019. See attached document for full details. (vmz)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 29, 2019
7 7 motion Proceed In Forma Pauperis Wed 05/29 12:12 PM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Alejandro Amor. (ail)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 20, 2019
6 6 order - Order (PAPERLESS or pdf attached) Mon 05/20 5:14 PM
ORDER that Plaintiff SHALL file his civil cover sheet on or before June 1, 2019. Failure to timely file a civil cover sheet may result in dismissal of this action without further notice. Signed by Judge Ursula Ungaro on 5/20/2019. See attached document for full details. (vmz)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 15, 2019
5 5 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis Thu 05/16 8:28 AM
ORDER denying3 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. On or before 6/1/2019, the petitioner shall file a legally sufficient motion to proceed in forma pauperis with supporting, certified inmate account statement, or pay the Clerks filing fee of $400.00 Filing Fee due by 6/1/2019. Signed by Judge Ursula Ungaro on 5/15/2019. See attached document for full details. (cqs)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 07, 2019
4 4 3 pgs order Order of Instructions to Pro Se Litigant Tue 05/07 2:40 PM
ORDER OF INSTRUCTIONS TO PRO SE LITIGANT Signed by Judge Ursula Ungaro on 5/7/2019. See attached document for full details. (vmz)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 03, 2019
3 3 motion Proceed In Forma Pauperis Mon 05/06 11:06 AM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Alejandro Amor. (ar2)
Related: [-]
2 2 order Clerk's Notice of Judge Assignment and Optional Consent Mon 05/06 11:05 AM
Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Ursula Ungaro. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge John J. O'Sullivan is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (ar2)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Mon 05/06 11:01 AM
COMPLAINT for Legal and Equitable Relief against Dawn J. Miller. Filing fees $ 400.00. IFP Filed, filed by Alejandro Amor.(ar2)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Summon(s)