California Central District Court
Judge:Philip S Gutierrez
Referred: Jean P Rosenbluth
Case #: 2:19-cv-03934
Nature of Suit820 Property Rights - Copyrights
Cause28:1338 Copyright Infringement
Case Filed:May 06, 2019
Terminated:May 21, 2021
Last checked: Saturday Nov 02, 2019 2:00 AM PDT
Defendant
Christopher Comstock
Represented By
Robert A Jacobs
Manatt Phelps And Phillips LLP
contact info
Maura Kingseed Gierl
Manatt Phelps And Phillips LLP
contact info
Defendant
Kobalt Music Publishing America, Inc.
Represented By
Robert A Jacobs
Manatt Phelps And Phillips LLP
contact info
Maura Kingseed Gierl
Manatt Phelps And Phillips LLP
contact info
Defendant
Marshmello Creative, LLC
Represented By
Robert A Jacobs
Manatt Phelps And Phillips LLP
contact info
Maura Kingseed Gierl
Manatt Phelps And Phillips LLP
contact info
Defendant
Marshmello Music LLC
Represented By
Robert A Jacobs
Manatt Phelps And Phillips LLP
contact info
Maura Kingseed Gierl
Manatt Phelps And Phillips LLP
contact info
Defendant
Steven McCutcheon
Represented By
Robert A Jacobs
Manatt Phelps And Phillips LLP
contact info
Maura Kingseed Gierl
Manatt Phelps And Phillips LLP
contact info
Defendant
Polygram Publishing, Inc.
Represented By
Robert A Jacobs
Manatt Phelps And Phillips LLP
contact info
Joan H Cho
Universal Music Group
contact info
Maura Kingseed Gierl
Manatt Phelps And Phillips LLP
contact info
Defendant
Rokstone Music Limited
Represented By
Robert A Jacobs
Manatt Phelps And Phillips LLP
contact info
Maura Kingseed Gierl
Manatt Phelps And Phillips LLP
contact info
Defendant
Daniel Campbell Smith
Represented By
Robert A Jacobs
Manatt Phelps And Phillips LLP
contact info
Maura Kingseed Gierl
Manatt Phelps And Phillips LLP
contact info
Defendant
WWKD Limited
Represented By
Robert A Jacobs
Manatt Phelps And Phillips LLP
contact info
Maura Kingseed Gierl
Manatt Phelps And Phillips LLP
contact info
Defendant
Joytime Collective LLC
Represented By
Robert A Jacobs
Manatt Phelps And Phillips LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Artem Stoliarov
Represented By
Richard Steven Busch
King And Ballow
contact info


Docket last updated: 57 minutes ago
Friday, April 08, 2022
119 119 appeal USCA Mandate Mon 04/11 3:44 PM
MANDATE of Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals filed re: Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals,107 , CCA # 21-55442 The judgment of this Court, entered March 17, 2022, takes effect this date. This constitutes the formal mandate of this Court issued pursuant to Rule 41(a) of the Federal Rules of Appellate Procedure. [See USCA Memorandum118 AFFIRMED IN PART; DISMISSED IN PART.](mat)
Related: [-]