City of Brighton v. Purdue Pharma, L.P. et al
Consolidated
Lead case: 1:17-md-02804
Lead case: 1:17-md-02804
Ohio Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Dan Aaron Polster |
Case #: | 1:19-op-45298 |
Nature of Suit | 470 Other Statutes - Racketeer Influenced and Corrupt Organizations |
Cause | 18:1961 Racketeering (RICO) Act |
Case Filed: | May 06, 2019 |
Case in other court: | Colorado, 1:19-cv-01048 |
Last checked: Friday Nov 08, 2019 7:34 PM EST |
Defendant
Theresa Sackler
|
|
Defendant
Purdue Pharma L.P.
|
|
Defendant
Rhodes Pharmaceuticals Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Rhodes Pharmaceuticals L.P.
|
|
Defendant
Rhodes Technologies
|
|
Defendant
Rhodes Technologies Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Beverly Sackler
|
|
Defendant
David A. Sackler
|
|
Defendant
Jonathan D. Sackler
|
|
Defendant
Kathe A. Sackler
|
|
Defendant
Mortimer D.A. Sackler
|
|
Defendant
Richard S. Sackler
|
|
Defendant
Purdue Pharma Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Smiths Food & Drug Centers, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
SpecGX LLC
|
|
Defendant
Teva Pharmaceuticals Industries Ltd.
|
|
Defendant
Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Trust for the Benefit of Members of the Raymond Sackler Family
|
|
Defendant
Walgreens Boots Alliance Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Walmart Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Watson Laboratories Inc.
|
|
Defendant
West-Ward Pharmaceutical Corp.
|
|
Defendant
Hikma Pharmaceuticals PLC
|
|
Defendant
Actavis LLC
|
|
Defendant
Actavis Pharma, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Allergan Finance LLC
|
|
Defendant
Allergan PLC
|
|
Defendant
AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Cardinal Health Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Cephalon Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Endo Health Solutions Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc
|
|
Defendant
Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Johnson & Johnson
|
|
Defendant
Ilene Sackler Lefcourt
|
|
Defendant
Mallinckrodt PLC
|
|
Defendant
Mallinckrodt, LLC
|
|
Defendant
McKesson Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Par Pharmaceutical Companies Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Par Pharmaceutical Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Purdue Frederick Company, Inc., The
|
|
Plaintiff
City of Brighton
|
Represented By
|
TERMINATED PARTIES | |
Defendant
Smith Drug Company
Terminated: 10/01/2019
|
Docket last updated: 06/24/2019 4:56 PM EDT |
Tuesday, April 09, 2019 | ||
1 | 1 COMPLAINT against Actavis LLC, Actavis Pharma, Inc., Allergan Finance LLC, Allergan PLC, AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation, Cardinal Health, Inc., Cephalon, Inc., Endo Health Solutions Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Hikma Pharmaceuticals PLC, Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Mallinckrodt PLC, Mallinckrodt, LLC, McKesson Corporation, Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Par Pharmaceutical Companies, Inc., Par Pharmaceutical, Inc., Purdue Pharma, Inc., Purdue Pharma, L.P., Smith Drug Company, Smiths Food & Drug Centers, Inc., SpecGX LLC, Teva Pharmaceuticals Industries, Ltd., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., The Purdue Frederick Company, Inc., Walgreens Boots Alliance Inc., Walmart, Inc., Watson Laboratories, Inc., West-Ward Pharmaceutical Corp. (Filing fee $ 400,Receipt Number 1082-6626760)Attorney Derek William Loeser added to party Brighton, City of(pty:pla), filed by Brighton, City of.(Loeser, Derek) [Transferred from cod on 5/6/2019.] | |
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Summons | ||
2 | 2 NOTICE of Related Cases by Plaintiff Brighton, City of (Loeser, Derek) [Transferred from cod on 5/6/2019.] | |
3 | 3 Case assigned to Judge Robert E. Blackburn and drawn to Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix. Text Only Entry. (cmadr, ) [Transferred from cod on 5/6/2019.] | |
Wednesday, April 10, 2019 | ||
4 | 4 SUMMONSES issued by Clerk. (cmadr, ) [Transferred from cod on 5/6/2019.] | |
Att: 1 Magistrate Judge Consent Form | ||
5 | 5 1 pgs MEMORANDUM RETURNING CASE by Senior Judge Blackburn. This case is randomly reassigned to Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews. All future pleadings should be designated as 19-cv-01048-SKC. (athom, ) [Transferred from cod on 5/6/2019.] | |
6 | 6 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1, direct assignment of civil actions to full time magistrate judges. (athom, ) [Transferred from cod on 5/6/2019.] | |
Thursday, April 11, 2019 | ||
7 | 7 ADVISORY NOTICE TO ATTORNEY AND COURT: Attorney Jack D. Bajorek attempted to enter his appearance in this case by affixing his " s/ " signature to the complaint. Mr. Bajorek does not appear on the Court's attorney roll as a member of the bar of this court. Pursuant to D.C.COLO.LAttyR 5(a)(5), therefore, his purported appearance will not be recognized. (Text Only Entry) (mfred) [Transferred from cod on 5/6/2019.] | |
Friday, May 03, 2019 | ||
8 | 8 CERTIFIED COPY OF CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-90) from the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation pursuant to 28 USC 1407, transferring from the District of Colorado, 19-cv-01048 SKC, to the Northern District of Ohio, to become part of MDL 2804 by Clerk on 5/3/2019. (evana, ) [Transferred from cod on 5/6/2019.] | |
Monday, May 06, 2019 | ||
9 | 9 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of Colorado. Case number 1:19-cv-01048. Original file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. |