New Jersey District Court
Judge:Susan D Wigenton
Referred: Leda D Wettre
Case #: 2:19-cv-12235
Nature of Suit110 Contract - Insurance
Cause28:1335 Interpleader Action
Case Filed:May 07, 2019
Re-opened:May 15, 2023
Terminated:Dec 01, 2023
Last checked: Sunday Nov 03, 2019 4:18 AM EST
Defendant
CHRIS QUADREL
Represented By
JENNIFER E, PRESTI
Mandelbaum Salsburg P.C.
contact info
Defendant
RYAN QUADREL
Represented By
JENNIFER E, PRESTI
Mandelbaum Salsburg P.C.
contact info
Defendant
STEVEN QUADREL
Defendant
THE ESTATE OF MARK QUADREL
Represented By
JENNIFER E, PRESTI
Mandelbaum Salsburg P.C.
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Plaintiff
THE PRUDENTIAL INSURANCE COMPANY OF AMERICA
Terminated: 08/20/2019
Represented By
JOYCE MIN
D'Arcambal Ousley & Cuyler Burk LLP
contact info

GPO Jul 13 2020
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS ON MOTION FOR ATTORNEY FEES Objections, if any, to R&R due by 7/27/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Steven C. Mannion on 7/13/2020. (lag, )
GPO Jul 29 2020
ORDER adopting 24 Report & Recommendation of Judge Mannion that 21 motion for attorney's fees be denied, etc. Signed by Judge Susan D. Wigenton on 7/29/2020. (lag, )
GPO Dec 01 2023
OPINION. Signed by Judge Susan D. Wigenton on 12/1/2023. (qa, )
GPO Dec 08 2023
AMENDED WHEREAS OPINION. Signed by Judge Susan D. Wigenton on 12/8/2023. (lag, )

Docket last updated: 59 minutes ago
Tuesday, December 12, 2023
utility Interpleader Disbursement Completed (28 USC Sec 1335) Tue 12/12 9:42 AM
Interpleader Disbursement Completed (28 U.S.C. Section 1335) in the amount of $196,969.73 (lm2, )
Related: [-]
Friday, December 08, 2023
41 41 2 pgs order Order ~Util - Finance NEF Fri 12/08 3:34 PM
AMENDED ORDER directing the Clerk to disburse to the Mandelbaum Barrett PC Attorney Trust Account c/o Mandelbaum Barrett PC, 3 Becker Farm Road, Suite 105, Roseland, New Jersey 07068, Attn: Arla D. Cahill, Esq., the sum of $188,996.54. Signed by Judge Susan D. Wigenton on 12/8/2023. (lag, )
Related: [-]
40 40 4 pgs order Opinion Fri 12/08 2:58 PM
AMENDED WHEREAS OPINION. Signed by Judge Susan D. Wigenton on 12/8/2023. (lag, )
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 07, 2023
39 39 misc Amended Document (NOT Motion/Complaint) Thu 12/07 4:53 PM
AMENDED DOCUMENT by CHRIS QUADREL, RYAN QUADREL. Amended Order . (POLYCHRONIS, MICHAEL)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 01, 2023
38 38 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Summary Judgment Fri 12/01 4:22 PM
ORDER granting36 Prudential's Motion for Summary Judgment. The Clerk is directed to disburse to Defendants Ryan Quadrel and Chris Quadrel, in equal shares, the sum of $188,996.54, representing Prudential's death benefit insurance proceeds that were deposited into Court pursuant to this Court's Order dated August 19, 2019. Signed by Judge Susan D. Wigenton on 12/1/2023. (qa, )
Related: [-]
37 37 4 pgs order Opinion Fri 12/01 4:17 PM
OPINION. Signed by Judge Susan D. Wigenton on 12/1/2023. (qa, )
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 02, 2023
utility Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings Wed 08/02 9:29 AM
Set Deadlines as to36 MOTION for Summary Judgment . Motion set for 9/5/2023 before Judge Susan D. Wigenton. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (lag, )
Related: [-]
Sunday, July 30, 2023
36 36 motion Summary Judgment Sun 07/30 10:54 PM
MOTION for Summary Judgment by CHRIS QUADREL, RYAN QUADREL, THE ESTATE OF MARK QUADREL.(CAHILL, ARLA)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Statement Rule 56.1 Statement of Undisputed Material Facta,
Att: 2 Brief Brief in Support of Motion,
Att: 3 Declaration Declaration of Arla D. Cahill, Esq.,
Att: 4 Exhibit Exhibit A to Cahill Declaration,
Att: 5 Exhibit Exhibit B to Cahill Declaration,
Att: 6 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order
Thursday, June 29, 2023
35 35 1 pgs order Order Thu 06/29 4:17 PM
LETTER ORDER granting extension of time to file motion for summary judgment through 7/30/2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre on 6/29/2023. (lag, )
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 27, 2023
34 34 misc Letter Tue 06/27 3:37 PM
Letter from Arla D. Cahill. (CAHILL, ARLA)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 17, 2023
33 33 1 pgs order Order ~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys Wed 05/17 3:19 PM
LETTER ORDER regarding withdrawal of Attorney JOYCE MIN. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre on 5/17/2023. (lag, )
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 16, 2023
32 32 misc Letter Tue 05/16 4:58 PM
Letter to Judge Wettre from Joyce Min. Related [+] (lag, )
Related: [-] ceived via Help Desk
Monday, May 15, 2023
31 31 1 pgs order Order Reopening Case Scheduling Order Mon 05/15 5:17 PM
ORDER reopening this matter; scheduling a Telephone Conference on 5/31/2023 at 4:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre on 5/15/2023. (lag, ) (lag, )
Related: [-]
Friday, May 12, 2023
30 30 misc Letter Fri 05/12 4:58 PM
Letter from Arla D. Cahill. (CAHILL, ARLA)
Related: [-]
29 29 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 05/12 4:56 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by ARLA D. CAHILL on behalf of CHRIS QUADREL, RYAN QUADREL, THE ESTATE OF MARK QUADREL (CAHILL, ARLA)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 14, 2020
28 28 2 pgs order Order of Dismissal Mon 12/14 2:53 PM
ADMINISTRATIVE TERMINATION ORDER, etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre on 12/14/2020. (lag, )
Related: [-]
Friday, December 11, 2020
27 27 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 12/11 11:45 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by PHILIP ANTHONY PORTANTINO on behalf of All Defendants(PORTANTINO, PHILIP)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Letter to the Court,
Att: 2 Attachment 1 to Letter to the Court
Monday, November 09, 2020
26 26 order Order Mon 11/09 12:28 PM
TEXT ORDER - The parties are directed to file a letter on or before 11/23/2020 updating the Court about the status of this action and advising whether this case may be administratively terminated pending the outcome of related criminal proceedings. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre on 11/9/2020. (rn)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 02, 2020
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Mon 11/02 1:04 PM
Case Reassigned to Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre. Magistrate Judge Steven C. Mannion no longer assigned to the case. (ak, )
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 29, 2020
25 25 1 pgs order Order Adopting Report and Recommendations ~Util - Terminate Motions Wed 07/29 3:38 PM
ORDER adopting24 Report & Recommendation of Judge Mannion that21 motion for attorney's fees be denied, etc. Signed by Judge Susan D. Wigenton on 7/29/2020. (lag, )
Related: [-]
Monday, July 13, 2020
24 24 motion Report and Recommendations Mon 07/13 4:56 PM
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS ON MOTION FOR ATTORNEY FEES Objections, if any, to R&R due by 7/27/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Steven C. Mannion on 7/13/2020. (lag, )
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 09, 2020
minutes Telephone Conference Sun 07/12 11:58 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Steven C. Mannion: Telephone Conference held on 7/9/2020. (Court Reporter/Recorder ECR.) (spc, )
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 02, 2020
23 23 order Order Thu 07/02 6:46 PM
TEXT ORDER -- The telephone conference scheduled with Judge Mannion on 7/9/2020 at 4:l5 PM will be held using the dial-in number 866-434-5269 with access code 1874589#. If you have problems connecting to the conference line using a cell phone, try using a landline. No court proceedings, including proceedings conducted by audio or video teleconference, may be photographed, recorded, broadcast, or otherwise transmitted without the express permission of the Court. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Steven C. Mannion on 7/2/2020. (spc, )
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 11, 2020
22 22 order Order Thu 06/11 2:10 PM
TEXT ORDER -- The conference scheduled on 6/17/2020 is adjourned until 7/9/2020 at 4:15 PM. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Steven C. Mannion on 6/11/2020. (spc, )
Related: [-]
Friday, February 28, 2020
21 21 motion Attorney Fees Fri 02/28 12:45 PM
Second MOTION for Attorney Fees by CHRIS QUADREL, RYAN QUADREL, THE ESTATE OF MARK QUADREL.(PRESTI, JENNIFER)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order,
Att: 2 Brief,
Att: 3 Affidavit,
Att: 4 Affidavit,
Att: 5 Affidavit
utility Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings Fri 02/28 4:16 PM
Set Deadlines as to21 Second MOTION for Attorney Fees . Motion set for 4/6/2020 before Judge Susan D. Wigenton. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (lag, )
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 18, 2020
20 20 order Scheduling Order Tue 02/18 9:43 AM
PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER, etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Steven C. Mannion on 2/14/2020. (lag, )
Related: [-]
Friday, February 14, 2020
minutes Scheduling Conference Wed 02/19 5:04 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Steven C. Mannion: Scheduling Conference held on 2/14/2020. Initial scheduling Order filed. (spc, )
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 05, 2020
19 19 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Attorney Fees Wed 02/05 11:12 AM
LETTER ORDER denying without prejudice18 Motion for Attorney Fees, etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Steven C. Mannion on 2/4/2020. (lag, )
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 18, 2019
utility Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings Wed 12/18 9:54 AM
Set Deadlines as to18 First MOTION for Attorney Fees . Motion set for 1/6/2020 before Judge Susan D. Wigenton. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (lag, )
Related: [-]
Friday, December 13, 2019
18 18 motion Attorney Fees Fri 12/13 5:27 PM
First MOTION for Attorney Fees by CHRIS QUADREL, RYAN QUADREL, THE ESTATE OF MARK QUADREL.(PRESTI, JENNIFER)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed form of Order,
Att: 2 Certificate of Service Certification of Service,
Att: 3 Affidavit Certification of Counsel in support of Request for Attorney Fees,
Att: 4 Exhibit Exhibit A to Certification of Counsel
Tuesday, November 19, 2019
17 17 order Order Tue 11/19 4:54 PM
TEXT ORDER: A telephone conference is scheduled with Judge Mannion on 2/19/2020 at 4:15 PM. Defendant(s)' counsel is to initiate the call. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Steven C. Mannion on 11/19/19. (Mannion, Steven)
Related: [-]
minutes Telephone Conference Wed 11/20 1:34 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Steven C. Mannion: Telephone Conference held on 11/19/2019. Text Order entered scheduling next conference for 2/19/2020 at 4:15 PM (Court Reporter/Recorder ECR.) (spc, )
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 13, 2019
16 16 order 1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings Order Wed 11/13 6:07 PM
TEXT ORDER: A telephone conference shall take place on November 19, 2019 at 10:00AM. Counsel for Defendants shall call Judge Mannions chambers at that time. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Steven C. Mannion on 11/13/19. (Mannion, Steven)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 05, 2019
15 15 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Declaratory Judgment Tue 11/05 2:36 PM
ORDER granting14 Defendant's Motion for Declaratory Judgment, etc. Signed by Judge Susan D. Wigenton on 11/5/19. (lag, )
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 03, 2019
utility Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings Thu 10/03 11:41 AM
Set Deadlines as to14 MOTION for Declaratory Judgment. Motion set for 11/4/2019 before Judge Susan D. Wigenton. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (vm)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 02, 2019
14 14 motion Declaratory Judgment Thu 10/03 11:40 AM
MOTION for Declaratory Judgment by CHRIS QUADREL, RYAN QUADREL, THE ESTATE OF MARK QUADREL.(vm)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration Jennifer E. Presti,
Att: 2 Certificate of Service,
Att: 3 Text of Proposed Order,
Att: 4 Cover letter,
Att: 5 Envelope
Thursday, August 29, 2019
utility Interpleader Deposit Received (28 USC Sec 1335) Thu 08/29 11:20 AM
Interpleader Deposit Received (28 U.S.C. Section 1335) in the amount of $188,996.54. (ck)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 27, 2019
13 13 misc Certificate of Cash Deposit Tue 08/27 1:28 PM
Clerk's Certificate of Cash Deposit filed (Finance Notified) (dam, )
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 20, 2019
order ~Util - Finance NEF Tue 08/20 4:01 PM
Order to Deposit Funds12 (Finance notified) (th, )
Related: [-]
Monday, August 19, 2019
12 12 4 pgs order Order on Motion for Default Judgment Mon 08/19 12:01 PM
ORDER granting10 Motion for Default Judgment. Prudentials Motion for Deposit and Interpleader Relief is GRANTED, etc.***CIVIL CASE TERMINATED. Signed by Judge Susan D. Wigenton on 8/19/2019. (vm )
Related: [-]
Friday, July 26, 2019
11 11 respoth Response (NOT Motion) Fri 07/26 11:13 AM
RESPONSE re9 Application/Petition.(MIN, JOYCE)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certification of Service
10 10 motion Default Judgment Fri 07/26 10:45 AM
MOTION for Default Judgment as to Steven Quadrel, for Deposit of the Death Benefit Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 67, and for Interpleader Relief by THE PRUDENTIAL INSURANCE COMPANY OF AMERICA.(MIN, JOYCE)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Motion,
Att: 2 Brief,
Att: 3 Declaration of Joyce Min,
Att: 4 Exhibit A for Declaration of Joyce Min,
Att: 5 Declaration of Joyce Slomko,
Att: 6 Exhibits A through F to Declaration of Joyce Slomko,
Att: 7 Proposed Order,
Att: 8 Certification of Service
utility Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings Fri 07/26 3:14 PM
Set Deadlines as to10 Plaintiff's MOTION for Default Judgment as to Steven Quadrel, for Deposit of the Death Benefit Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 67, and for Interpleader Relief . Motion set for 8/19/2019 before Judge Susan D. Wigenton. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (dam, )
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 17, 2019
9 9 misc Application/Petition Tue 07/23 11:42 AM
APPLICATION/PETITION for Declaratory Judgment by CHRIS QUADREL, RYAN QUADREL.(ek)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Brief,
Att: 2 Declaration of Chris Quadrel,
Att: 3 Declaration of Ryan Quadrel,
Att: 4 Cover Letter,
Att: 5 Envelope
Tuesday, July 16, 2019
8 8 service Summons Returned Executed Tue 07/16 1:11 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by THE PRUDENTIAL INSURANCE COMPANY OF AMERICA. CHRIS QUADREL served on 5/20/2019, answer due 6/10/2019. (MIN, JOYCE)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 11, 2019
order Clerks Entry of Default Thu 07/11 9:44 AM
Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to STEVEN QUADREL for failure to plead or otherwise defend. (as, )
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 02, 2019
7 7 misc Request for Default Tue 07/02 2:01 PM
Request for Default by THE PRUDENTIAL INSURANCE COMPANY OF AMERICA against Steven Quadrel.(MIN, JOYCE)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration of Joyce S. Min in Support of Entry of Default,
Att: 2 Proposed Order,
Att: 3 Certification of Service
Tuesday, June 04, 2019
utility Update Answer Due Deadline Tue 06/04 11:58 AM
Clerk`s Text Order - The document6 Application for Clerk's Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order submitted by THE ESTATE OF MARK QUADREL, due July 24, 2019 and RYAN QUADREL, due June 17, 2019 has been GRANTED. (as, )
Related: [-]
Monday, June 03, 2019
6 6 misc Application for Clerk Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order Tue 06/04 11:51 AM
Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer as to CHRIS QUADREL and RYAN QUADREL, Individually and in his capacity as Executor of the Estate of Mark Quadrel. (as, )
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 29, 2019
5 5 service Summons Returned Executed Wed 05/29 10:40 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by THE PRUDENTIAL INSURANCE COMPANY OF AMERICA. STEVEN QUADREL served on 5/21/2019, answer due 6/11/2019. (MIN, JOYCE)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 28, 2019
4 4 service Summons Returned Executed Tue 05/28 12:24 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by THE PRUDENTIAL INSURANCE COMPANY OF AMERICA. RYAN QUADREL served on 5/13/2019, answer due 6/3/2019. (MIN, JOYCE)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 08, 2019
3 3 service Summons Issued Wed 05/08 4:05 PM
SUMMONS ISSUED as to CHRIS QUADREL, RYAN QUADREL, STEVEN QUADREL, THE ESTATE OF MARK QUADREL. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (dam, )
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 07, 2019
2 2 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Tue 05/07 12:45 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by THE PRUDENTIAL INSURANCE COMPANY OF AMERICA. (MIN, JOYCE)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Tue 05/07 12:43 PM
COMPLAINT against CHRIS QUADREL, RYAN QUADREL, STEVEN QUADREL, THE ESTATE OF MARK QUADREL ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-9646938), filed by THE PRUDENTIAL INSURANCE COMPANY OF AMERICA.(MIN, JOYCE)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A through F to Complaint,
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 3 Summons as to Steven Quadrel,
Att: 4 Summons as to Chris Quadrel,
Att: 5 Summons as to Ryan Quadrel, individually and in his capacity as Executor of The Estate of Mark Quadrel
utility Add and Terminate Judges Tue 05/07 3:06 PM
Judge Susan D. Wigenton and Magistrate Judge Steven C. Mannion added. (eu, )
Related: [-]