C-A Acquisition Corp et al v. Hyperion Entertainment CVBA
Washington Western District Court | |
Judge: | Ricardo S Martinez |
Case #: | 2:19-cv-00683 |
Nature of Suit | 840 Property Rights - Trademark |
Cause | 15:1125 Trademark Infringement (Lanham Act) |
Case Filed: | May 08, 2019 |
Last checked: Monday Nov 04, 2019 1:22 AM PST |
Defendant
Hyperion Entertainment CVBA
|
|
Plaintiff
Cloanto Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
C-A Acquisition Corp
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/25/2024 11:59 PM PDT |
Tuesday, June 13, 2023 | ||
27 | 27
misc
Status Report
Tue 06/13 7:29 AM
STATUS REPORT Request to Continue Stay by Plaintiffs C-A Acquisition Corp, Cloanto Corporation(Troy, Gordon) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Wednesday, February 12, 2020 | ||
26 | 26
2
pgs
order
Order Staying Case
Wed 02/12 4:14 PM
ORDER STAYING CASE: This matter is STAYED until Case No. 18-cv-381-RSM is resolved or until otherwise ordered by this Court. Upon the resolution of Case No. 18-cv-381-RSM, Plaintiffs are to file a status report in this case within fourteen (14) days. Signed by Judge Ricardo S. Martinez. (MW) |
|
Tuesday, December 31, 2019 | ||
25 | 25
respm
Declaration
Tue 12/31 11:05 AM
DECLARATION of William Wallace McEwen filed by Plaintiffs C-A Acquisition Corp, Cloanto Corporation re23 MOTION for Default Judgment (Atkins, Michael) |
|
24 | 24
respm
Declaration
Tue 12/31 11:03 AM
DECLARATION of Michele Console Battilana filed by Plaintiffs C-A Acquisition Corp, Cloanto Corporation re23 MOTION for Default Judgment (Atkins, Michael) |
|
23 | 23
motion
Default Judgment
Tue 12/31 10:51 AM
MOTION for Default Judgment , filed by Plaintiffs C-A Acquisition Corp, Cloanto Corporation. Noting Date 12/31/2019, (Atkins, Michael) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 - Settlement Agreement, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit 2 - Declaration of Gordon E.R. Troy, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit 3 - Declaration of Michael G. Atkins, | ||
Att: 4 Proposed Order | ||
Friday, December 27, 2019 | ||
22 | 22
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Leave to File Over-length Motions and Briefs
Fri 12/27 2:38 PM
ORDER granting Plaintiffs'21 Motion for Leave to File Over-Length Motion. Plaintiffs may file a motion for entry of default judgment of no more than 11 total pages. Defendant's response brief (if any) shall be no more than 11 total pages. Signed by Judge Ricardo S. Martinez. (PM) |
|
Monday, December 16, 2019 | ||
21 | 21
motion
File Over-length Motions and Briefs
Mon 12/16 8:58 AM
MOTION for Leave to File Over-length Motions and Briefs re: Motion for Entry of Default Judgment , filed by Plaintiffs C-A Acquisition Corp, Cloanto Corporation. Noting Date 12/16/2019, (Atkins, Michael) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Thursday, November 21, 2019 | ||
20 | 20
2
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Default
Thu 11/21 3:51 PM
ORDER granting Plaintiffs'16 Motion for Default Against Hyperion Entertainment CVBA signed by Clerk William M McCool. (LW) |
|
Wednesday, November 06, 2019 | ||
19 | 19
respm
Proposed Order (Unsigned)
Wed 11/06 9:06 AM
PROPOSED ORDER (Unsigned) re16 MOTION for Default (Atkins, Michael) |
|
18 | 18
respm
Declaration
Wed 11/06 9:05 AM
DECLARATION of Michael G. Atkins filed by Plaintiffs C-A Acquisition Corp, Cloanto Corporation re16 MOTION for Default (Atkins, Michael) |
|
17 | 17
respm
Declaration
Wed 11/06 9:04 AM
DECLARATION of Gordon E.R. Troy filed by Plaintiffs C-A Acquisition Corp, Cloanto Corporation re16 MOTION for Default (Atkins, Michael) |
|
16 | 16
motion
Default
Wed 11/06 9:02 AM
MOTION for Default , filed by Plaintiffs C-A Acquisition Corp, Cloanto Corporation. Noting Date 11/6/2019, (Atkins, Michael) |
|
Wednesday, October 23, 2019 | ||
15 | 15
service
Affidavit of Service of Summons & Complaint
Wed 10/23 6:32 PM
AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint on Hyperion Entertainment CVBA on 10/8/2019, filed by Plaintiffs C-A Acquisition Corp, Cloanto Corporation.(Troy, Gordon) |
|
Att: 1 English Language Translation of service of First amended complaint, Summons, etc. pursuant to Hague Convention, | ||
Att: 2 Certificate of Service | ||
Friday, August 23, 2019 | ||
14 | 14
4
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time-Other ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines
Fri 08/23 3:18 PM
ORDER re: Plaintiffs'13 Ex Parte Motion for Extension of Time. FRCP 26f Conference Deadline is 11/5/2019, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 11/12/2019, Joint Status Report due by 11/19/2019. Signed by Judge Ricardo S. Martinez. (PM) |
|
Wednesday, August 21, 2019 | ||
13 | 13
motion
Extension of Time-Other
Wed 08/21 2:01 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time (Ex Parte) to Extend Time For Filing Initial Disclosures, Holding Rule 26(F) Conference, and File Joint Status Report , filed by Plaintiffs C-A Acquisition Corp, Cloanto Corporation. Noting Date 8/21/2019, (Troy, Gordon) |
|
Friday, August 09, 2019 | ||
12 | 12
order
Joint Status Report Order Form for District Judges
Fri 08/09 12:42 PM
ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES AND JOINT STATUS REPORT Joint Status Report due by 9/20/2019, FRCP 26f Conference Deadline is 9/6/2019, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 9/13/2019, by Judge Ricardo S. Martinez. (LW) |
|
Wednesday, July 31, 2019 | ||
11 | 11
2
pgs
order
Order Reassigning Case
Wed 07/31 10:24 AM
ORDER REASSIGNING CASE TO THE HON. RICARDO S. MARTINEZ by Hon. Michelle L. Peterson. (TF) |
|
Wednesday, July 17, 2019 | ||
10 | 10
cmp
Amended Complaint
Wed 07/17 4:20 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against defendant(s) Hyperion Entertainment CVBA with JURY DEMAND, filed by C-A Acquisition Corp, Cloanto Corporation.(Troy, Gordon) |
|
Thursday, May 09, 2019 | ||
9 | 9
notice
Notice of Related Case
Thu 05/09 12:29 PM
NOTICE of Related Case(s) 18-cv-00381; 18-cv-0035, by Plaintiffs C-A Acquisition Corp, Cloanto Corporation. (Troy, Gordon) |
|
8 | 8
order
Order on Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice
Thu 05/09 10:31 AM
ORDER re7 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Gordon E R Troy for Plaintiffs C-A Acquisition Corp and Cloanto Corporation, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only. NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d). (DS) |
|
7 | 7
misc
Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice
Thu 05/09 10:12 AM
APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Gordon E.R. Troy FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiffs C-A Acquisition Corp, Cloanto Corporation (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-5760813 (Atkins, Michael) |
|
6 | 6
utility
Notice to Filer
Thu 05/09 9:28 AM
NOTICE TO FILER: re1 Complaint,. Notice of Filing Deficiency ** Action Required ** See Attached Letter for More Information and Instructions. (GT) |
|
5 | 5
service
Summons Issued
Thu 05/09 9:28 AM
Summons Electronically Issued as to defendant Hyperion Entertainment CVBA. (GT) |
|
4 | 4
utility
Report Regarding Patent/Trademark/Copyright
Thu 05/09 9:27 AM
REPORT on the filing or determination of an action. Emailed to the US Patent Office. (GT) |
|
utility
Add and Terminate Judges
Thu 05/09 9:09 AM
Hon. Michelle L. Peterson added. (GT) |
||
Wednesday, May 08, 2019 | ||
3 | 3
discov
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Wed 05/08 9:11 AM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Cloanto Corporation (Atkins, Michael) |
|
2 | 2
discov
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Wed 05/08 9:10 AM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by C-A Acquisition Corp. (Atkins, Michael) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Wed 05/08 9:00 AM
COMPLAINT against defendant(s) Hyperion Entertainment C.V.B.A. with JURY DEMAND , filed by C-A Acquisition Corp., Cloanto Corporation.(Atkins, Michael) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Report on Patents and Trademarks (AO Form 120), | ||
Att: 3 Summons |