Paisley Park Enterprises, Inc., et al v. George Boxill
Original Case: 0:17-cv-01212
Eighth Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals | |
Case #: | 0:19-cv-01941 |
Type | civil / private |
Nature of Suit | 190 Contract - Other Contract |
Case Filed: | May 08, 2019 |
Terminated: | Feb 19, 2020 |
Last checked: Friday Feb 21, 2020 4:09 AM CST |
Defendant
Rogue Music Alliance, LLC
|
|
Defendant
Deliverance, LLC
|
|
Defendant
David Staley
|
|
Defendant
Gabriel Solomon Wilson
|
|
Defendant
Brown & Rosen, LLC
|
|
Defendant
Sidebar Legal, PC
|
|
Defendant - Appellant
George Ian Boxill
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellee
Paisley Park Enterprises, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellee
Comerica Bank & Trust, N.A., as Personal Representative of the Estate of Prince Rogers Nelson
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 02/21/2020 4:09 AM CST |
Wednesday, May 08, 2019 | ||
4 pgs Civil case docketed. [4785453] 19-1941 (MMH) | ||
30+ pgs Originating court document filed consisting of notice of appeal, docket entries, and Order granting motion to confirm arb. award 4/8/19 [4785480] 19-1941 (MMH) | ||
2
pgs
BRIEFING SCHEDULE SET AS FOLLOWS: Transcript due on or before 06/17/2019. Appendix due 06/27/2019. BRIEF APPELLANT, George Ian Boxill due 06/27/2019 Appellee brief is due 30 days from the date the court issues the Notice of Docket Activity filing the brief of appellant. Appellant reply brief is due 21 days from the date the court issues the Notice of Docket Activity filing the appellee brief. [4785490] 19-1941 (MMH) |