Kentucky Eastern District Court
Case #: 5:19-cr-00098
Case Filed:May 09, 2019
Last checked: Friday May 10, 2019 3:23 AM EDT
Defendant
Franklin Fletcher (1)
Represented By
Doreen Helen-Marie Thompson
Thompson Law Office - Lexington
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Kathryn Anderson, AUSA
U.S. Attorney'S Office, Edky
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/10/2019 5:01 AM EDT
Monday, April 29, 2019
1 1 NOTICE OF INTENT TO FILE INFORMATION and MOTION for Arraignment by USA as to Franklin Fletcher. (JJ) Modified text on 5/9/2019 (JJ).
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
2 2 ORDER SETTING ARRAIGNEMNT as to Franklin Fletcher (1): USA's1 Motion for Arraignment is GRANTED, and ARRAIGNMENT set for 5/9/2019 at 10:30 AM in LEXINGTON before Judge Danny C. Reeves. The Court further ORDERS the defendant to contact USPO within 48 hours of receipt of this Order. Signed by Judge Danny C. Reeves on 4/29/2019. (JJ)cc: COR,USM,USP,D,JC Modified file date on 5/9/2019 (JJ).
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 09, 2019
Conflict Check run. (JJ)
Related: [-]
CJA Appointment of Attorney for Franklin Fletcher. The Clerk ENTERED the representation and appointment in the eVoucher system for Doreen Thompson. (JJ)
Related: [-]
3 3 INFORMATION as to Franklin Fletcher (1) count(s) 1, 2. Forfeiture Allegation not statistically counted or listed on docket. (JJ)
Related: [-]
5 5 MINUTE ENTRY for RE-ARRAIGNMENT & GUILTY PLEA as to Franklin Fletcher held on 5/9/2019 before Judge Danny C. Reeves: Doreen Thompson appeared as APPOINTED CJA counsel of record; Waiver of Indictment executed in open court & filed; Dft states true name is Franklin Fletcher; Court provisionally appoints counsel under the CJA; dft formally arraigned and advised of rights; dft pleads GUILTY to counts 1-2; dft agrees with facts contained in the forfeiture; PLEA AGREEMENT filed with the Court; transcript shall be deemed written findings of the Court; Court orders a Presentence Report; dft released on conditions; SENTENCING set for 8/23/2019 at 11:00 AM in LEXINGTON before Judge Danny C. Reeves; The Court found dft to be fully competent and capable of entering an informed plea; Further, the guilty plea is knowing and voluntary; plea is accepted and dft is adjudged guilty (Court Reporter Peggy Weber.) (JJ)cc: COR,USM,USP,D
Related: [-]
6 6 WAIVER OF INDICTMENT by Franklin Fletcher (JJ)
Related: [-]
7 7 CJA 23 Financial Affidavit by Franklin Fletcher (JJ)
Related: [-]
8 8 PLEA AGREEMENT as to Franklin Fletcher cc: COR,USP (JJ)
Related: [-]
9 9 SENTENCING ORDER as to Franklin Fletcher : Sentencing Reform Act. Signed by Judge Danny C. Reeves on 5/9/2019. (JJ)cc: COR,USM,USP
Related: [-]
10 10 ORDER Setting Conditions of Release as to Franklin Fletcher. Signed by Judge Danny C. Reeves on 5/9/2019. (JJ)cc: COR,USM,USP
Related: [-]