New Jersey District Court
Case #: 3:19-cr-00338
Case Filed:May 09, 2019
Last checked: Friday May 10, 2019 3:50 AM EDT
Defendant
GARY AUSMORE (1)
Represented By
RICHARD SPARACO
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
JAMES BRENDAN DAY
Office Of The U.S. Attorney
contact info
ALEXANDER EDWARD RAMEY
United States Attorney'S Office For The District Of New
contact info

GPO May 09 2019
ORDER Amending Conditions of Release as to GARY AUSMORE; amending location monitoring to curfew as directed by Pretrial Services. All other conditions previously ordered shall remain in effect. Signed by Judge Freda L. Wolfson on 5/9/2019. (jmm, )

Docket last updated: 05/10/2019 4:50 AM EDT
Wednesday, October 24, 2018
1 1 SEALED COMPLAINT as to JAKIR TAYLOR (1), JEROME ROBERTS (2), DAVID ANTONIO (3), OMAR COUNCIL (4), BRIAN PHELPS (5), GARY AUSMORE (6), DAVIAS TAYLOR (7), ALONZO LEARY (8), MAJOR ANDERSON (9), WAYNE K BUSH (10), TACQUES HALL (11), KAHLIL HAMPTON (12), BRANDON COUNCIL (13), SHAQUEL ROCK (14), DENNIS CHESTON, JR (15), DONTE ELLIS (16), TIMOTHY WIMBUSH (17), TAQUAN WILLIAMS (18), JUBRI WEST (19), MALIK BINGHAM (20), DEAVON WARNER (21), JAQUAN WADE (22), QUIANA WELCH (23), KALEIB COX (24), VARLEE KOON (25), LATRICE WHARTON (26). (ce3) [3:18-mj-01535-DEA]
Related: [-]
2 2 Order to Seal Case as to JAKIR TAYLOR, JEROME ROBERTS, DAVID ANTONIO, OMAR COUNCIL, BRIAN PHELPS, GARY AUSMORE, DAVIAS TAYLOR, ALONZO LEARY, MAJOR ANDERSON, TACQUES HALL, BRANDON COUNCIL, DENNIS CHESTON, JR, DONTE ELLIS, TIMOTHY WIMBUSH, JUBRI WEST, MALIK BINGHAM, DEAVON WARNER, JAQUAN WADE, QUIANA WELCH, KALEIB COX, VARLEE KOON, LATRICE WHARTON, WAYNE K BUSH, TAQUAN WILLIAMS, KAHLIL HAMPTON, SHAQUEL ROCK.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert on 10/24/2018. (ce3) [3:18-mj-01535-DEA]
Related: [-]
8 8 ARREST Warrant Issued in case as to GARY AUSMORE. (ce3) [3:18-mj-01535-DEA]
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 25, 2018
Arrest of GARY AUSMORE. (gxh) [3:18-mj-01535-DEA]
Related: [-]
67 67 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert: Initial Appearance and Attorney Appointment Hearing as to GARY AUSMORE held on 10/25/2018. Ordered Richard Sparaco, CJA appointed as counsel. Defendant Ordered detained with right to make a bail application at a later time. Order of Detention and Continuance Order to be filed. (Court Recorder: Mark Morelli.) (gxh) [3:18-mj-01535-DEA]
Related: [-]
69 69 CJA 20 as to GARY AUSMORE: Appointment of Attorney RICHARD SPARACO, ESQ. for GARY AUSMORE. Signed by Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert on 10/25/2018. (gxh) [3:18-mj-01535-DEA]
Related: [-]
70 70 WAIVER of Preliminary Examination or Hearing by GARY AUSMORE. (gxh) [3:18-mj-01535-DEA]
Related: [-]
71 71 ORDER TO CONTINUE - Ends of Justice as to GARY AUSMORE. Time excluded from 10/25/2018 until 1/11/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert on 10/25/2018. (gxh) [3:18-mj-01535-DEA]
Related: [-]
Friday, October 26, 2018
133 133 ORDER OF DETENTION as to GARY AUSMORE. Signed by Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert on 10/26/2018. (ce3) [3:18-mj-01535-DEA]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 06, 2018
192 192 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert: Hearing on application of Defendant for Pretrial Release. Ordered application granted. Ordered bail set at $150,000 unsecured bond with third party custodian (Gary Ausmore, Sr.). Order Setting Conditions of Release to follow. (digitally recorded.) (ce3) [3:18-mj-01535-DEA]
Related: [-]
193 193 ORDER Setting Conditions of Release as to GARY AUSMORE (6) $150,000 UNSECURED APPEARANCE BOND WITH THIRD-PARTY CUSTODIAN (Gary Ausmore, Sr.) (Finance notified). Signed by Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert on 11/6/2018. (ce3) [3:18-mj-01535-DEA]
Related: [-]
194 194 $150,000 UNSECURED APPEARANCE BOND WITH THIRD-PARTY CUSTODIAN (Gary Ausmore, Sr.) Entered as to GARY AUSMORE (ce3) [3:18-mj-01535-DEA]
Related: [-]
195 195 ORDER FOR INTERIM PAYMENTS FOR REPRESENTATION OF COUNSEL PURSUANT TO THE CRIMINAL JUSTICE ACT 18:3006A as to GARY AUSMORE. Signed by Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert on 11/6/2018. (ce3) [3:18-mj-01535-DEA]
Related: [-]
196 196 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE ALEXANDER EDWARD RAMEY appearing for USA. (RAMEY, ALEXANDER) [3:18-mj-01535-DEA]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 02, 2019
235 235 ORDER TO CONTINUE - Ends of Justice as to GARY AUSMORE Time excluded from 1/2/2019 until 3/15/2019.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert on 1/2/2019. (ce3) Modified on 1/7/2019 (ce3). [3:18-mj-01535-DEA]
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 31, 2019
260 260 Letter from Richard Sparaco, Esq., attorney for defendant Gary Ausmore(SPARACO, RICHARD) [3:18-mj-01535-DEA]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order Order Modifying Conditions of Release
261 261 Letter(SPARACO, RICHARD) [3:18-mj-01535-DEA]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order Order Modifying Conditions of Release
262 262 ORDER MODIFYING CONDITIONS OF RELEASE as to GARY AUSMORE. Signed by Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert on 1/31/2019. (ce3) [3:18-mj-01535-DEA]
Related: [-]
Friday, February 01, 2019
263 263 ORDER Setting Conditions of Release as to GARY AUSMORE (6) $150,000 Unsecured Appearance Bond W/ Kaheerah Marshall as Third-Party Custodian and Co-Signor/Bond Surety. All other conditions of defendant's release shall remain in full force and effect (Finance notified). Signed by Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni on 2/1/2019. (ce3) [3:18-mj-01535-DEA]
Related: [-]
264 264 $150,000 Unsecured Appearance Bond W/ Kaheerah Marshall as Third-Party Custodian and Co-Signor/Bond Surety entered as to GARY AUSMORE. (ce3) [3:18-mj-01535-DEA]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 13, 2019
277 277 ORDER TO CONTINUE - Ends of Justice as to GARY AUSMORE Time excluded from 3/13/2019 until 5/17/2019.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert on 3/13/19. (ce3) [3:18-mj-01535-DEA]
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 09, 2019
Notice of Allocation and Assignment as to GARY AUSMORE (Trenton-Freda L. Wolfson, U.S.D.J.) (jmm, )
Related: [-]
278 278 INFORMATION as to GARY AUSMORE (1) count 1. (jmm, )
Related: [-]
279 279 WAIVER OF INDICTMENT by GARY AUSMORE. (jmm, )
Related: [-]
280 280 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Freda L. Wolfson: Initial Appearance on Information as to GARY AUSMORE held on 5/9/2019, Plea Agreement Hearing held on 5/9/2019, Guilty Plea entered as to Count 1., ( Sentencing set for 8/29/2019 10:00 AM in Trenton - Courtroom 5E before Judge Freda L. Wolfson.) Ordered bail amended from location monitoring to curfew as directed by Pretrial Services. All other previously imposed conditions of release shall remain in effect. (Court Reporter/Recorder Vincent Russoniello.) (jmm, )
Related: [-]
281 281 APPLICATION for permission to enter Plea of guilty as to GARY AUSMORE. (jmm, )
Related: [-]
282 282 PLEA AGREEMENT as to GARY AUSMORE. (jmm, )
Related: [-]
283 283 ORDER Amending Conditions of Release as to GARY AUSMORE; amending location monitoring to curfew as directed by Pretrial Services. All other conditions previously ordered shall remain in effect. Signed by Judge Freda L. Wolfson on 5/9/2019. (jmm, )
Related: [-]