United States of America v. Kotzev
Virginia Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Liam O'Grady |
Referred: | Ivan D Davis |
Case #: | 1:14-cv-00190 |
Nature of Suit | 870 Federal Tax Suits - Taxes (U.S. Plaintiff or Defendant) |
Cause | 26:7402 IRS: Petition to Enforce IRS Summons |
Case Filed: | Feb 20, 2014 |
Terminated: | Jul 08, 2014 |
Last checked: Tuesday Dec 09, 2014 4:22 AM EST |
Defendant
Constantin Kotzev
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
United States of America
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/22/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Tuesday, July 08, 2014 | ||
18 | 18 ORDER Stipulation of Dismissal Without Prejudice Pursuant to Rule 41(a) and Consent order Cancelling July 11 Hearing as Moot (see order for details). Signed by District Judge Liam O'Grady on 7/8/14. (klau, ) | |
Thursday, May 08, 2014 | ||
17 | 17 ORDER granting16 Motion for Hearing. Signed by Magistrate Judge Ivan D. Davis on 5/8/2014. (Davis, Ivan) | |
16 | 16 MOTION for Hearing re12 Order to Show Cause Joint Motion to Continue Hearing by United States of America.(Mene, Gerard) | |
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Reset Hearings: Show Cause Hearing set for 7/11/2014 10:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 400 before Magistrate Judge Ivan D. Davis. (klau, ) | ||
Friday, May 02, 2014 | ||
15 | 15 Response to12 Order to Show Cause filed by Constantin Kotzev. (Hicks, Matthew) | |
Friday, April 25, 2014 | ||
14 | 14 NOTICE by United States of America re12 Order to Show Cause Return of Service(Mene, Gerard) | |
Att: 1 Exhibit | ||
Thursday, April 24, 2014 | ||
13 | 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew Conner Hicks on behalf of Constantin Kotzev (Hicks, Matthew) | |
Friday, March 28, 2014 | ||
12 | 12 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Signed by Magistrate Judge Ivan D. Davis on 3/28/2014. Show Cause Hearing set for 5/16/2014 10:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 400 before Magistrate Judge Ivan D. Davis. Show Cause Response due by 5/2/2014. (rban, ) | |
11 | 11 ORDER granting2 APPLICATION for Special Process Server. Signed by Magistrate Judge Ivan D. Davis on 3/28/2014. (rban, ) | |
10 | 10 ORDER granting8 Motion to Amend/Correct. Signed by Magistrate Judge Ivan D. Davis on 3/28/2014. (Davis, Ivan) | |
9 | 9 Request for Hearing by United States of America re1 Petition to Enforce IRS Summons, (Mene, Gerard) | |
8 | 8 MOTION to Amend/Correct1 Petition to Enforce IRS Summons, by United States of America. (Mene, Gerard) | |
Wednesday, March 26, 2014 | ||
7 | 7 ORDER granting5 Motion to Amend/Correct. Signed by Magistrate Judge Ivan D. Davis on 3/26/2012. (Davis, Ivan) | |
Tuesday, March 25, 2014 | ||
6 | 6 Notice of Hearing Date March 28, 2014 re5 MOTION to Amend/Correct1 Petition to Enforce IRS Summons, (Mene, Gerard) | |
5 | 5 MOTION to Amend/Correct1 Petition to Enforce IRS Summons, by United States of America.(Mene, Gerard) | |
Att: 1 Affidavit substituted declaration, | ||
Att: 2 Proposed Order | ||
Thursday, February 27, 2014 | ||
4 | 4 ORDER granting3 Motion for Pro hac vice. Signed by District Judge Liam O'Grady on 2/27/14. (klau, ) | |
Friday, February 21, 2014 | ||
3 | 3 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Melissa Dickey and Certification of Local Counsel Gerard Mene by United States of America. (Mene, Gerard) | |
Thursday, February 20, 2014 | ||
2 | 2 APPLICATION for Special Process Server by United States of America.(klau, ) | |
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
1 | 1 PETITION to Enforce IRS Summons, filed by United States of America.(klau, ) (klau, ). | |
Att: 1 Declaration of John Sutherland, | ||
Att: 2 Declaration of Michael Danilack, | ||
Att: 3 Proposed Order | ||
Att: 4 (2/21/2014) Civil Cover Sheet |