Consolidated
Lead case: 3:19-md-02885

Florida Northern District Court
Judge:M Casey Rodgers
Referred: Gary R Jones
Case #: 3:19-cv-01463
Nature of Suit365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Case Filed:May 14, 2019
Terminated:Oct 22, 2019
Case in other court:Minnesota, 0:19-cv-01161
Last checked: Sunday Nov 10, 2019 4:17 AM EST
Defendant
3M COMPANY
Plaintiff
SAMUEL HANSON
Represented By
ROBERTO MARTINEZ
Colson Hicks Eidson
contact info
Yvonne M Flaherty
Lockridge Grindal Nauen Pllp
contact info
YVONNE FLAHERTY
Lockridge Grindal Nauen Pllp
contact info
FRANCISCO RAUL MADERAL
Colson Hicks Eidson Pa - Coral Gables Fl
contact info


Docket last updated: 1 hours ago
Tuesday, October 22, 2019
10 10 notice Notice - Other - See Separate Menu for Ntc of Appeal Options Tue 10/22 3:56 PM
CLERK'S DISMISSAL re9 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Without Prejudice (djb)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 21, 2019
9 9 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Mon 10/21 11:17 AM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by SAMUEL HANSON (MARTINEZ, ROBERTO)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 17, 2019
8 8 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 05/17 4:08 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by FRANCISCO RAUL MADERAL on behalf of SAMUEL HANSON (MADERAL, FRANCISCO)
Related: [-]
7 7 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 05/17 4:01 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by ROBERTO MARTINEZ on behalf of SAMUEL HANSON (MARTINEZ, ROBERTO)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 14, 2019
6 6 transfer Case Transferred In - District Transfer (COURT USE ONLY) Tue 05/14 2:25 PM
Case transferred in from District of Minnesota; Case Number 0:19-cv-01161. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
Related: [-]
5 5 3 pgs order Order Tue 05/14 11:25 AM
CERTIFIED COPY OF CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-10) transferring case to the Northern District of Florida per the MDL Panel for coordinated or consolidated pretrial proceedings. Case assigned to Judge M. Casey Rodgers. (kt) [Transferred from Minnesota on 5/14/2019.]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 01, 2019
4 4 Summons Issued as to 3M Company. (KNK) [Transferred from Minnesota on 5/14/2019.]
Related: [-]
3 3 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: Notice re: Non-Admitted Attorney We have received documents listing Roberto Martinez and Francisco R. Maderal as counsel of record. If he or she wishes to be listed as an attorney of record in this case, he or she must be admitted to the bar of the U.S. District Court of Minnesota in accordance with [LINK:Local Rule 83.5 (a), (b) and (c)] or temporarily admitted pro hac vice in accordance with [LINK:Local Rule 83.5 (d) or (e)] . For more admissions information and forms, please see the Attorney Forms Section of the courts website at [LINK:href=http://www.mnd.uscourts.gov/FORMS/court_forms.shtml#attorneyforms] [LINK:. (KNK) [Transferred from Minnesota on 5/14/2019.]
Related: [-]
2 2 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Nancy E. Brasel per 3rd, 4th - Master list, referred to Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung. Please use case number 19-cv-1161 (NEB/TNL). (KNK) [Transferred from Minnesota on 5/14/2019.]
Related: [-]
1 1 COMPLAINT against 3M Company (filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMNDC-6844745) filed by Samuel Hanson. Filer requests summons issued. (Flaherty, Yvonne) [Transferred from Minnesota on 5/14/2019.]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet