Consolidated
Lead case: 3:19-md-02885

Florida Northern District Court
Judge:M Casey Rodgers
Referred: Gary R Jones
Case #: 3:19-cv-01470
Nature of Suit365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Case Filed:May 14, 2019
Case in other court:Minnesota, 0:19-cv-01190
Last checked: Sunday Nov 10, 2019 4:19 AM EST
Defendant
3M COMPANY
Defendant
AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC
Plaintiff
GARY SENIOR
Represented By
YVONNE FLAHERTY
Lockridge Grindal Nauen Pllp
contact info
ANGELA JOY MASON
The Cochran Firm - Dothan Al
contact info
Yvonne M Flaherty
Lockridge Grindal Nauen Pllp
contact info
JESSICA KRAMER GIVENS
The Cochran Firm - Dothan Al
contact info


Docket last updated: 3 hours ago
Wednesday, October 30, 2019
9 9 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Wed 10/30 4:20 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal Without Prejudice by GARY SENIOR. (GIVENS, JESSICA)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 20, 2019
8 8 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 05/20 3:30 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by ANGELA JOY MASON on behalf of GARY SENIOR (MASON, ANGELA)
Related: [-]
7 7 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 05/20 3:17 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by JESSICA KRAMER GIVENS on behalf of GARY SENIOR (GIVENS, JESSICA)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 14, 2019
6 6 transfer Case Transferred In - District Transfer (COURT USE ONLY) Tue 05/14 2:51 PM
Case transferred in from District of Minnesota; Case Number 0:19-cv-01190. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
Related: [-]
5 5 3 pgs order Order Tue 05/14 11:30 AM
CERTIFIED COPY OF CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-10) transferring case to the Northern District of Florida per the MDL Panel for coordinated or consolidated pretrial proceedings. Case assigned to Judge M. Casey Rodgers. (kt) [Transferred from Minnesota on 5/14/2019.]
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 02, 2019
4 4 Summons Issued as to 3M Company, Aearo Technologies LLC. (kt) [Transferred from Minnesota on 5/14/2019.]
Related: [-]
3 3 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: Notice re: Non-Admitted Attorney We have received documents listing Angela J. Mason, Jessica K. Givens as counsel of record. If he or she wishes to be listed as an attorney of record in this case, he or she must be admitted to the bar of the U.S. District Court of Minnesota in accordance with [LINK:Local Rule 83.5 (a), (b) and (c)] or temporarily admitted pro hac vice in accordance with [LINK:Local Rule 83.5 (d) or (e)] . For more admissions information and forms, please see the Attorney Forms Section of the courts website at [LINK:href=http://www.mnd.uscourts.gov/FORMS/court_forms.shtml#attorneyforms] [LINK:. (kt) Modified text on 5/3/2019 (MMP). [Transferred from Minnesota on 5/14/2019.]
Related: [-]
2 2 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Nancy E. Brasel per 3rd/4th Master list, referred to Magistrate Judge David T. Schultz. Please use case number 19-cv-1190 NEB/DTS. (kt) [Transferred from Minnesota on 5/14/2019.]
Related: [-]
1 1 COMPLAINT against 3M Company, Aearo Technologies LLC (filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMNDC-6849192) filed by Gary Senior. Filer requests summons issued. (Flaherty, Yvonne) [Transferred from Minnesota on 5/14/2019.]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet