Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 4:18-bk-42856

Missouri Eastern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 13
Judge:Kathy A Surratt-States
Case #: 4:19-ap-04122
Case Filed:May 16, 2019
Terminated:Jul 25, 2019
Last checked: never
Defendant
Mark R. Polka
6159 Erb Road
St. Louis, MO 63129
Represented By
Mark R. Polka
contact info
Defendant
Stacy L. Polka
6159 Erb Road
St. Louis, MO 63129
Represented By
Stacy L. Polka
contact info
Plaintiff
Lake Sherwood Estates Association
Represented By
Nicholas G. Klumb
Sandberg Phoenix & Von Gontard P.C.
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 1:08 PM CDT
Saturday, July 27, 2019
8 8 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Sat 07/27 11:41 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Notice Date 07/27/2019. Related [+] (Admin.)
Related: [-] 7
Thursday, July 25, 2019
7 7 1 pgs order Order Dismissing Case - AP Thu 07/25 3:57 PM
Order Dismissing Case . (pas, s)
Related: [-]
utility Disposition of Adversary Thu 07/25 3:58 PM
Disposition of Adversary 4:19-ap-4122 dismissed (pas, s)
Related: [-]
court Close Adversary Case Thu 07/25 3:59 PM
Adversary Case 4:19-ap-4122 Closed (pas, s)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 22, 2019
6 6 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Wed 05/22 11:44 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing Notice Date 05/22/2019. Related [+] (Admin.)
Related: [-] 4
Tuesday, May 21, 2019
5 5 cmp Summons Service Executed Tue 05/21 1:48 PM
Summons Service Executed on Mark R. Polka 5/21/2019; Stacy L. Polka 5/21/2019 (Klumb, Nicholas)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 20, 2019
4 4 court Summons and Consent to Entry of Judgment and Orders Issued Mon 05/20 3:17 PM
Summons and Consent to Entry of Judgment and Orders Issued on Mark R. Polka Date Issued 5/20/2019, Answer Due 6/19/2019; Stacy L. Polka Date Issued 5/20/2019, Answer Due 6/19/2019 Trial date set for 7/23/2019 at 10:00 AM at Bankruptcy Courtroom 7 North. (how, j)
Related: [-]
3 3 order Scheduling Order Mon 05/20 3:15 PM
Scheduling Order Related [+]. Discovery due by 7/9/2019. Trial date set for 7/23/2019 at 10:00 AM at Bankruptcy Courtroom 7 North. (how, j)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Lake Sherwood Estates Association
Thursday, May 16, 2019
2 2 crditcrd none Thu 05/16 12:02 PM
Receipt of filing fee for Complaint 19-04122 [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00). Receipt number 16085917, amount $ 350.00. Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#1
1 1 cmp Complaint Thu 05/16 12:00 PM
Adversary case 19-04122 Complaint by Lake Sherwood Estates Association (attorney Nicholas G. Klumb ) against Mark R. Polka, Stacy L. Polka Fee Amount $350.(91 (Declaratory judgment))(Klumb, Nicholas)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Adversary Proceeding Cover Sheet