Consolidated
Lead case: 3:19-md-02885

Florida Northern District Court
Judge:M Casey Rodgers
Referred: Gary R Jones
Case #: 3:19-cv-01502
Nature of Suit365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Case Filed:May 17, 2019
Terminated:Oct 31, 2019
Case in other court:Louisiana Eastern, 2:19-cv-10066
Last checked: Wednesday Nov 13, 2019 3:29 AM EST
Defendant
3M COMPANY
Defendant
AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC
Plaintiff
BRANDON BLACKMORE
Represented By
JOHN CHRISTIAN ENOCHS
Morris Bart Llc - New Orleans La
contact info
RICHARD L ROOT
Morris Bart Llc - New Orleans La
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/02/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Thursday, October 31, 2019
7 7 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Thu 10/31 12:52 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by BRANDON BLACKMORE (ENOCHS, JOHN)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 17, 2019
6 6 transfer Case Transferred In - District Transfer (COURT USE ONLY) Fri 05/17 7:55 AM
Case transferred in from District of Louisiana Eastern; Case Number 2:19-cv-10066. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 16, 2019
5 5 Order of MDL Transfer to District of Northern District of Florida. MDL case number is 2885. Electronic file, certified copy of transfer order, and docket sheet sent.(am) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 5/17/2019.]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Transmittal Letter
4 4 Notice of Conditional Transfer Order from MDL Panel regarding MDL 2885. (am) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 5/17/2019.]
Related: [-]
Friday, May 03, 2019
3 3 Summons Issued as to 3M Company, Aearo Technologies, LLC.(am) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 5/17/2019.]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Summons
2 2 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Ivan L.R. Lemelle and Magistrate Judge Dana Douglas. (cc) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 5/17/2019.]
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 02, 2019
1 1 COMPLAINT with jury demand against 3M Company, Aearo Technologies, LLC (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 053L-7618488) filed by Brandon Blackmore.Attorney Richard Lee Root added to party Brandon Blackmore(pty:pla).(Root, Richard) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 5/17/2019.]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Summons 3m,
Att: 3 Summons aearo