New Jersey District Court
Judge:Edward S Kiel
Referred: Edward S Kiel
Case #: 2:19-cv-12680
Nature of Suit890 Other Statutes - Other Statutory Actions
Cause15:2301 Magnuson-Moss Warranty Act
Case Filed:May 17, 2019
Terminated:Jan 10, 2022
Last checked: Wednesday Nov 13, 2019 3:55 AM EST
Defendant
BAVARIAN MOTOR WORKS AG
Defendant
BMW OF NORTH AMERICA, LLC
Represented By
CHRISTOPHER J. DALTON
Buchanan, Ingersoll & Rooney, PC
contact info
DANIEL ZEV RIVLIN
Buchanan Ingersoll & Rooney PC
contact info
MELISSA JEAN BAYLY
Buchanan Ingersoll & Rooney
contact info
ROSEMARY JOAN BRUNO
Buchanan, Ingersoll & Rooney, PC
contact info
Plaintiff
THOMAS ISLEY
Represented By
FREDERICK JOHN KLORCZYK, III
Bursor & Fisher PA
contact info
Plaintiff
DANIEL GULICK
Represented By
FREDERICK JOHN KLORCZYK, III
Bursor & Fisher PA
contact info
Plaintiff
MICHAEL HENCHY, JR.
Represented By
FREDERICK JOHN KLORCZYK, III
Bursor & Fisher PA
contact info
Plaintiff
VIPUL KHANNA
Represented By
FREDERICK JOHN KLORCZYK, III
Bursor & Fisher PA
contact info
Plaintiff
JEFFERY QUINN
Represented By
FREDERICK JOHN KLORCZYK, III
Bursor & Fisher PA
contact info
Plaintiff
WALINGTON URENA
Represented By
FREDERICK JOHN KLORCZYK, III
Bursor & Fisher PA
contact info


Docket last updated: 9 hours ago
Sunday, February 11, 2024
75 75 order Order Sun 02/11 11:47 AM
TEXT ORDER: The Court has reviewed Jeff Fandl's email dated February 5, 2024 (ECF No.74 ). The Court directs Mr. Fandl to the Settlement Claims Administrator for the processing of his potential claim. Counsel for the parties are directed to respond directly to Mr. Fandl concerning the issue raised in his letter or to file a letter on the docket setting forth their respective positions. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Edward S. Kiel on 2/11/2024. (nic, )
Related: [-]
Monday, February 05, 2024
74 74 misc Letter Sun 02/11 11:45 AM
Letter by email from Jeff Fandl, Class Member. (nic, )
Related: [-]