Dream II Holdings, LLC
Member Case
Lead case is: 1:19-bk-11608
Lead case is: 1:19-bk-11608
New York Southern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Michael E Wiles |
Case #: | 1:19-bk-11607 |
Case Filed: | May 19, 2019 |
Type | Corporation |
Tax ID | subscribers only |
# of Creditors | 10,001-25,000 |
Est. Assets | $100,000,001 to $500 million |
Est. Liabilities | $100,000,001 to $500 million |
Nature of Business | Other |
Nature of Debts | Primarily Business |
Debtor
Dream II Holdings, LLC
330 Madison Ave Fl 27
New York, NY 10017-5019 |
Represented By
|
Last checked: never |
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee
Office of the United States Trustee U.S. Federal Office Building 201 Varick Street, Room 1006
New York, NY 10014 |
Docket last updated: 23 minutes ago |
Friday, June 21, 2019 | ||
5 | 5
misc
Statement of Financial Affairs
Fri 06/21 11:23 PM
Statement of Financial Affairs - Non-Individual Filed by Joshua Sussberg on behalf of Dream II Holdings, LLC. (Sussberg, Joshua) |
|
4 | 4
misc
Schedules
Fri 06/21 11:07 PM
Schedules filed: Schedule A/B - Non-Individual, Schedule D - Non-Individual, Schedule E/F - Non-Individual, Schedule G - Non-Individual, Schedule H - Non-Individual Filed by Joshua Sussberg on behalf of Dream II Holdings, LLC. (Sussberg, Joshua) |
|
Thursday, May 23, 2019 | ||
misc
Case Association - Joint Administration
Thu 05/23 8:45 AM
Case Joint Administration. (Cantrell, Deirdra) |
||
misc
Add Claims and Noticing Agent
Thu 05/23 2:50 PM
Claims and Noticing Agent, Omni Management Group, Inc., added to the case. (Richards, Beverly) |
||
Wednesday, May 22, 2019 | ||
3 | 3
order
Motion, Joint Administration
Wed 05/22 2:21 PM
Order signed on 5/22/2019 directing joint administration of 19-11608 19-11607 19-11609 19-11610 19-11611 19-11612 and 19-11613 under 19-11608 (Hollander Sleep Products, LLC, et al) as the lead case and granting related relief . (DePierola, Jacqueline) |
|
Monday, May 20, 2019 | ||
misc
Add Judge
Mon 05/20 8:04 AM
Judge Michael E. Wiles added to the case. (Porter, Minnie) |
||
Sunday, May 19, 2019 | ||
2 | 2
15
pgs
motion
Motion, Joint Administration
Sun 05/19 2:57 PM
Motion for Joint Administration filed by Joshua Sussberg on behalf of Dream II Holdings, LLC. (Sussberg, Joshua) |
|
1 | 1
29
pgs
misc
Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)
Sun 05/19 1:18 PM
Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition for Non-Individual. Order for Relief Entered. Filed by Joshua Sussberg of Kirkland & Ellis LLP on behalf of Dream II Holdings, LLC. (Sussberg, Joshua) |
|
crditcrd
Auto - docket of credit card
Sun 05/19 2:04 PM
Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)([LINK 19-11607 ) [misc,824] (1717.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A13215443. Fee amount 1717.00. (U.S. Treasury) |