Delaware District Court
Judge:Colm F Connolly
Case #: 1:19-cv-00948
Nature of Suit445 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities-Employment
Cause42:1983 Civil Rights (Employment Discrimination)
Case Filed:May 22, 2019
Terminated:Sep 29, 2020
Last checked: Monday Nov 18, 2019 3:47 AM EST
Defendant
Fairville Management Company, LLC
Represented By
Barry M. Willoughby
Young, Conaway, Stargatt & Taylor LLP
contact info
Lauren Elizabeth Moak Russell
Young, Conaway, Stargatt & Taylor LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Irenee White
411 N. Jefferson Street
Wilmington, DE 19801
Represented By
Katherine Butler
Law Offices Of Kate Butler, Esq.
contact info


Docket last updated: 4 hours ago
Tuesday, September 29, 2020
order SO ORDERED ~Util - Terminate Civil Case Tue 09/29 9:27 AM
SO ORDERED, re69 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Irenee White, ***Civil Case Terminated. Ordered by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 9/29/2020. (fms)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 28, 2020
69 69 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Mon 09/28 10:25 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal by Irenee White. (Butler, Katherine)
Related: [-]