Consolidated
Lead case: 3:19-md-02885

Florida Northern District Court
Judge:M Casey Rodgers
Referred: Gary R Jones
Case #: 3:19-cv-01524
Nature of Suit367 Torts - Personal Injury - Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury/Product Liability
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Case Filed:May 22, 2019
Case in other court:Florida Southern, 0:19-cv-61124
Last checked: Monday Nov 18, 2019 4:40 AM EST
Petitioner
BRYANT D. GERMAIN
Represented By
Sharon Jessica Zinns
Beasley Allen
contact info
WILLIAM ROBERT SUTTON
Beasley Allen Crow Etc Pc - Montgomery Al
contact info
Respondent
3M COMPANY


Docket last updated: 05/02/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Monday, June 13, 2022
8 8 notice Notice - Other - See Separate Menu for Ntc of Appeal Options Mon 06/13 1:40 PM
NOTICE of Designated Forum Southern District of Florida, Fort Lauderdale Division by BRYANT D. GERMAIN (SUTTON, WILLIAM)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 04, 2019
7 7 cmp Amended Complaint Mon 11/04 8:18 AM
Amended Short Form Complaint AMENDED COMPLAINT against 3M COMPANY, filed by BRYANT D. GERMAIN. (SUTTON, WILLIAM)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 22, 2019
6 6 notice Notice - Other - See Separate Menu for Ntc of Appeal Options Wed 05/22 9:08 AM
NOTICE Regarding Attorney Admission and #1 Notice Regarding Electronic Filing Requirement. (djb)
Related: [-]
5 5 transfer Case Transferred In - District Transfer (COURT USE ONLY) Wed 05/22 9:04 AM
Case transferred in from District of Florida Southern; Case Number 0:19-cv-61124. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 21, 2019
4 4 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-12) transferring case to the Northern District of Florida re: MDL 2885 for consolidated pretrial proceedings pursuant to 28 USC 1407 and assigned to the Honorable M. Casey Rodgers. (Signed by John W. Nichols, Clerk of the Panel). (mc) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 5/22/2019.]
Related: [-]
Civil Case Terminated per DE4 Conditional Transfer Order. Closing Case. (mc) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 5/22/2019.]
Related: [-]
Friday, May 03, 2019
3 3 Summons Issued as to 3M Company. (drz) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 5/22/2019.]
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 02, 2019
2 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Roy K. Altman and Magistrate Judge Patrick M. Hunt. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Patrick M. Hunt is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (drz) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 5/22/2019.]
Related: [-]
1 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-11610963, filed by Bryant D. Germain.(Zinns, Sharon) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 5/22/2019.]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Summon(s)