California Central District Court
Judge:Stephen V Wilson
Referred: John E Mcdermott
Case #: 2:19-cv-04389
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Other Contract
Case Filed:May 21, 2019
Re-opened:Apr 25, 2019
Terminated:Sep 04, 2019
Last checked: Sunday Nov 17, 2019 12:59 AM PST
Defendant
Ronald Kasparian
Defendant
Y.N.G LLC
Plaintiff
Bryan Vega
(Commerce Diesel Co.) 10906 Atlantic Ave
Lynwood, CA 90262


Docket last updated: 05/05/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Thursday, September 05, 2019
22 22 textonly Text Only Scheduling Notice Thu 09/05 10:20 AM
IN CHAMBERS ORDER-TEXT ONLY ENTRY by Judge Stephen V. Wilson re:19 MOTION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY COURT against defendants Ronald Kasparian and Y.N.G. LLC filed by plaintiff; and20 MOTION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT ON SUM CERTAIN against defendants Ronald Kasparian and Y.N.G. LLC filed by plaintiff - The motions are submitted. Order to issue. The hearing previously scheduled for 09/16/2019 at 1:30 p.m. is vacated and off-calendar. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (pc)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 04, 2019
25 25 judgmentCV Judgment Fri 09/06 4:40 PM
MOTION FOR DEFAULT NDGMENT BY COURT AND ORDER by Judge Stephen V. Wilson. It is hereby ORDERED, ADJUllGED AND DECREED, that Plainrif~ recover from, Defendant the sum of $135,200 plus costs of this action. in favor of Bryan Vega against Y.N.G LLC, Ronald Kasparian (MD JS-6, Case Terminated). (See document for further details) (yl)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 03, 2019
24 24 service Proof of Service (subsequent documents) Thu 09/05 3:24 PM
PROOF OF SERVICE filed by plaintiff Bryan Vega, re Default that was entered and the proposed default judgment against defendants Ronald Kasparian and Y.N.G. LLC19 . Served by CCP Served on behalf of Bryan Vega ( Commerce Diesel Co.), by mail and acknowledgment of receipt of service. Mailed on 8/15/19. (twdb)
Related: [-]
23 23 service Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days) Thu 09/05 3:14 PM
PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Bryan Vega, upon Defendant Ronald Kasparian served on 8/19/2019, answer due 9/9/2019; Y.N.G LLC served on 8/19/2019, answer due 9/9/2019. Actual Service date not indicted. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed by certified mail sent to Ronald Kasparian and Y.N.G, LLC., Received by (see receipts), cert mail receipts attached, with statute not specified. Original Summons returned. (twdb)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 06, 2019
21 21 textonly Text Only Scheduling Notice Tue 08/06 11:37 AM
SCHEDULING NOTICE re: MOTION for Default Judgment against defendants Ronald Kasparian and Y.N.G. LLC20 , and MOTION for Default Judgment against defendants Ronald Kasparian and Y.N.G. LLC19 - The Motions are set for hearing on 9/16/2019 at 01:30 PM before Judge Stephen V. Wilson. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (pc)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 02, 2019
20 20 motion Default Judgment Mon 08/05 10:27 AM
MOTION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT ON SUM CERTAIN against defendants Ronald Kasparian and Y.N.G. LLC filed by plaintiff Bryan Vega. (mrgo)
Related: [-]
19 19 motion Default Judgment Mon 08/05 10:25 AM
MOTION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY COURT against defendants Ronald Kasparian and Y.N.G. LLC filed by plaintiff Bryan Vega. (mrgo)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Tuesday, July 30, 2019
18 18 notice Deficiency - Default /Default Judgment (CV-52b) - optional html form Tue 07/30 9:12 AM
NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY Re: REQUEST for Default Judgment against defendants Ronald Kasparian and Y.N.G. LLC17 . The Clerk cannot enter the requested relief as: Requesting party shall file a new Request/Application with noted deficiencies corrected in order to have default judgment reconsidered. The Clerk cannot enter a default judgment that includes punitive damages. Application or Motion for Default Judgment must be by Court. (mrgo)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 29, 2019
17 17 motion Default Judgment Tue 07/30 9:07 AM
REQUEST FOR JUDGMENT BY DEFAULT against defendants Ronald Kasparian and Y.N.G. LLC filed by plaintiff Bryan Vega. (mrgo)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 26, 2019
16 16 textonly Text Only Scheduling Notice Fri 07/26 10:55 AM
SCHEDULING NOTICE by Judge Stephen V. Wilson: Plaintiff is granted up to and including 08/26/2019 to file his motion for default judgment as to defendants Ronald Kasparian, and Y.N.G LLC. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (pc)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 25, 2019
15 15 order Clerks Entry of Default (CV-37) - optional html form Thu 07/25 3:45 PM
DEFAULT BY CLERK F.R.Civ.P.55(a) as to Ronald Kasparian, Y.N.G LLC. (mrgo)
Related: [-]
14 14 order Reconsideration Thu 07/25 3:36 PM
MINUTE ORDER (IN CHAMBERS) REOPENING CASE12 by Judge Stephen V. Wilson. After reviewing Plaintiff's petition for reconsideration, Dkt. 12, the Court REOPENS the case and SETS ASIDE the dismissal due to Plaintiff's mistake, inadvertence, and/or excusable neglect. The Clerk of Court is instructed to review Plaintiffs request for default11 and grant the request if appropriate. (mrgo)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 23, 2019
13 13 notice Notice (Other) Wed 07/24 3:50 PM
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE filed by plaintiff Bryan Vega. (mrgo)
Related: [-]
12 12 motion Reconsideration Wed 07/24 3:48 PM
PETITION TO RECONSIDERATION RULE 60B re Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held, Terminated Case,10 filed by plaintiff Bryan Vega. (mrgo)
Related: [-]
11 11 motion Default Wed 07/24 3:44 PM
REQUEST TO ENTER COURT DEFAULT against defendants Ronald Kasparian, Y.N.G LLC filed by plaintiff Bryan Vega. (mrgo)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 09, 2019
10 10 order Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held ~Util - Terminate Civil Case Tue 07/09 4:48 PM
MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS DISMISSING ACTION by Judge Stephen V. Wilson. The Court, on June 18, 2019, issued an order to show cause why this action should not be dismissed for lack of prosecution. To date, plaintiff has failed to respond to the Court's order. Therefore, the matter is dismissed. (Made JS-6. Case Terminated.) (mrgo)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 18, 2019
9 9 order Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines Wed 06/19 11:57 AM
MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS - ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WHY THIS CASE SHOULD NOT BE DISMISSED FOR LACK OF PROSECUTION by Judge Stephen V. Wilson. (Show Cause Response due by 7/2/2019.) (mrgo)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 10, 2019
8 8 service Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days) Fri 06/14 1:06 PM
PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Bryan Vega, upon Defendant Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Jennifer (last name illegible), authorized to sign for Ronald Kasparian and Y.N.G. LLC in compliance with statute not specified by certified mail on 5/30/2019. (mrgo)
Related: [-]
7 7 service Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days) Fri 06/14 12:59 PM
PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Bryan Vega, upon Defendant Ronald Kasparian served on 5/24/2019, answer due 6/14/2019; Y.N.G LLC served on 5/24/2019, answer due 6/14/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon no name or title in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by mail and acknowledgement of receipt service and by also mailing a copy. Original Summons NOT returned. (mrgo)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 23, 2019
6 6 order Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only Thu 05/23 10:49 AM
NEW CASE ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Stephen V. Wilson. (pc)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 21, 2019
5 5 adr Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form Wed 05/22 4:58 PM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (lh)
Related: [-]
4 4 notice Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form Wed 05/22 4:57 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Stephen V. Wilson and Magistrate Judge John E. McDermott. (lh)
Related: [-]
3 3 service Summons Issued Wed 05/22 4:56 PM
21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint - (Discovery),1 as to Defendants Ronald Kasparian, Y.N.G LLC. (lh)
Related: [-]
2 2 notice Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties Wed 05/22 4:55 PM
CERTIFICATION AND NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Bryan Vega, identifying Other Affiliate Nick Vega for Bryan Vega. (lh)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint - (Discovery) Wed 05/22 4:51 PM
COMPLAINT against Defendants Ronald Kasparian and Y.N.G LLC. Case assigned to Judge Stephen V. Wilson for all further proceedings. Discovery referred to Magistrate Judge John E. McDermott.(Filing Fee $ 400 Paid) Jury Demanded, filed by Plaintiff Bryan Vega. (lh)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet