Drivetrain, LLC, as Trustee of Ignite Restaurant G v. 1ST FM LLC
Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 4:17-bk-33550
Lead BK case is: 4:17-bk-33550
Texas Southern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | David R Jones |
Case #: | 4:19-ap-03467 |
Nature of Suit | 12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference |
Case Filed: | May 22, 2019 |
Terminated: | Mar 27, 2024 |
Last checked: never |
Defendant
1ST FM LLC
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Drivetrain, LLC, as Trustee of Ignite Restaurant Group GUC Trust
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 2 hours ago |
Wednesday, March 27, 2024 | ||
court
Close Adversary Case
Wed 03/27 5:31 PM
Adversary Case 4:19-ap-3467 Closed. (rgs4) |
||
Tuesday, October 17, 2023 | ||
court
Case Reassigned-Adversary
Tue 10/17 9:54 AM
Judge Christopher M. Lopez added to case. Involvement of Judge David R Jones Terminated. (DawnaKelly) |
||
Sunday, November 01, 2020 | ||
10 | 10
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing
Sun 11/01 10:47 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. No. of Notices: 0. Notice Date 11/01/2020. (Admin.) |
|
Thursday, October 29, 2020 | ||
9 | 9
order
Default Judgment
Thu 10/29 8:28 PM
Default Judgment Against Defendant 1st FM LLC Signed on 10/29/2020 (emiller) |
|
Wednesday, December 04, 2019 | ||
8 | 8
motion
Default Judgment
Wed 12/04 2:34 PM
Motion for Default Judgment. Filed by Drivetrain, LLC (Warner, Michael) |
|
Wednesday, June 05, 2019 | ||
7 | 7
cmp
Summons Service Executed
Wed 06/05 1:35 PM
Summons Service Executed on 1ST FM LLC 5/29/2019. (Warner, Michael) |
|
Saturday, May 25, 2019 | ||
6 | 6
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing
Sat 05/25 11:56 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. No. of Notices: 0. Notice Date 05/25/2019. (Admin.) |
|
Friday, May 24, 2019 | ||
5 | 5
court
Summons Issued
Fri 05/24 2:56 PM
Summons Issued on 1ST FM LLC Date Issued 5/24/2019. (SarahShelby) |
|
Thursday, May 23, 2019 | ||
4 | 4
order
Judge Jones Order Regarding Exhibit and Witness Lists (Adversary)
Thu 05/23 6:00 AM
|
|
Wednesday, May 22, 2019 | ||
3 | 3
misc
Summons - Request for Issuance
Wed 05/22 3:22 PM
Request for Issuance of Summons on 1ST FM LLC. (Warner, Michael) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Additional Attachments
Wed 05/22 3:18 PM
Additional Attachments Re: Adversary Proceeding Cover Sheet (Filed By Drivetrain, LLC, as Trustee of Ignite Restaurant Group GUC Trust ) (Warner, Michael) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint [system event]
Wed 05/22 3:17 PM
Adversary case 19-03467 Nature of Suit: (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)) Complaint by Drivetrain, LLC, as Trustee of Ignite Restaurant Group GUC Trust against 1ST FM LLC. Fee Amount $350 (Warner, Michael) |