Drivetrain, LLC, as Trustee of Ignite Restaurant G v. Crunchtime Information Systems, Inc.
Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 4:17-bk-33550
Lead BK case is: 4:17-bk-33550
Texas Southern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | David R Jones |
Case #: | 4:19-ap-03468 |
Nature of Suit | 12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference |
Case Filed: | May 22, 2019 |
Terminated: | Jan 12, 2021 |
Last checked: never |
Defendant
Crunchtime Information Systems, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Drivetrain, LLC, as Trustee of Ignite Restaurant Group GUC Trust
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 2 hours ago |
Tuesday, October 17, 2023 | ||
court
Case Reassigned-Adversary
Tue 10/17 9:55 AM
Judge Christopher M. Lopez added to case. Involvement of Judge David R Jones Terminated. (DawnaKelly) |
||
Sunday, January 17, 2021 | ||
15 | 15
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing
Sun 01/17 11:49 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. No. of Notices: 0. Notice Date 01/17/2021. (Admin.) |
|
Tuesday, January 12, 2021 | ||
14 | 14
order
Dismissing Adversary Case
Fri 01/15 10:29 AM
Stipulation and Agreed Order Dismissing Adversary Proceeding with Prejudice Signed on 1/12/2021 (emiller) |
|
Friday, January 08, 2021 | ||
13 | 13
misc
Stipulation
Fri 01/08 10:13 AM
Stipulation By Drivetrain, LLC and /Stipulation And Agreed Order Dismissing Adversary Proceeding With Prejudice. Does this document include an agreed order or otherwise request that the judge sign a document? Yes. (Filed By Drivetrain, LLC ) (Warner, Michael) |
|
Tuesday, July 02, 2019 | ||
12 | 12
notice
Notice
Tue 07/02 12:11 PM
Notice of Appearance . Filed by Crunchtime Information Systems, Inc. (Gilligan, Sean) |
|
11 | 11
answer
Answer to Complaint
Tue 07/02 12:03 PM
Answer to Complaint Filed by Crunchtime Information Systems, Inc. (Gilligan, Sean) |
|
Friday, June 28, 2019 | ||
10 | 10
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing
Fri 06/28 11:55 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 06/28/2019. (Admin.) |
|
Wednesday, June 26, 2019 | ||
9 | 9
1
pgs
order
Order to Appear pro hac vice
Wed 06/26 2:54 PM
Order Granting Motion To Appear pro hac vice - Sean W. Gilligan Signed on 6/26/2019. (emiller) |
|
Thursday, June 20, 2019 | ||
8 | 8
motion
Appear pro hac vice
Thu 06/20 4:03 PM
Motion to Appear pro hac vice by Sean W. Gilligan . Filed by Defendant Crunchtime Information Systems, Inc. (dwil) |
|
Wednesday, June 05, 2019 | ||
7 | 7
cmp
Summons Service Executed
Wed 06/05 1:38 PM
Summons Service Executed on Crunchtime Information Systems, Inc. 5/29/2019. (Warner, Michael) |
|
Saturday, May 25, 2019 | ||
6 | 6
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing
Sat 05/25 11:56 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. No. of Notices: 0. Notice Date 05/25/2019. (Admin.) |
|
Friday, May 24, 2019 | ||
5 | 5
court
Summons Issued
Fri 05/24 2:57 PM
Summons Issued on Crunchtime Information Systems, Inc. Date Issued 5/24/2019. (SarahShelby) |
|
Thursday, May 23, 2019 | ||
4 | 4
order
Judge Jones Order Regarding Exhibit and Witness Lists (Adversary)
Thu 05/23 6:00 AM
|
|
Wednesday, May 22, 2019 | ||
3 | 3
misc
Summons - Request for Issuance
Wed 05/22 3:29 PM
Request for Issuance of Summons on Crunchtime Information Systems, Inc.. (Warner, Michael) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Additional Attachments
Wed 05/22 3:28 PM
Additional Attachments Re: Adversary Proceeding Cover Sheet (Filed By Drivetrain, LLC, as Trustee of Ignite Restaurant Group GUC Trust ) (Warner, Michael) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint [system event]
Wed 05/22 3:27 PM
Adversary case 19-03468 Nature of Suit: (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)) Complaint by Drivetrain, LLC, as Trustee of Ignite Restaurant Group GUC Trust against Crunchtime Information Systems, Inc.. Fee Amount $350 (Warner, Michael) |