Drivetrain, LLC, as Trustee of Ignite Restaurant G v. Averus, Inc.
Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 4:17-bk-33550
Lead BK case is: 4:17-bk-33550
Texas Southern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | David R Jones |
Case #: | 4:19-ap-03469 |
Nature of Suit | 12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference |
Case Filed: | May 22, 2019 |
Terminated: | Jan 26, 2024 |
Last checked: never |
Defendant
Averus, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Drivetrain, LLC, as Trustee of Ignite Restaurant Group GUC Trust
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 84 minutes ago |
Friday, January 26, 2024 | ||
court
Close Adversary Case
Fri 01/26 2:02 PM
Adversary Case 4:19-ap-3469 Closed. (RosarioSaldana) |
||
Tuesday, October 17, 2023 | ||
court
Case Reassigned-Adversary
Tue 10/17 9:55 AM
Judge Christopher M. Lopez added to case. Involvement of Judge David R Jones Terminated. (DawnaKelly) |
||
Thursday, January 30, 2020 | ||
8 | 8
notice
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
Thu 01/30 12:29 PM
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal With Prejudice of Adversary Proceeding Filed by Drivetrain, LLC (Warner, Michael) |
|
Wednesday, June 05, 2019 | ||
7 | 7
cmp
Summons Service Executed
Wed 06/05 1:37 PM
Summons Service Executed on Averus, Inc. 5/29/2019. (Warner, Michael) |
|
Saturday, May 25, 2019 | ||
6 | 6
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing
Sat 05/25 11:56 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. No. of Notices: 0. Notice Date 05/25/2019. (Admin.) |
|
Friday, May 24, 2019 | ||
5 | 5
court
Summons Issued
Fri 05/24 3:09 PM
Summons Issued on Averus, Inc. Date Issued 5/24/2019. (SarahShelby) |
|
Thursday, May 23, 2019 | ||
4 | 4
order
Judge Jones Order Regarding Exhibit and Witness Lists (Adversary)
Thu 05/23 6:00 AM
|
|
Wednesday, May 22, 2019 | ||
3 | 3
misc
Summons - Request for Issuance
Wed 05/22 4:21 PM
Request for Issuance of Summons on Averus, Inc.. (Warner, Michael) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Additional Attachments
Wed 05/22 4:20 PM
Additional Attachments Re: Adversary Proceeding Cover Sheet (Filed By Drivetrain, LLC, as Trustee of Ignite Restaurant Group GUC Trust ) (Warner, Michael) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint [system event]
Wed 05/22 4:19 PM
Adversary case 19-03469 Nature of Suit: (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)) Complaint by Drivetrain, LLC, as Trustee of Ignite Restaurant Group GUC Trust against Averus, Inc.. Fee Amount $350 (Warner, Michael) |