Drivetrain, LLC, as Trustee of Ignite Restaurant G v. Ecolab, Inc.
Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 4:17-bk-33550
Lead BK case is: 4:17-bk-33550
Texas Southern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | David R Jones |
Case #: | 4:19-ap-03472 |
Nature of Suit | 12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference |
Case Filed: | May 23, 2019 |
Terminated: | Jan 26, 2024 |
Last checked: never |
Defendant
Ecolab, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Drivetrain, LLC, as Trustee of Ignite Restaurant Group GUC Trust
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 2 hours ago |
Friday, January 26, 2024 | ||
court
Close Adversary Case
Fri 01/26 2:40 PM
Adversary Case 4:19-ap-3472 Closed. (RosarioSaldana) |
||
Tuesday, October 17, 2023 | ||
court
Case Reassigned-Adversary
Tue 10/17 9:56 AM
Judge Christopher M. Lopez added to case. Involvement of Judge David R Jones Terminated. (DawnaKelly) |
||
Wednesday, May 04, 2022 | ||
17 | 17
misc
Proposed Order
Wed 05/04 2:56 PM
Proposed Order RE: Order of Dismissal (Filed By Ecolab, Inc. ) (Johnson, John) |
|
Wednesday, May 05, 2021 | ||
16 | 16
notice
Notice of Stipulated Dismissal in an Adversary Proceeding
Wed 05/05 11:24 AM
Notice of Stipulated Dismissal in an Adversary Proceeding /Notice of Voluntary Dismissal with Prejudice of Adversary Proceeding By and Between Plaintiff and Defendant Filed by Drivetrain, LLC (Warner, Michael) |
|
Friday, August 23, 2019 | ||
15 | 15
notice
Notice
Fri 08/23 3:25 PM
Notice of Disclosure of Corporate Ownership, with Cert. of Svs., . Filed by Ecolab, Inc. (Johnson, John) |
|
14 | 14
answer
Answer to Complaint
Fri 08/23 3:22 PM
Answer to Complaint Filed by Ecolab, Inc. (Johnson, John) |
|
Thursday, August 15, 2019 | ||
13 | 13
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing
Fri 08/16 12:03 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. No. of Notices: 0. Notice Date 08/15/2019. (Admin.) |
|
Tuesday, August 13, 2019 | ||
12 | 12
order
Appear pro hac vice
Tue 08/13 1:49 PM
Order Granting Motion To Appear pro hac vice - Devon E. Daughety Signed on 8/13/2019. (emiller) |
|
Thursday, August 01, 2019 | ||
11 | 11
notice
Notice
Thu 08/01 12:31 PM
Notice of Second Stipulation by and Between the Trustee and Defendant . Filed by Drivetrain, LLC (Warner, Michael) |
|
Thursday, June 27, 2019 | ||
10 | 10
notice
Notice
Thu 06/27 2:12 PM
Notice of Stipulation by and between the Trustee and Defendant . Filed by Drivetrain, LLC (Warner, Michael) |
|
Wednesday, June 26, 2019 | ||
9 | 9
motion
Appear pro hac vice
Wed 06/26 1:08 PM
Motion to Appear pro hac vice , filed for Devon E. Daughety, Kohner, Mann & Kailas, S.C., Milwaukee WI, for admission . Filed by Ecolab, Inc. (Johnson, John) |
|
Friday, June 07, 2019 | ||
8 | 8
cmp
Summons Service Executed
Fri 06/07 1:38 PM
Summons Service Executed on Ecolab, Inc. 6/3/2019. (Warner, Michael) |
|
Wednesday, May 29, 2019 | ||
7 | 7
court
Summons Issued
Wed 05/29 10:46 AM
Summons Issued on Ecolab, Inc. Date Issued 5/29/2019. (MelissaMorgan) |
|
6 | 6
court
Summons Issued
Wed 05/29 9:47 AM
*Official Court Seal not on image Summons Issued on Ecolab, Inc. Date Issued 5/29/2019. (MelissaMorgan) Modified on 5/29/2019 (MelissaMorgan). Related document(s)7 Summons Issued. Modified on 5/29/2019 (MelissaMorgan) |
|
Sunday, May 26, 2019 | ||
5 | 5
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing
Sun 05/26 11:45 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. No. of Notices: 0. Notice Date 05/26/2019. (Admin.) |
|
Friday, May 24, 2019 | ||
4 | 4
order
Judge Jones Order Regarding Exhibit and Witness Lists (Adversary)
Fri 05/24 6:00 AM
|
|
Thursday, May 23, 2019 | ||
3 | 3
misc
Summons - Request for Issuance
Thu 05/23 8:54 AM
Request for Issuance of Summons on Ecolab, Inc.. (Warner, Michael) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Additional Attachments
Thu 05/23 8:54 AM
Additional Attachments Re: Adversary Proceeding Cover Sheet (Filed By Drivetrain, LLC, as Trustee of Ignite Restaurant Group GUC Trust ) (Warner, Michael) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint [system event]
Thu 05/23 8:52 AM
Adversary case 19-03472 Nature of Suit: (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)) Complaint by Drivetrain, LLC, as Trustee of Ignite Restaurant Group GUC Trust against Ecolab, Inc.. Fee Amount $350 (Warner, Michael) |